Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Judge:Ronald A White
Referred: D Edward Snow
Case #: 6:23-cv-00412
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2023
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Defendant
Bradley Clark
Plaintiff
Zechariah Michael Gilbert Churchill

GPO Feb 12 2024
OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White denying 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (acg, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
32 32 order Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) Wed 01/08 2:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow granting31 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s). Attorney Jennifer Isaacs is deemed withdrawn. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
31 31 motion Withdraw Attorney(s) Tue 01/07 3:09 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by Bradley Clark Responses due by 1/21/2025(Isaacs, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
misc Filing Fee - Partial Payment Fri 12/20 11:31 AM
PARTIAL FILING FEES Paid on 12/20/2024 in the amount of $7.30, receipt number 22859. (mdc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
30 30 order Ruling on Motion to Appeal in Forma Pauperis Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s) Tue 10/29 10:32 AM
OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White : Granting26 Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis. Appeal Filing Fee due by 11/19/2024 in the amount of $21.02 (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 30 replaced on 10/29/2024) (acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 10/29 9:45 AM
ACCOUNT STATEMENT of Prisoner Trust Fund by Zechariah Michael Gilbert Churchill (acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
28 28 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA Thu 10/03 2:08 PM
USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal in USCA Case Number 24-7065 Related [+] (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
27 27 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s) Tue 09/10 10:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: Directing plaintiff to submit within fourteen (14) days a Statement of Institutional Accounts form for a six-month period completed by the appropriate facility official. Failure to submit a proper Statement of Institutional Accounts as directed will result in dismissal of this action. The Court Clerk is directed to send plaintiff and the trust fund officer at his facility copies of this minute order and of the court's Statement of Institutional Accounts form(acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
26 26 motion Appeal in Forma Pauperis Thu 08/15 11:45 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis Related [+] by Zechariah Michael Gilbert Churchill Responses due by 8/29/2024(acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
25 25 appeal Appeal Number Information from Circuit Court Thu 08/01 9:37 AM
APPEAL NUMBER INFORMATION from Circuit Court assigning Case Number 24-7065 Related [+] (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
24 24 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Wed 07/31 2:21 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to U.S. Court of Appeals Related [+] (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
Monday, July 29, 2024
23 23 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s) Mon 07/29 11:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow, Upon review of the file in this case, the Court finds that the plaintiff has not submitted a proper motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis for appeal purposes or paid the $605.00 filing fee. The plaintiff is directed to submit a properly executed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis for the appeal, with original signature and have the Trust Fund Officer at his/her facility complete (with an original signature) the Required Certification (Page 4) and provide a current 6-month financial accounting statement and return the completed motion to the Office of the Clerk or pay the filing fee of $605.00 within 20 days or by 8/12/24. The Clerk is directed to provide the plaintiff with a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis form and an instruction sheet.(acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
22 22 appeal Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Mon 07/29 11:21 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Circuit Court Related [+] by Zechariah Michael Gilbert Churchill (acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 21 Judgment, 20 Minute Order,,,
Friday, July 12, 2024
21 21 order 03 - Judgment Fri 07/12 2:45 PM
JUDGMENT by District Judge Ronald A. White dismissing action without prejudice (terminates case) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
20 20 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 07/12 2:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: On June 14, 2024, the Court directed Plaintiff to respond by June 28, 2024 (Dkt. No. 19 ) to Defendant Bradley Clark's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No.13 ) and Clark's motion to deem confessed the motion to dismiss (Dkt. No.16 ). Because Plaintiff has failed to respond as directed, this action is dismissed for Plaintiffs failure to comply with the Court's order. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
