Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:M Hannah Lauck
Case #: 3:23-cv-00828
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Employment (Wrongful Termination)
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2023
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Case in other court:City of Richmond Circuit Court, CL22004889-00
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2024 5:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Elevance Health, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Henson
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Michael Berdan
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Ashley Zeiler Hager
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders Llp (ga-Na)
contact info
Plaintiff
Bridget Beckford
Represented By
Barbara Queen
Lawrence Queen
contact info
David Scott Hansen Laws
Lawrencequeen
contact info
Tyler Miko
O'Hagan Meyer
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
appeal USCA Case Number Thu 04/24 9:12 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1433 Case Manager, EBorneisen, for56 Notice of Appeal filed by Bridget Beckford. (Lgar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
57 57 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA Mon 04/21 2:52 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re56 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Lgar, )
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
56 56 appeal Notice of Appeal Sat 04/19 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to54 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Bridget Beckford. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AVAEDC-10132135. (Brown, Christopher)
Related: [-]