Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Zachary C Bolitho
Case #: 3:23-cv-24744
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2023
Terminated:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2024 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
FROST-ARNETT COMPANY
Represented By
CHELSEY RAE PANKRATZ
Frost Echols Llc - Rock Hill Sc
contact info
Defendant
SACRED HEART HEALTH SYSTEM INC
Represented By
SCOTT S GALLAGHER
Smith Gambrell & Russell Llp - Jacksonville Fl
contact info
RICHARD DEAN RIVERA
Smith Gambrell & Russell Llp - Jacksonville Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
OLVIN ARAUJO ROJAS
Represented By
MONICA AMOR
Amor Law Firm Pa - Doral Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
22 22 order Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion) Fri 04/11 3:42 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to 21 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL. (jfj)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 04/11 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL.This case is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment of dismissal with prejudice and close the file. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 04/11/25. (jfj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (AMOR, MONICA)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-8393166.), filed by Olvin Araujo Rojas. (AMOR, MONICA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Creditor Letters from Ascension Sacred Heart Pensacola,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Creditor Letters from Ascension Medical Group Sacred Heart,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Collection Letter from Frost-Arnett dated 12/06/2022,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D-Collection Letter from Frost-Arnett dated December 13, 2022,
Att: 5 Summons-Defendant Frost-Arnett,
Att: 6 Summons-Defendant Sacred Heart