Streets v. Mangena et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Analisa Torres |
Referred: | Stewart D Aaron |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-10648 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2024 4:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dreamer HQ Inc.
2113 KINGS HWAY 5B
Brooklyn, NY 11229 |
|
Defendant
POTB Enterprises LLC
14150 NE 20TH ST #492
Bellevue, WA 98007 |
|
Defendant
Daniel Mangena
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Financial Freedom in a Box
|
|
Plaintiff
Theodosia Billie Streets
address redacted
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 19, 2025 | ||
89 | 89
![]() CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:88 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. in favor of Theodosia Billie Streets against Daniel Mangena, Dreamer HQ Inc. in the amount of $ 486,579.22. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated March 18, 2025, the Court adopts the Report & Recommendation in its entirety. Streets' motion at ECF No. 78 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Judgment is entered for Streets against Mangena and Dreamer HQ, jointly and severally, in the amount of $140,890.00 in compensatory damages, plus pre-judgment interest at the rate of nine percent per annum from September 17, 2022, until the date on which judgment is entered in the amount of $31,752.36. Streets is further awarded punitive damages against Mangena and Dreamer HQ, jointly and severally, in the amount of $281,780.00, as wellas costs in the amount of $405.00; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Tammi M Hellwig on 03/19/2025) (nd) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
88 | 88
![]() ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for87 Report and Recommendations,78 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Theodosia Billie Streets. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS Judge Aaron's R&R in its entirety. Streets' motion at ECF No. 78 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment for Streets against Mangena and Dreamer HQ, jointly and severally, in the amount of $140,890.00 in compensatory damages, plus pre-judgment interest at the rate of nine percent per annum from September 17, 2022, until the date on which judgment is entered. Streets is further awarded punitive damages against Mangena and Dreamer HQ, jointly and severally, in the amount of $281,780.00, as well as costs in the amount of $405.00. Upon entering judgment, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/18/2025) (jjc) |