California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 2:23-cv-10186
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2023
Terminated:Dec 08, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jun 01, 2024 3:10 AM PDT
Defendant
Heaven Losoya
Defendant
Saint Losoya
Defendant
Valentine Losoya
721 Leonardo Street
Montebello, CA 90640
Plaintiff
Lucille Losoya
721 Leonard Street
Montebello, CA 90640


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
9 9 misc Receipt Wed 12/27 1:25 PM
Receipt of LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL - REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
8 8 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Fri 12/08 1:41 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (aco)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Fri 12/08 1:40 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: As explained in the attached statement, the Request is DENIED because The District Court lacks removal jurisdiction. This case is REMANDED to state court as explain in the attached statement.; denying3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 12/05 2:10 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 12/05 2:09 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 12/05 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Tue 12/05 2:08 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Valentine Losoya. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 12/05 2:06 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Valentine Losoya. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 12/05 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number 23STUD12090 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott., filed by Defendant Valentine Losoya.. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet