Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant, III
Referred: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Case #: 4:23-cv-01079
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2023
Terminated:Jul 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2024 3:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Taylor Wiley
6252 Oxford Peak Court
Castle Rock, CO 80108
Represented By
Matt Lightfoot
Vbpena Law
contact info
Viola Blayre Pena
Vbpena Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
graham wiley
6252 Oxford Peak Court
Castle Rock, CO 80108
Represented By
Matt Lightfoot
Vbpena Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Sebastian Silea
10641 Castle Place
Frisco, TX 75035


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, July 26, 2024
17 17 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Fri 07/26 2:37 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to15 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,16 Judgment. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
16 16 order Judgment Mon 07/22 11:38 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/22/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Mon 07/22 11:36 AM
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for14 Report and Recommendations. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #7) is GRANTED, and this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/22/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
14 14 6 pgs misc Report and Recommendations Wed 07/03 6:20 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re7 MOTION to Dismiss. The Court recommends that the Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 7) be GRANTED. The Court further recommends that this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and any pending motion be DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 7/3/2024. (Cleland, Luke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/02 4:38 PM
MOTION for Real Property Writ of Attachment by Sebastian Silea.(XL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 2 Additional Attachment(s)
Monday, March 25, 2024
12 12 motion Writ Mon 03/25 1:29 PM
MOTION for Writ of Execution Attachment as to Taylor Wiley, by Sebastian Silea. (DLW)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Writ Mon 03/25 1:28 PM
MOTION for Writ of Execution Attachment as to Graham Clark Wiley, by Sebastian Silea. (DLW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
10 10 10 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/13 4:33 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Taylor Wiley, graham wiley . (Lightfoot, Matt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/07 3:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sebastian Silea .(rpc, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit/Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, March 01, 2024
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/01 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability by Taylor Wiley (Pena, Viola)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
7 7 29 pgs motion Dismiss Tue 02/20 8:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Taylor Wiley, graham wiley.(Lightfoot, Matt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit/Declaration by Defendant Taylor Wiley in support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
Thursday, December 21, 2023
6 6 16 pgs misc Letter Thu 12/21 4:34 PM
CONDITIONAL ACCEPTANCE FOR VALUE AND COUNTEROFFER/CLAIM FOR PROOF OF CLAIM and TENDER OF PAYMENT OFFERING. (dlw, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Non-Pris Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Thu 12/21 4:29 PM
Non-prisoner pro se consent to receive electronic notice filed by Sebastian Silea. (dlw, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/19 1:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by graham wiley, Taylor Wiley. All Defendants. (Pena, Viola)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
3 3 2 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 12/06 2:41 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Graham Wiley. (dlw, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 12/06 2:40 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Taylor Wiley. (dlw, )
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/06 2:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Taylor Wiley, Graham Wiley, filed by Sebastian Silea.. (dlw, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 12/06 4:15 PM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 6-66060 (wea, 6)
Related: [-]