Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-15769

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Julia W Brand
Case #: 2:23-ap-01484
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Naibeth Elizabeth Montero Davis
1191 North Bundy Dr.
Los Angeles, CA 90049
Represented By
Naibeth Elizabeth Montero Davis
contact info
Plaintiff
PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
15910 Ventura Blvd., 12th Floor
Encino, CA 91436
Represented By
Jacqueline L James
Hemar, Rousso & Heald, LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Saturday, April 26, 2025
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 04/26 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, April 24, 2025
31 31 misc Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF) Thu 04/24 7:50 AM
Notice to creditors re28 Order Approving Stipulation Staying Deadlines in This Adversary Proceeding . The pre-trial conference is continued to August 19, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. (BNC-PDF) (LG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 03/05 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/05/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
29 29 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Wed 03/05 8:00 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued from 3/4/25 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/19/2025 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (LG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
Monday, March 03, 2025
28 28 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Mon 03/03 3:23 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Staying Deadlines In This Adversary Proceeding . The pre-trial conference is continued to August 19, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/3/2025 (LG)
Related: [-] 26
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
27 27 misc Notice of Lodgment Wed 02/19 1:24 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order Staying Deadlines Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC Related [+]. (Mickelsen Simon, Jessica)
Related: [-] 26 Stipulation By PNC Equipment Finance, LLC and Naibeth Elizabeth Montero Davis, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC (Mickelsen Simon, Jessica) filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
26 26 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 02/19 1:21 PM
Stipulation By PNC Equipment Finance, LLC and Naibeth Elizabeth Montero Davis, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC (Mickelsen Simon, Jessica)
Related: [-]
25 25 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 02/19 12:35 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect docket event was used to file this document. The Filer Is Instructed To Re-File The Document Using The Correct Docket Event 'Stipulation (motion)' Related [+] (LG)
Related: [-] 23 Pre Trial Stipulation filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
24 24 misc Declaration Wed 02/19 11:28 AM
Declaration re: Second Declaration of Jessica M. Simon in Support of PreTrial Stipulation, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC Related [+]. (Mickelsen Simon, Jessica)
Related: [-] 23 Pre Trial Stipulation By PNC Equipment Finance, LLC and Naibeth Elizabeth Montero Davis
23 23 motion Pre Trial Stipulation (motion) Wed 02/19 10:43 AM
Pre Trial Stipulation By PNC Equipment Finance, LLC and Naibeth Elizabeth Montero Davis Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC (Mickelsen Simon, Jessica) WARNING: See entry 25 for corrective action. Modified on 2/19/2025 (LG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
22 22 misc Notice of Lodgment Tue 02/18 10:10 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order Staying Deadlines in this Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC Related [+]. (Mickelsen Simon, Jessica)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:23-ap-01484. Complaint by PNC Equipment Finance, LLC against Naibeth Elizabeth Montero Davis. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Proceeding Sheet # 2 Summons for Issuance) Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC,21 Declaration re: PreTrial Stipulation with Exhibit A and Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC (RE: related document(s)17 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)). (Mickelsen Simon, Jessica) filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
21 21 misc Declaration Tue 02/18 9:59 PM
Declaration re: PreTrial Stipulation with Exhibit A and Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC Related [+]. (Mickelsen Simon, Jessica)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
20 20 misc Request for special notice Wed 02/05 2:38 PM
Request for special notice Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC. (Mickelsen Simon, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
19 19 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 12/05 7:54 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued from 12/3/24 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/4/2025 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (LG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 10/02 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Monday, September 30, 2024
17 17 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Mon 09/30 2:30 PM
Order Approving Second Stipulation To Continue Discovery Cutoff And Pretrial Conference . The Pretrial Conference currently scheduled to take place on December 3, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. shall be continued to March 4, 2025 at 2:00 p. m. The hearing set for December 3, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. is off calendar. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 9/30/2024 (LG)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, September 26, 2024
16 16 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 09/26 9:17 AM
Notice of lodgment of Proposed Order Approving Second Stipulation Re Discovery Cutoff and PreTrial Conference Continuance Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC Related [+]. (James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation By PNC Equipment Finance, LLC and defendant Naibeth Montero Davis Re Discovery Cutoff and Pretrial Conference Continuance (Second Stipulation) Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
15 15 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 09/26 9:08 AM
Stipulation By PNC Equipment Finance, LLC and defendant Naibeth Montero Davis Re Discovery Cutoff and Pretrial Conference Continuance (Second Stipulation) Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC (James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 01, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 06/01 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Friday, May 31, 2024
13 13 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Fri 05/31 9:45 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/3/2024 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (PP)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
Thursday, May 30, 2024
12 12 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Thu 05/30 3:58 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Discovery Cutoff And Pretrial Conference. Pretrial continued to 12/3/2024 at 2:00 pm (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/30/2024 (PP)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, May 24, 2024
11 11 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 05/24 8:51 AM
Notice of lodgment of Proposed Order Approving Stipulation Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC Related [+]. (James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation By PNC Equipment Finance, LLC and Naibeth Elizabeth Montero Davis Re Discovery Cutoff and Pretrial Conference Continuance Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
10 10 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 05/24 8:48 AM
Stipulation By PNC Equipment Finance, LLC and Naibeth Elizabeth Montero Davis Re Discovery Cutoff and Pretrial Conference Continuance Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC (James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 02/23 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
8 8 order Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Wed 02/21 5:04 PM
Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/21/2024. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/6/2024 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (PP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
7 7 court Hearing Set (Other) (AP Case) Thu 02/08 10:31 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/6/2024 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (SB2)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
6 6 misc Status report Tue 02/06 12:54 PM
Status report Joint Status Report Filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC Related [+]. (James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/03 11:37 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Naibeth Elizabeth Montero Davis. (Anyama, Onyinye)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 12/06 1:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on Naibeth Elizabeth Montero Davis 12/6/2023 (James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
3 3 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Mon 12/04 4:45 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other - Pursuant to LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(A), plaintiffs do not need to lodge a proposed form of Summons in order to have a Summons or Another Summons issued in an adversary proceeding. The court will prepare the required Summons or Another Summons and place it on the docket of the adversary proceeding. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (WK)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 12/04 4:41 PM
Summons Issued on Naibeth Elizabeth Montero Davis Date Issued 12/4/2023, Answer Due 1/3/2024 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/6/2024 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (WK)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/04 3:23 PM
Adversary case 2:23-ap-01484. Complaint by PNC Equipment Finance, LLC against Naibeth Elizabeth Montero Davis. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Sheet
Att: 2 Summons for Issuance