New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referred: Marcia M Henry
Case #: 2:23-cv-08953
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause12:22 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2024 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Robert Cassino
Represented By
Randy Scott Zelin
Randy Scott Zelin PC
contact info
Defendant
Anthony DiTucci
Represented By
Michael S. Finkelstein
Michael S. Finkelstein
contact info
Defendant
Marcello Follano
Represented By
Chad D. Seigel
Tacopina Seigel & Deoreo
contact info
Matthew G. DeOreo
Tacopina Seigel & Deoreo
contact info
Joseph Tacopina
Law Offices Of Joseph Tacopina, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JL Rivera Enterprises LTD.
Defendant
Late Stage Asset Management, LLC
Represented By
Chad D. Seigel
Tacopina Seigel & Deoreo
contact info
Matthew G. DeOreo
Tacopina Seigel & Deoreo
contact info
Joseph Tacopina
Law Offices Of Joseph Tacopina, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Pre IPO Marketing Inc.
Defendant
Joseph Rivera
Represented By
Stephen Wexler
Burkhart, Wexler & Hirschberg, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Raymond J. Pirrello, Jr.
Represented By
Scott A. Resnik
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Michael Max Rosensaft
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Nicholas Liotta
contact info
Defendant
Prior 2 IPO Inc.
Represented By
Scott A. Resnik
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Michael Max Rosensaft
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Nicholas Liotta
contact info
Intervenor
United States Attorney Eastern District of New York
Represented By
Jessica Weigel
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Securities And Exchange Commission
Represented By
Karen M. Lee
U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission
contact info
Antonia Marie Apps
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Debra Jaroslawicz
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Zheng He
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info

GPO Feb 05 2024
ORDER granting 25 Motion to Intervene; granting 25 Motion to Stay. For the reasons articulated in the attached Memorandum & Order, the Government's 25 motion to intervene and the Government's 25 request for a stay of the instant Civil Case are GRANTED. All deadlines will be held in abeyance until the resolution of the Criminal Case. Within thirty (30) days of the resolution of United States v. Raymond John Pirrello, Jr., 23-cr-499 (KAM) (JMC), the parties are respectfully requested to file a joint status letter regarding how they intend to proceed in the instant Civil Case via ECF. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 2/5/2024. (HM)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 10/29 7:26 PM
ORDER granting 37 ,38 ,39 , as supplemented by41 ,42 ,43 : Attorneys Nicholas J. Liotta, Michael M. Rosensaft, and Scott A. Resnik of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP are terminated as counsel of record for Defendants Raymond John Pirrello, Jr. and Prior 2 IPO Inc. Attorney Lino Joseph De Masi of Aidala, Bertuna & Kamins, P.C. is substituted as counsel for these Defendants. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 10/29/2024. (JPB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
43 43 2 pgs respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 10/16 12:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re39 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Scott A. Resnik. Filed (Declaration Of Scott A. Resnik In Support) filed by Raymond J. Pirrello, Jr., Prior 2 IPO Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] snik, Scott
42 42 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 10/16 12:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael M. Rosensaft. Filed (Declaration Of Michael M. Rosensaft In Support) filed by Raymond J. Pirrello, Jr., Prior 2 IPO Inc.. (Rosensaft, Michael)
Related: [-]
41 41 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 10/16 12:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re37 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nicholas J. Liotta. Filed (Declaration Of Nicholas J. Liotta In Support) filed by Raymond J. Pirrello, Jr., Prior 2 IPO Inc.. (Liotta, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
order Status Report Order Thu 10/10 1:22 PM
ORDER re37 ,38 ,39 : Attorneys Nicholas J. Liotta, Michael M. Rosensaft, and Scott A. Resnik of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP seek to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants Raymond John Pirrello, Jr. and Prior 2 IPO Inc. By 10/17/2024 , counsel shall state in writing "whether or not" they are "asserting a retaining or charging lien and whether the clients were served with the motion to withdraw pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 10/10/2024. (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/01 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lino Joseph De Masi on behalf of Raymond J. Pirrello, Jr., Prior 2 IPO Inc. (aty to be noticed) (De Masi, Lino)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
39 39 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 09/20 8:01 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Scott A. Resnik. Filed by Raymond J. Pirrello, Jr., Prior 2 IPO Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] snik, Scott
Att: 1 2 pgs Declaration Of Scott A. Resnik In Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
38 38 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 09/20 7:57 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael M. Rosensaft. Filed by Raymond J. Pirrello, Jr., Prior 2 IPO Inc.. (Rosensaft, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Of Michael M. Rosensaft In Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
37 37 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 09/20 7:51 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nicholas J. Liotta. Filed by Raymond J. Pirrello, Jr., Prior 2 IPO Inc.. (Liotta, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Of Nicholas J. Liotta In Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, February 05, 2024
36 36 25 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Order on Motion to Stay Mon 02/05 7:00 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Intervene; granting25 Motion to Stay. For the reasons articulated in the attached Memorandum & Order, the Government's25 motion to intervene and the Government's25 request for a stay of the instant Civil Case are GRANTED . All deadlines will be held in abeyance until the resolution of the Criminal Case. Within thirty (30) days of the resolution of United States v. Raymond John Pirrello, Jr. , 23-cr-499 (KAM) (JMC), the parties are respectfully requested to file a joint status letter regarding how they intend to proceed in the instant Civil Case via ECF. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 2/5/2024. (HM)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Letter Mon 02/05 6:16 PM
Letter Seeking Clarification by Securities And Exchange Commission (Jaroslawicz, Debra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
34 34 misc Letter Tue 01/23 5:28 PM
