Member Case
Lead case is: 3:23-bk-32604

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 3:23-bk-32606
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2023
Dismissed:Jan 24, 2024
Terminated:Feb 09, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $50,001 to $100,000
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Rochester STEM Academy, Inc.
415 16th STreet Southwest
Rochester, MN 55902
Represented By
Paul L. Ratelle
Fabyanske Westra Hart & Thomson
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Friday, February 09, 2024
court Close bankruptcy case Fri 02/09 4:14 PM
IT IS ORDERED: The case is closed and the trustee (if a trustee has been appointed) is discharged. (KRG)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 01/26 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 01/26/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 01/24 12:00 PM
Order Granting Expedited Relief and Dismissing Case. (RAG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
27 27 misc Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Wed 12/27 8:37 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy filed by Rochester STEM Academy, Inc.. (Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Schedule(s) Wed 12/27 8:36 PM
Schedule(s) filed by Rochester STEM Academy, Inc.: A/B, D, E/F, G, H, Summary of assets and liabilities and statistical information, Verification by debtor(s). (Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 17, 2023
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/17 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/17/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
24 24 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Thu 12/14 10:23 AM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting scheduled for 1/11/2024 at 09:30 AM. Location: ***TELECONFERENCE ONLY (ch 11)***. Proofs of claim due by 4/10/2024. Government Proofs of claim due by 6/3/2024. (KRG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 12/13 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 12/13/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
22 22 order Joint Administration - motion Mon 12/11 3:36 PM
Order Granting Expedited Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 3:23-bk-32604 with Member Case 3:23-bk-32606 Related [+] (RAG)
Related: [-] 11
21 21 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 12/11 10:16 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Related [+] filed by UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee. Parent corporation or publicly held corporation reported for UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee. Corporate Parents: UMB Financial Corporation. (Murphy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 16
20 20 answer Response Mon 12/11 10:09 AM
Response to13 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Interested Party UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee. (Murphy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Objection Mon 12/11 10:06 AM
Objection by Interested Party UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee to12 Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, and Related Benefits. (Murphy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Response Mon 12/11 10:01 AM
Response to11 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Interested Party UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee. (Murphy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Objection Mon 12/11 9:54 AM
Objection by Interested Party UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee to14 Motion Regarding Maintenance of Bank Accounts and Existing Cash Management Systems. (Murphy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Objection Mon 12/11 9:42 AM
Objection by Interested Party UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee to15 Motion for Authorization to Use Cash Collateral. Verification of Motion or Exhibits. (Murphy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
court Public entry Mon 12/11 3:37 PM
An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of Rochester Math & Science Academy, Rochester STEM Academy, Inc., and Rochester MSA Building Company. The docket in In re Rochester Math & Science Academy, Case No. 23-32604 should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases, and all further filings should be made only in that case. Re:22 Order on Motion for Joint Administration (RAG)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
15 15 motion Motion for Authorization to Use Cash Collateral Fri 12/08 8:47 PM
Expedited Motion for Authorization to Use Cash Collateral (first day) filed by Rochester STEM Academy, Inc.. Lien(s) held by UMB NA AS TRUSTEE. Memorandum of Facts and Law, Verification of Motion or Exhibits, Proposed Order. Preliminary Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 01:30 PM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). Final hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 01:30 PM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). (Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Motion Regarding Maintenance of Bank Accounts and Existing Cash Management Systems Fri 12/08 8:38 PM
Expedited Motion Regarding Maintenance of Bank Accounts and Existing Cash Management Systems (first day). Banks: Choice Bank. Filed by Rochester STEM Academy, Inc.. Memorandum of Facts and Law, Verification of Motion or Exhibits, Proposed Order. Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 01:30 PM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). (Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Fri 12/08 8:30 PM
Expedited Motion for Continuation of Utility Service (first day) filed by Rochester STEM Academy, Inc.. Memorandum of Facts and Law, Verification of Motion or Exhibits, Proposed Order. Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 01:30 PM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). (Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, and Related Benefits Fri 12/08 8:25 PM
Expedited Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, and Related Benefits (first day) filed by Rochester STEM Academy, Inc.. Memorandum of Facts and Law, Verification of Motion or Exhibits, Proposed Order. Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 01:30 PM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). (Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Motion for Joint Administration Fri 12/08 8:19 PM
Expedited Motion for Joint Administration of Case 23-32604 with Case(s) 23-32607 (first day) filed by Rochester STEM Academy, Inc.. Memorandum of Facts and Law, Verification of Motion or Exhibits, Proposed Order. Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 01:30 PM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). (Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
10 10 misc Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing (Ch 11 only) Thu 12/07 3:17 PM
Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing filed by Rochester STEM Academy, Inc. (Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-]
order Admission pro hac vice - aplcn Thu 12/07 12:06 PM
Order of Bankruptcy Judge William J. Fisher Granting Application for Admission pro hac vice of Adrienne K. Walker for UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee Related [+] (CNN)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
9 9 aplcn Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/06 3:34 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adrienne K. Walker filed by Samuel M. Andre for UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee. Fee Amount $100. (Andre, Samuel)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned - Judge Wed 12/06 8:02 AM
Judge William J Fisher added to case. Involvement of Judge Katherine A. Constantine terminated. (KRG)
Related: [-]
trustee Add attorney for US Trustee Wed 12/06 10:12 AM
Attorney for US Trustee added to case. (Fadlovich, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 12/06 3:36 PM
Receipt of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice([LINK 23-32606 ) [aplcn,admphv] ( 100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13181024. Fee amount 100.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
8 8 misc List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Tue 12/05 10:31 PM
List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims filed by Rochester STEM Academy, Inc..(Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors
7 7 misc Amended Petition Tue 12/05 7:35 PM
Amended Petition Related [+] filed by Rochester STEM Academy, Inc.. (Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
6 6 misc Notice of appearance and request for notice Tue 12/05 5:41 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee and Samuel M. Andre. (Andre, Samuel)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of appearance and request for notice Tue 12/05 5:35 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee and Ryan Murphy. (Murphy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing (Ch 11 only) Tue 12/05 4:08 PM
Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing filed by Rochester STEM Academy, Inc. (Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Tue 12/05 3:23 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors filed by Rochester STEM Academy, Inc.. (Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 12/05 3:18 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Related [+] filed by Rochester STEM Academy, Inc.. There is no parent corporation or publicly held corporation to report for Rochester STEM Academy, Inc.. (Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 5 pgs misc Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Tue 12/05 3:14 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals re: Rochester STEM Academy, Inc.. Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Under Chapter 11. Fee Amount $1738.00. Debtor's exclusivity period for filing plan and disclosure statement ends 04/3/2024. (Ratelle, Paul)
Related: [-]