Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-34815

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey P Norman
Case #: 4:23-ap-03259
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2023
Terminated:Jan 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Azeemeh Zaheer
Represented By
David W Tang
Woodfill & Pressler
contact info
Plaintiff
Naissance Galleria, LLC
Represented By
Jennifer MacGeorge
Macgeorge Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Saturday, January 13, 2024
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/13 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Emergency Motion (Adversary)
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/13 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Generic Order
Thursday, January 11, 2024
24 24 order Emergency (Adversary) Thu 01/11 11:15 AM
Order Granting Emergency Motion to Remand and Canceling Hearing Related [+] Signed on 1/11/2024. (MarioRios)
Related: [-] 5
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Generic Motion (Adversary) Thu 01/11 11:13 AM
Order Mooting Motion Related [+] Signed on 1/11/2024. (MarioRios)
Related: [-] 10
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/11 11:16 AM
Adversary Case 4:23-ap-3259 Closed. (MarioRios)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
22 22 15 pgs answer Response Mon 01/08 11:49 PM
Opposition Response Related [+]. Filed by Azeemeh Zaheer (Tang, David)
Related: [-] 5 Emergency Motion (Adversary)
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Temporary Injunction
Att: 2 47 pgs Exhibit Pledge and Security Agreement
Att: 3 4 pgs Exhibit Notice of Default
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit Forged Assignment
Att: 5 Proposed Order Order denying Remand
21 21 answer Response Mon 01/08 2:18 PM
Response in Opposition Related [+]. Filed by Azeemeh Zaheer (Drinnon, Rodney)
Related: [-] 10 Generic Motion
Friday, January 05, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/05 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
19 19 misc Certificate Wed 01/03 7:02 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Naissance Galleria, LLC ) Related [+] Order Setting Hearing on Motion to Disqualify David Tang and Omar Khawaja) (Pope, James)
Related: [-] 18 Order Setting Hearing
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
18 18 order Setting Hearing Wed 01/03 11:36 AM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 1/3/2024 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 1/31/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (MarioRios)
Related: [-] 17 Generic Motion
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
17 17 16 pgs motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Tue 01/02 7:02 PM
Motion to Disqualify David Tang and Omar Khawaja as Counsel for Defendant Filed by Naissance Galleria, LLC Response to State Court Motion #2 Exhibit 2) Lawsuits #3 Exhibit 3) Michael Fleming Letter #4 Exhibit 4) Participation Agreement #5 Exhibit 5) Jan 3rd Email #6 Exhibit 6) Jan 11th Email #7 Exhibit 7) Jan 11th Email (2) #8 Exhibit 8) Jan 11th Email (3) #9 Exhibit 9) Jan 12th Email #10 Exhibit 10) Jan 15th Email #11 Exhibit 11) Jan 19th Email #12 Exhibit 12) March 31st Email #13 Exhibit 13) May 19 Email #14 Exhibit 14) Khawaja Employment #15 Exhibit 15) Wyatt NDA #16 Exhibit 16) Wyatt Email 1 #17 Exhibit 17) Wyatt Email 2 #18 Exhibit 18) Wyatt Email 3 #19 Exhibit 19) Wyatt Email 4 #20 Exhibit 20) Interrogatories #21 Proposed Order) (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 1
Friday, December 29, 2023
16 16 misc Certificate Fri 12/29 12:22 AM
Certificate (Filed By Azeemeh Zaheer ). (Tang, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Clerk File
Friday, December 22, 2023
15 15 3 pgs notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 12/22 12:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Charles Clayton Conrad Filed by on behalf of National Bank of Kuwait, S.A.K.P., New York Branch (Conrad, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/21 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Setting Hearing
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
13 13 misc Certificate Tue 12/19 4:15 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Naissance Galleria, LLC ) Related [+] Order Setting Hearing) (Pope, James)
Related: [-] 12 Order Setting Hearing
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
12 12 order Setting Hearing Tue 12/19 12:39 PM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 12/19/2023 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 1/17/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (MarioRios)
Related: [-] 10 Generic Motion
11 11 misc Proposed Order Tue 12/19 10:12 AM
Proposed Order RE: (Filed By Naissance Galleria, LLC ) Related [+] (Pope, James)
Related: [-] 10 Generic Motion
10 10 17 pgs motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Tue 12/19 10:07 AM
Motion to Disqualify Rodney Drinnon as Counsel Filed by Naissance Galleria, LLC Nondisclosure Agreement #2 Exhibit 2) Disclosures #3 Exhibit 3) Supplemental Disclosures #4 Exhibit 4) Claw back correspondence #5 Exhibit 5) Drinnon Email #6 Exhibit 6) Drinnon Affidavit) (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, December 18, 2023
9 9 notice Notice Mon 12/18 10:13 PM
Notice Advisory and Filing of Appellant's Opening Brief (if necessary) . Filed by Naissance Galleria, LLC(Polvi, D. Hunter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 76 pgs Exhibit Appellant's Opening Brief in Texas 1st Court of Appeals
Friday, December 15, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/15 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, December 14, 2023
7 7 misc Certificate Thu 12/14 11:58 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Naissance Galleria, LLC ) Related [+] (Pope, James)
Related: [-] 6 Order Setting Hearing
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
6 6 order Setting Hearing Wed 12/13 3:59 PM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 12/13/2023 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 1/17/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (MarioRios)
Related: [-] 5 Emergency Motion (Adversary)
5 5 22 pgs motion Emergency Motion Wed 12/13 11:09 AM
Emergency Motion to Remand and/or Abstain Filed by Naissance Galleria, LLC Transcript 11/27/2023 #2 Exhibit 2) Transcript 11/13/2023 #3 Exhibit 3) Transcript 7/5/2023 #4 Exhibit 4) State Court Case Petition #5 Proposed Order) (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 118 pgs Exhibit 1
Saturday, December 09, 2023
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/09 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Scheduling Order
Thursday, December 07, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 12/07 3:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Rodney Lee Drinnon Filed by on behalf of Azeemeh Zaheer (Drinnon, Rodney)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/07 10:34 AM
Preliminary Pretrial Order Signed on 12/7/2023 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (MarioRios)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
1 1 4 pgs cmp Notice of Removal [system event] Wed 12/06 8:46 AM
Adversary case 23-03259 Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Notice of Removal Azeemeh Zaheer, Naissance Galleria, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Castanon, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 1