Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Brantley Starr
Case #: 3:23-cv-02685
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2023
Terminated:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2024 4:29 AM CDT
Defendant
ATX Innovation Inc
Represented By
Brent Douglas Sedge
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Katz
Represented By
Clay A Hartmann
The Hartmann Firm PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
16 16 misc Stipulation Fri 04/25 5:01 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re1 Complaint,,,, by ATX Innovation Inc. (Abcarian, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Mon 04/28 10:57 AM
Civil Case Terminated per16 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. (ykp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
15 15 order Order Thu 03/27 2:39 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties have failed to update the Court with a status report within 30 days of its January 23, 2025, order at Doc. 14. The Court therefore ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report within 30 days of this order. If the parties do not comply with this order, the Court reserves the right to dismiss this case for want of prosecution and failure to follow court orders under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 3/27/2025) (chmb) Modified on 3/27/2025 (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
14 14 order Order Thu 01/23 11:49 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of the Court's Order at Doc. 12, the Court ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report within 30 days of this order updating the Court on the status of arbitration. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 1/23/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 07/17 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Brent Douglas Sedge on behalf of ATX Innovation Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Sedge, Brent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
12 12 order Order Wed 01/24 2:13 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion to stay pending arbitration (Doc. 11) and FINDS AS MOOT ATX Innovation Inc.'s motion for extension of time to file an answer, (Doc. 10). This case is STAYED pending arbitration. The parties are INSTRUCTED to file a motion to lift the stay once arbitration is complete. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 1/24/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed (Public Entry) Terminate Motion Referral (Public Entry) Wed 01/24 3:14 PM
Case Stayed,11 Joint MOTION to Stay,10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer terminated Per 12 Order. (agc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
11 11 motion Stay Mon 01/22 1:02 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Judicial Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by ATX Innovation Inc (Sedge, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - TCA,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Acceptance
Thursday, January 18, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/18 11:37 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Second filed by ATX Innovation Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Sedge, Brent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 01/03 8:52 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting7 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant ATX Innovation, Inc.'s deadline to file a responsive pleading is now January 19, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 1/3/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
8 8 misc Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements Wed 12/27 3:34 PM
Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Sedge, Brent)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time Wed 12/27 3:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to file Initial Responsive Pleading filed by ATX Innovation Inc (Sedge, Brent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
6 6 misc Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements Thu 12/07 3:18 PM
Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Hartmann, Clay)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 12/07 11:10 AM
Summons Issued as to ATX Innovation Inc. (kcr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
4 4 order Electronic Standing Order - Specific Requirements for Judge Starr Thu 12/07 11:09 AM
Electronic Standing Order - If they have not already done so, all attorneys appearing in this case must file a Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements on the docket attesting that they have read, and will comply with, the judge-specific requirements for this Court, including the Court's order concerning generative artificial intelligence. The judge-specific requirements and a template Certificate may be found at:[LINK:Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements.] To file the Certificate, please use the event entitled Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. This event is located in the Other Documents selection, which is under the Other Filings category of the Civil page in ECF. Please contact the ECF help desk at 214-753-2633 for filing assistance. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/6/2023) (kcr)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Starr Thu 12/07 11:08 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 12/06 4:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Melissa Katz. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hartmann, Clay)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/06 2:19 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against ATX Innovation, Inc. filed by Melissa Katz. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14222269) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hartmann, Clay)
Related: [-]