19 19 order Ruling on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Deadlines - Set/Reset All Motion and R&R Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Fri 06/14 11:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow: On June 4, 2024, the Court directed Plaintiff to show cause why Defendant Bradley Clark's motion to deem confessed (Dkt.16 ) Clark's motion to dismiss (Dkt.13 ) should not be granted (Dkt. 17 ). Plaintiff filed a response on June 12, 2024, alleging he never received Clark's motion to deem confessed, and Clark violated his rights (Dkt.18 ). Plaintiff is granted fourteen (14) days to file a response to Clark's motion to dismiss (Dkt.13 ) and Clark's motion to deem confessed the motion to dismiss (Dkt16 ). The Court Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the motion to deem confessed the motion to dismiss (Dkt.16 ) and a copy of the docket sheet for this case. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
18 18 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 06/12 11:11 AM
Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause Related [+] by Zechariah Michael Gilbert Churchill. (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] (17) Minute Order by Judge Ronald A. White - Directing Party to Show Cause
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
17 17 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party to Show Cause Documents - Link to Document(s) Tue 06/04 9:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White directing Plaintiff to show cause in writing within fourteen (14) days why Defendant Bradley Clark's Motion to Deem Confessed (Dkt.16 ) Clark's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt.13 ) should not be granted. Failure to show cause as directed will result in dismissal of this action. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
misc Filing Fee - Partial Payment Fri 04/19 1:04 PM
PARTIAL FILING FEES Paid on 4/19/2024 in the amount of $4.72, receipt number 22178. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/26 4:01 PM
MOTION to Deem His Motion to Dismiss Confessed Related [+] by Bradley Clark Responses due by 4/9/2024(Isaacs, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 13 MOTION to Dismiss
15 15 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 03/26 3:59 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jennifer Isaacs on behalf of Bradley Clark (Isaacs, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
misc Filing Fee - Partial Payment Fri 02/23 2:25 PM
PARTIAL FILING FEES Paid on 2/23/2024 in the amount of $10.02, receipt number 21984. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
14 14 order Ruling on Motion for Appointment of Counsel Mon 02/12 11:09 AM
OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White denying3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss Fri 01/26 3:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Bradley Clark Responses due by 2/9/2024(Whitson, Jamison)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 01/26 3:15 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jamison C. Whitson on behalf of Bradley Clark (Whitson, Jamison)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 01/26 3:13 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Howard T. Morrow on behalf of Bradley Clark (Morrow, Howard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
misc Filing Fee - Partial Payment Thu 01/18 10:58 AM
PARTIAL FILING FEES Paid on 1/18/2024 in the amount of $10.24, receipt number 21876 by Zechariah Michael Gilbert Churchill (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/08 3:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Bradley Clark - Served on 1/5/2024. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued Thu 12/28 10:29 AM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Bradley Clark (acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Issuance/USM Service of Summons Thu 12/28 10:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow, directing the Clerk of Court to issue Civil Summons for the named defendant(s) and to forward the issued Summons to the U.S. Marshal for service. The plaintiff has been granted In Forma Pauperis status. Related [+] (acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
7 7 misc Letter Tue 12/26 3:20 PM
LETTER by Zechariah Michael Gilbert Churchill. (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
6 6 misc Letter Mon 12/18 1:14 PM
LETTER from Court Clerk to Plaintiff: 285 forms(acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee - Partial Payment Mon 12/18 12:25 PM
PARTIAL FILING FEES Paid on 12/18/2023 in the amount of $12.63, receipt number 21787 by Zechariah Michael Gilbert Churchill (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
5 5 order Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s) Thu 12/07 2:17 PM
ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White : Granting2 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; Filing Fee due by 12/28/2023 in the amount of $12.63. Related [+] (acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
4 4 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Referred to MJ Thu 12/07 11:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White, referring case to Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC § 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-23-412-RAW-DES. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appointment of Counsel Thu 12/07 11:21 AM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Zechariah Michael Gilbert Chruchhill Responses due by 12/21/2023(acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed in Forma Pauperis Thu 12/07 11:21 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Zechariah Michael Gilbert Chruchhill Responses due by 12/21/2023(acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/07 11:19 AM
COMPLAINT against Bradley Clark by Zechariah Michael Gilbert Chruchhill (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/7/2023) (acg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]