Letter concerning Defendant Ditucci's position on government's motion to intervene and stay civil proceedings by United States Attorney Eastern District of New York (Weigel, Jessica)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. DeOreo on behalf of Late Stage Asset Management, LLC (aty to be noticed) (DeOreo, Matthew)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. DeOreo on behalf of Marcello Follano (aty to be noticed) (DeOreo, Matthew)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad D. Seigel on behalf of Late Stage Asset Management, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Seigel, Chad)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad D. Seigel on behalf of Marcello Follano (aty to be noticed) (Seigel, Chad)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Tacopina on behalf of Late Stage Asset Management, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Tacopina, Joseph)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Tacopina on behalf of Marcello Follano (aty to be noticed) (Tacopina, Joseph)
Related: [-]
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 01/23 10:24 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry for all further proceedings. Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry, Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 1/23/2024. Motions referred to Marcia M. Henry. (KD)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/22 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Finkelstein on behalf of Anthony DiTucci (aty to be noticed) (Finkelstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Letter Mon 01/22 1:03 PM
Letter concerning Defendant Cassino's position on government's motion to intervene and stay civil proceedings by United States Attorney Eastern District of New York (Weigel, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
25 25 motion Intervene Stay Fri 01/19 5:54 PM
MOTION to Intervene , MOTION to Stay by United States Attorney Eastern District of New York. (Weigel, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Thursday, January 18, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/18 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Randy Scott Zelin on behalf of Robert Cassino (aty to be noticed) (Zelin, Randy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/17 12:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Wexler on behalf of Joseph Rivera (aty to be noticed) (Wexler, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/11 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Liotta on behalf of Raymond J. Pirrello, Jr., Prior 2 IPO Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Liotta, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
21 21 order Scheduling Order Mon 01/08 10:59 AM
INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference via Zoom will be held February 22, 2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed 26(f) Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than February 15, 2024 . Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. This conference is a public proceeding, and all are welcome to attend via telephone or via video. If you would like to receive the Zoom invitation, please contact Judge Wicks' Courtroom Deputy at (631) 712-5625. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 1/8/2024. (DF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order,
Att: 2 JMW Individual Practice Rules
Friday, January 05, 2024
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/05 10:50 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities And Exchange Commission. Robert Cassino waiver sent on 1/5/2024, answer due 3/5/2024. (Jaroslawicz, Debra)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/05 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Max Rosensaft on behalf of Raymond J. Pirrello, Jr., Prior 2 IPO Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Rosensaft, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/05 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Resnik on behalf of Raymond J. Pirrello, Jr., Prior 2 IPO Inc. (aty to be noticed) Related [+]
Related: [-] snik, Scott
Thursday, January 04, 2024
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/04 10:29 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities And Exchange Commission. Prior 2 IPO Inc. waiver sent on 12/12/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (Jaroslawicz, Debra)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/04 10:28 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities And Exchange Commission. Raymond J. Pirrello, Jr. waiver sent on 12/11/2023, answer due 2/9/2024. (Jaroslawicz, Debra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/03 1:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities And Exchange Commission. JL Rivera Enterprises LTD. waiver sent on 12/11/2023, answer due 2/9/2024. (Jaroslawicz, Debra)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/03 1:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities And Exchange Commission. Joseph Rivera waiver sent on 12/11/2023, answer due 2/9/2024. (Jaroslawicz, Debra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/02 9:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities And Exchange Commission. Pre IPO Marketing Inc. served on 12/26/2023, answer due 1/16/2024. (Jaroslawicz, Debra)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/02 9:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities And Exchange Commission. Anthony DiTucci served on 12/26/2023, answer due 1/16/2024. (Jaroslawicz, Debra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/20 4:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities And Exchange Commission. Late Stage Asset Management, LLC waiver sent on 12/12/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (Jaroslawicz, Debra)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/20 4:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities And Exchange Commission. Marcello Follano waiver sent on 12/12/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (Jaroslawicz, Debra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 12/19 2:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Robert Cassino, Anthony DiTucci, JL Rivera Enterprises LTD., Pre IPO Marketing Inc., Joseph Rivera. (MLR)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
8 8 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/15 3:11 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Securities And Exchange Commission (He, Zheng)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
7 7 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 12/08 9:44 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CL)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12/08 9:35 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Fri 12/08 9:44 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No summons provided, please submit summons. The event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
6 6 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 12/06 5:12 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/06 2:51 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Securities And Exchange Commission (Jaroslawicz, Debra)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/06 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zheng He on behalf of Securities And Exchange Commission (aty to be noticed) (He, Zheng)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/06 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Karen M. Lee on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Lee, Karen)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/06 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Debra Jaroslawicz on behalf of Securities And Exchange Commission (aty to be noticed) (Jaroslawicz, Debra)
Related: [-]
1 1 35 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/06 10:44 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Securities And Exchange Commission. (Apps, Antonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/06 1:57 PM
Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit A COMPLETED SECOND PAGE(Not the Instruction Page) Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
Related: [-]