New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-00996
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2023
Last checked: Friday Dec 08, 2023 2:30 AM EST
Defendant
Damion Wayne Scarlett (1)
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 12/08/2023 3:46 AM EST
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
Arrest (Rule 40) of Damion Wayne Scarlett (RI)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs REMOVAL COMPLAINT by USA as to Damion Wayne Scarlett. (RI)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay:Arraignment as to Damion Wayne Scarlett held on 11/8/2023. Appearances AUSA Adam Toporovsky; Charles Millioen for Mr. Scarlett. Mr. Scarlett waived his right to an identity hearing. Order setting conditions of release set. (RI)
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearing by Damion Wayne Scarlett (RI)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER: This order is entered pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) to confirm the prosecution's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations as to Damion Wayne Scarlett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/8/2023. (RI)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/8/2023. (RI)
Related: [-]