California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 4:23-cv-06333
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2023
Case in other court:Santa Clara County Superior Court, 23-CV-418962
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
McGee Air Services Inc.
Represented By
Paul Scott Cowie
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Patricia Melody Jeng
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
John David Ellis
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ana Ayala
Represented By
Rachel Corinne Hallam
Kletter Law
contact info
Daniel Bronstein
Kletter Law
contact info
Cary S. Kletter
Kletter Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Coreen Silverie
Represented By
Rachel Corinne Hallam
Kletter Law
contact info
Daniel Bronstein
Kletter Law
contact info
Cary S. Kletter
Kletter Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Nancy Tapia
Represented By
Rachel Corinne Hallam
Kletter Law
contact info
Daniel Bronstein
Kletter Law
contact info
Cary S. Kletter
Kletter Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Bobby Vargas
Represented By
Rachel Corinne Hallam
Kletter Law
contact info
Daniel Bronstein
Kletter Law
contact info
Cary S. Kletter
Kletter Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Tue 03/12 4:23 PM
ORDER RELATING CASE to 23-cv-02705-RFL. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 3/12/2024. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
14 14 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Thu 03/07 12:16 PM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-cv-02705-RFL, Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/7/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 03/07 12:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Parties are hereby notified that the initial case management conference previously set for 3/12/2024 is continued to 5/14/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, this proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint case management statement due by 5/7/2024. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom guidance and setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 03/05 3:53 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint 26(f) Report and Initial Case Management Conference Statement . (Jeng, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
11 11 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 02/21 5:24 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kletter, Cary)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 02/21 11:53 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jeng, Patricia)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018 Wed 02/21 7:34 AM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 01/16 1:27 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ana Ayala, Coreen Silverie, Nancy Tapia, Bobby Vargas.. (Kletter, Cary)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 01/08 12:30 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 1/22/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 12/21 9:28 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by McGee Air Services Inc... (Cowie, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
5 5 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 12/08 1:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McGee Air Services Inc. re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,2 Certificate of Interested Entities,1 Notice of Removal, (Cowie, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 12/08 12:35 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 12/07 3:13 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/21/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 12/07 3:04 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by McGee Air Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alaska Air Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Alaska Airlines, Inc. for McGee Air Services Inc.. (Cowie, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 12/07 3:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 23-CV-418962. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-18915628). Filed by McGee Air Services Inc..(Cowie, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet