Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Raymond A Jackson
Referred: Lawrence R Leonard
Case #: 2:23-cv-00626
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2023
Terminated:Sep 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2024 5:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Christopher Fitzcharles
Represented By
Steven Blythe Wiley
Wiley Law Offices PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Napolitano Homes, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Mitchell Hendrick
Ruloff Swain Haddad Morecock Talbert & Woodward, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
42 42 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 09/18 4:05 PM
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this civil action be and is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the Clerk shall remove this civil action from the active docket of this Court. Copies distributed as directed 9/18/2024. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 9/18/2024. (Vpea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
41 41 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/17 2:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Christopher Fitzcharles. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
40 40 minutes Jury Trial - Completed Thu 09/12 12:01 PM
JURY TRIAL (Day #2) held before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorney Andrew Hendrick appeared with plaintiff Vince Napolitano. Attorney Steven Wiley appeared with defendant Christopher Fitzcharles. Court and counsel conducted charge conference. The parties notified the Court that they had reached a settlement. Jurors excused. Parties directed to file dismissal documentation by 9/17/24. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR) (bap, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Witness List,
Att: 2 Plaintiff's Exhibit List,
Att: 3 Defendant's Exhibit List
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
39 39 minutes Jury Trial - Begun ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 09/11 5:25 PM
JURY TRIAL (Day #1) held before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorney Andrew Hendrick appeared with plaintiff Vince Napolitano. Attorney Steven Wiley appeared with defendant Christopher Fitzcharles. Petit jurors sworn, examined on voir dire, and from said panel came a jury of nine jurors, duly sworn. Opening statements heard. Plaintiff presented evidence. Objections heard and rulings made. Plaintiff rested. Out of presence of the jury, Defendant made Rule 50 motion for judgment as a matter of law - Denied. Defendant presented evidence. Defendant rested. Jurors excused and court adjourned until 9/12/2024 at 10:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR) (bap, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
38 38 5 pgs order Order on Motion in Limine Thu 09/05 2:19 PM
OPINION and ORDER. The Plaintiff's Motion in Limine25 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/5/2024. Copies distributed as directed 9/5/2024. (Vpea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
37 37 trial Proposed Voir Dire Wed 09/04 2:51 PM
Proposed Voir Dire by Christopher Fitzcharles. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
36 36 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Wed 09/04 2:50 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Christopher Fitzcharles. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
35 35 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Wed 09/04 2:49 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Christopher Fitzcharles. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
34 34 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Wed 09/04 12:11 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Napolitano Homes, Inc..(Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Instructions with authority,
Att: 2 Instructions without authority
33 33 trial Proposed Voir Dire Wed 09/04 12:09 PM
Proposed Voir Dire by Napolitano Homes, Inc.. (Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
32 32 notice Notice (other) Thu 08/29 12:00 PM
NOTICE by Napolitano Homes, Inc. re25 MOTION in Limine (Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
31 31 16 pgs order Order Thu 08/29 11:23 AM
FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 8/29/2024. (Vpea)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/26 3:47 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION in Limine filed by Christopher Fitzcharles. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
29 29 motion Hearing Thu 08/22 4:13 PM
MOTION for Hearing re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Christopher Fitzcharles. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 08/20 12:50 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Napolitano Homes, Inc.. (Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
27 27 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Mon 08/19 4:10 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher Fitzcharles.(Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, August 12, 2024
26 26 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 08/12 1:03 PM
Memorandum in Support re25 MOTION in Limine filed by Napolitano Homes, Inc.. (Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion In Limine Mon 08/12 1:02 PM
MOTION in Limine by Napolitano Homes, Inc.. (Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
24 24 9 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 08/05 4:52 PM
Memorandum in Support re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Napolitano Homes, Inc..(Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Mon 08/05 4:48 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Napolitano Homes, Inc.. (Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
22 22 14 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 06/24 4:02 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim12 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion is granted on Count II and denied on Count I. Copies distributed as directed. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 6/24/2024. (Vpea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Wed 05/15 3:58 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard for all further proceedings Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 5/15/24. (epri, )
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 05/16 8:40 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller:Settlement Conference held on 5/15/2024. (cdod, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
20 20 order Settlement Conference Order Tue 04/02 1:17 PM
Settlement Conference Order- All parties and their lead counsel are required to appear before the undersigned via Zoomgov remote proceedings for a settlement conference at 1:30 p.m. on May 15,2024. The parties must Submit a brief memorandum of five pages or less directly to the chambers of the undersigned via facsimile to 757-222-7188 or email to Deborah_Crowder@vaed.uscourts.gov (do not file in the clerks office) by noon on May 13,2024. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 4/2/2024. (Vpea)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 04/01 2:11 PM
Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 5/15/2024 at 01:30 PM in Norfolk Remote before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (cdod, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
19 19 4 pgs order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order Wed 03/27 10:40 AM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk. Jury Trial set for 9/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk. The parties are DIRECTED to minimize motions to seal documents and are ORDERED to schedule a settlement conference on or before the Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 3/26/24. (ptom, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference-Rule16b Thu 04/04 12:08 PM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference held on 3/26/2024. (bap, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
18 18 notice Request for Hearing Wed 03/13 3:55 PM
Request for Hearing by Napolitano Homes, Inc. re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint (Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Consent/Decline to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 03/13 3:39 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Napolitano Homes, Inc.. (Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 03/13 12:11 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference reset for 3/26/2024 at 3:00 p.m. (bap, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
16 16 order Rule 26(f) Pretrial Order Tue 03/12 11:52 AM
RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference to be conducted remotely on 4/5/2024 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 3/12/2024. (bap, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
15 15 17 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Mon 03/04 5:09 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint filed by Napolitano Homes, Inc..(Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/20 2:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Christopher Fitzcharles.(Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
13 13 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Tue 02/20 2:27 PM
Memorandum in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint filed by Christopher Fitzcharles. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/20 2:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint by Christopher Fitzcharles. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/06 1:58 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christopher Fitzcharles, filed by Napolitano Homes, Inc..(Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
10 10 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Tue 01/23 4:00 PM
Memorandum in Support re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Christopher Fitzcharles. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 01/23 3:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Christopher Fitzcharles. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/23 3:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Christopher Fitzcharles.(Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Jury Demand Tue 01/23 3:54 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Christopher Fitzcharles. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Wed 01/17 9:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT for Service of Process on Christopher Fitzcharles from The Secretary of the Commonwealth.(Vpea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, December 08, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 12/08 4:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Christopher Fitzcharles, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(Vpea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motion Procedures
Thursday, December 07, 2023
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Thu 12/07 11:13 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Napolitano Homes, Inc.. (Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Citizenship Disclosure Form Thu 12/07 10:38 AM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Napolitano Homes, Inc.. (Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 12/07 10:29 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Napolitano Homes, Inc.. (Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Thu 12/07 9:42 AM
Notice of Correction re1 Complaint. A financial disclosure statement was not filed with the party's first appearance as required by Local Rule 7.1. The party is allowed seven (7) days to correct the deficiency and file the financial disclosure statement. Additionally, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1, a Citizenship Disclosure Form should be filed in any case noting a diversity of citizenship jurisdiction. The form can be found on our internet site and should promptly be filed. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/06 4:44 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9252579.), filed by Napolitano Homes, Inc..(Hendrick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Thu 12/07 9:38 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
Related: [-]