Maryland District Court
Judge:Julie Rebecca Rubin
Case #: 1:23-cv-03271
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2023
Re-opened:Jul 26, 2024
Terminated:Nov 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 01, 2024 6:10 AM EDT
Defendant
State of MD for Cecil County
Represented By
Wendy L Shiff
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin A Soper
704 Cedarday Dr
Bel Air, MD 21015

GPO Jul 02 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/2/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, November 21, 2024
31 31 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion to Stay Thu 11/21 10:07 AM
ORDER denying as moot17 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying as moot28 Motion to Stay; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 11/21/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
30 30 corresp Miscellaneous Thu 10/31 9:14 AM
Judicial Notice regarding Emergency Petition Filed by Kevin A. Soper. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 10/28 1:23 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Physical Exhibits (ECF No. 26; the "Motion"), it is this 28th day of October 2024, ORDERED that the Motion shall be, and is hereby, GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the physical exhibits shall be filed with the Clerk of Court in accordance with the procedures set forth on www.mdd.uscourts.gov/content/physical-exhibits. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 10/28/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
28 28 motion Stay Mon 10/07 5:16 PM
MOTION to Stay by Kevin A Soper.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/13 2:20 PM
Notice of Filing of Physical Exhibit by Kevin A Soper. (Physical Exhibit received on 9/12/2024 one copy sent to Chambers other copy is in the Baltimore Clerk's Office heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Leave to File Document Fri 09/13 9:25 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Physical Exhibits by Kevin A Soper.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/12 3:21 PM
JUDICIAL NOTICE by Kevin A Soper.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1,
Att: 2 Attachment 2,
Att: 3 Attachment 3,
Att: 4 Attachment 4,
Att: 5 Attachment 5,
Att: 6 Attachment 6,
Att: 7 Attachment 7,
Att: 8 Attachment 8,
Att: 9 Attachment 9,
Att: 10 Attachment 10
24 24 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/12 3:14 PM
RETURN DOCUMENT ORDER. (Physical Exhibit returned to filer). Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 9/9/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
23 23 corresp Miscellaneous Wed 09/11 10:14 AM
Correspondence re: Request for Issuance of Subpoena by Kevin A Soper. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/28 10:17 AM
JUDICIAL NOTICE by Kevin A Soper.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A,
Att: 2 Attachment B
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/27 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF FILING PHYSICAL EXHIBIT re20 Notice (Other) by Kevin A Soper. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 25, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/26 9:53 AM
JUDICIAL NOTICE by Kevin A Soper. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 08/01 12:19 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Kevin A Soper.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/30 2:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 Case Reopened. MOTION for Reconsideration filed by State of MD for Cecil County.(Shiff, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, July 26, 2024
17 17 motion Reconsideration Mon 07/29 9:28 AM
Rule 59 Motion (Motion for Reconsider) by Kevin A Soper(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Stay Tue 07/02 4:03 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot11 Motion to Stay; the Complaint shall be, and is hereby Dismissed without prejudice; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/2/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
15 15 9 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Tue 07/02 3:56 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/2/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 02, 2024
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/03 8:21 AM
Judicial Notice filed by Kevin A Soper (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 03/07 8:51 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Stay filed by Kevin A Soper.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/05 3:25 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Stay filed by State of MD for Cecil County.(Shiff, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
11 11 motion Stay Tue 02/20 9:56 AM
MOTION for Stay of Lower Court Proceeding by Kevin A Soper (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
10 10 respm Response to Motion Thu 01/18 4:08 PM
Plaintiff's RESPONSE to8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kevin A Soper.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
9 9 misc Rule 12/56 Fri 01/12 8:54 AM
Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Kevin A Soper (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 01/11 6:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by State of MD for Cecil County(Shiff, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Friday, December 22, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/28 9:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A Soper. State of MD for Cecil County served on 12/22/2023, answer due 1/12/2024.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Thursday, December 21, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 12/21 8:17 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to State of MD for Cecil County.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/20 9:00 AM
Proposed Summons by Kevin A Soper (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
4 4 3 pgs order Order Fri 12/15 11:19 AM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit completed summons to the Clerk for issuance within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 12/15/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/06 11:31 AM
NOTICE (Judicial Notice) by Kevin A Soper. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice EDSS Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Wed 12/06 11:32 AM
Documents submitted via EDSS. Kevin A Soper consents to receive notice and service electronically. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
2 2 misc New Case Notification Letter Tue 12/05 12:48 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Kevin A Soper. (c/m 12/5/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/05 12:46 PM
COMPLAINT (Emergency Petition) against State of MD for Cecil County ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 6750.), filed by Kevin A Soper.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit List,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G