Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Leo T Sorokin
Case #: 1:23-mc-91636
CauseMotion to extend time to indict
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2023
Terminated:Dec 27, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Tue 04/09 12:20 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
6 6 motion Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Mon 04/08 6:50 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to May 7, 2024 Responses due by 4/22/2024 (Cheng, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Extend Time to Indict
Friday, March 08, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Fri 03/08 8:20 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to 4/6/2024. ALLOWED. (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
4 4 motion Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Thu 03/07 4:24 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to 4/6/2024 Responses due by 3/21/2024 (Cheng, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Extension of Time to Indict
Friday, December 08, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Fri 12/08 1:18 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered: re1 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to 1/14/2024. ALLOWED. (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 12/08 12:13 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. (Belpedio, Lisa)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Fri 12/08 9:54 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to 1/14/2024 Responses due by 12/22/2023 (Cheng, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order