California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kimberly J Mueller
Referred: Allison Claire
Case #: 2:23-cv-02848
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2023
Terminated:Feb 01, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2024 1:16 AM PDT
Movant
Kenneth Jacoby
Represented By
Jean-Paul Jassy
Jassy Vick Carolan LLP
contact info
Jordyn E. Ostroff
Jassy Vick Carolan LLP
contact info
Meghan Elyse Fenzel
Jassy Vick Carolan LLP
contact info
Respondent
Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System
Represented By
Catherine Saba Giering, PHV
contact info
Vickie Pochelle Whitney
Attorney General'S Office For The State Of California
contact info
Andrew Blanchfield, PHV
Keogh, Cox & Wilson, Ltd.
contact info

GPO Jan 23 2024
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/22/24 GRANTING 7 Request to Seal. (Benson, A.)
GPO Jan 24 2024
MINUTE ORDER issued by Deputy Clerk J. Donati for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/24/2024: The court has determined that it inadvertently served the incorrect text version of the Order Setting Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference when this case was first opened. The text of the order that should have been served is attached here. To the extent the substantive provisions of this order conflict with the previously issued order, this order controls. Counsel should carefully review this version of the order and note changes applicable to future events in this case. By providing a copy of the correct text of the order, the court is not setting any new dates or changing and dates previously set. SO ORDERED. (Donati, J)
GPO Feb 01 2024
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/01/2024 GRANTING 1 Motion for Protective Order.(Lopez, K)
GPO Feb 08 2024
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/7/2024 GRANTING 18 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Andrew Blanchfield, PHV for Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Woodson, A)
GPO Feb 08 2024
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/7/2024 GRANTING 19 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Catherine Saba Giering, PHV for Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Woodson, A)
GPO Feb 16 2024
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/15/24 AUTHORIZING the production of the transcript. (Licea Chavez, V)

Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
24 24 misc Sealed Event Tue 02/20 12:43 PM
SEALED EVENT (Argento, E.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Fri 02/16 10:08 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/15/24 AUTHORIZING the production of the transcript. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
22 22 misc Transcript Ordering Form Mon 02/12 8:54 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System for proceedings held on 1/31/2024 before Judge Allison Claire. Court Reporter ECRO Sacramento. (Whitney, Vickie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/08 12:05 PM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/7/2024 GRANTING19 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Catherine Saba Giering, PHV for Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/08 11:44 AM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/7/2024 GRANTING18 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Andrew Blanchfield, PHV for Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
19 19 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Wed 02/07 10:59 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System for attorney Catherine Saba Giering to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11318152) (Whitney, Vickie) Modified on 2/7/2024 (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Wed 02/07 10:57 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System for attorney Andrew Blanchfield to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11318118)(Whitney, Vickie) Modified on 2/7/2024 (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
17 17 misc Transcript Ordering Form Tue 02/06 11:50 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 1/31/2024 before Judge Allison Claire. Court Reporter ECRO Sacramento. (Argento, E.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
16 16 7 pgs order Order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 02/01 12:12 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/01/2024 GRANTING1 Motion for Protective Order.(Lopez, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
15 15 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 01/31 2:56 PM
MINUTES for MOTION HEARING proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire held on 1/31/2024. All parties present. Court and counsel discussed the pending1 Motion for Protective Order. Matter submitted. Court order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Jean Jassy present. Defendants Counsel Vickie Whitney present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Anderson, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
14 14 5 pgs order Order Wed 01/24 11:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Deputy Clerk J. Donati for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/24/2024: The court has determined that it inadvertently served the incorrect text version of the Order Setting Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference when this case was first opened. The text of the order that should have been served is attached here. To the extent the substantive provisions of this order conflict with the previously issued order, this order controls. Counsel should carefully review this version of the order and note changes applicable to future events in this case. By providing a copy of the correct text of the order, the court is not setting any new dates or changing and dates previously set. SO ORDERED. (Donati, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
13 13 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 01/23 11:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/23/2024 re1 Motion for Protective Order. The parties are hereby notified that the1 Motion for Protective Order will be held via Zoom on 01/31/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Please contact the Courtroom Deputy Jonathan Anderson by phone (916) 930-4199 or by email at janderson@caed.uscourts.gov one day prior to the scheduled motion hearing to receive the Zoom information. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Sealed Event Tue 01/23 11:14 AM
SEALED EVENT (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealed event,
Att: 2 Sealed event,
Att: 3 Sealed event
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Request to Seal Tue 01/23 11:05 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/22/24 GRANTING7 Request to Seal. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
10 10 misc Declaration Thu 01/18 10:53 AM
DECLARATION of Jordyn Ostroff re9 Statement,,,. (Ostroff, Jordyn)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Statement Thu 01/18 9:43 AM
STATEMENT of Joint Statement of Kenneth Jacoby and ULS by Movant Kenneth Jacoby re1 Motion for Protective Order.(Jassy, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Jean-Paul Jassy,
Att: 2 Exhibit Jassy Decl. Ex. 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Jassy Decl. Ex. 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Jassy Decl. Ex. 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit Jassy Decl. Ex. 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit Jassy Decl. Ex. 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit Jassy Decl. Ex. 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit Jassy Decl. Ex. 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit Jassy Decl. Ex. 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit Jassy Decl. Ex. 9,
Att: 11 Declaration Declaration of C. Giering,
Att: 12 Exhibit ULS Ex. 1,
Att: 13 Exhibit ULS Ex. 2,
Att: 14 Exhibit ULS Ex. 3,
Att: 15 Exhibit ULS Ex. 4 - under seal,
Att: 16 Exhibit ULS Ex. 5 - under seal,
Att: 17 Exhibit ULS Ex. 6 - under seal,
Att: 18 Exhibit ULS Ex. 7 - under seal,
Att: 19 Exhibit ULS Ex. 8
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/17 1:22 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jordyn E. Ostroff on behalf of Kenneth Jacoby. Attorney Ostroff, Jordyn E. added. (Ostroff, Jordyn)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Notice of Request to Seal Document(s) Wed 01/17 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System. Attorney Whitney, Vickie Pochelle added. (Whitney, Vickie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
6 6 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 01/10 4:32 PM
MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY by Meghan Fenzel by Kenneth Jacoby. (Fenzel, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 01/04 1:28 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/3/2024 RELATING 6 Case(s) 2:23-MC-403 KJM AC and 2:23-CV-2848 MCE JDP REASSIGNING CASE 2:23-CV-2848 to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:23-CV-2848 KJM AC Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Friday, December 08, 2023
4 4 service Certificate / Proof of Service Fri 12/08 12:30 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Kenneth Jacoby re2 Notice of Related Case(s). (Jassy, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Certificate / Proof of Service Fri 12/08 11:49 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Kenneth Jacoby re1 Motion for Protective Order. (Jassy, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case Wed 12/06 7:29 PM
NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:23-mc-00403-KJM-AC, 2:23-cv-02848-MCE-JDP by Kenneth Jacoby. (Jassy, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Protective Order Wed 12/06 11:06 AM
MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Deposition Subpoena Directed to Journalist Kenneth Jacoby by Kenneth Jacoby.(Jassy, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition Subpoena,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee Wed 12/06 11:10 AM
PAYMENT for miscellaneous case filing fee in the amount of $ 52, receipt number ACAEDC-11225435. (Jassy, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
misc Miscellaneous Case Wed 12/06 2:27 PM
NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED Administrative Deposition Subpoena. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]