California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 3:23-cv-06342
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2023
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo, 23-CIV-03095
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 05, 2024 1:36 AM PDT
Defendant
Natera, Inc.
Represented By
Paige E. Adaskaveg
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky And Popeo, P.C.
contact info
Geoffrey A. Friedman
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, P.C.
contact info
Arameh Zargham O'Boyle
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, P.C.
contact info
Daniel J. Herling
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo P.C.
contact info
Adam Michael Tschop
Natera, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Calcaterra
Represented By
Patricia I. Avery
Wolf Popper LLP
contact info
Alexander Shahin Vahdat
Berman Tabacco
contact info
Philip Marcel Black
Wolf Popper LLP
contact info
Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Berman Tabacco
contact info
Kristin J. Moody
Berman Tabacco
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Copley
Represented By
Patricia I. Avery
Wolf Popper LLP
contact info
Alexander Shahin Vahdat
Berman Tabacco
contact info
Philip Marcel Black
Wolf Popper LLP
contact info
Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Berman Tabacco
contact info
Kristin J. Moody
Berman Tabacco
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 01/03 5:13 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (L.R. 6-1) filed by Rachel Calcaterra, Elizabeth Copley.(Black, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Philip M. Black
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/02 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Marcel Black (Black, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
9 9 respoth Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 12/22 1:50 PM
Answer in Part to Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint by Natera, Inc.. (O'Boyle, Arameh) Modified on 12/22/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Fri 12/22 1:38 PM
Notice of Motion and MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint in Part filed by Natera, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 2/22/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Responses due by 1/5/2024. Replies due by 1/12/2024.(O'Boyle, Arameh) Modified on 12/22/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
7 7 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 12/15 11:20 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Natera, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint By Not More Than 30 days (L.R. 6-1) filed by Natera, Inc., Elizabeth Copley and Rachel Calcaterra. (Friedman, Geoffrey) Modified on 12/15/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 12/08 2:08 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 2/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 12/08 2:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Natera, Inc. re2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,1 Notice of Removal,,,3 Jury Demand (O'Boyle, Arameh)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 12/08 1:47 PM
Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc Jury Demand Fri 12/08 1:30 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Natera, Inc.. (O'Boyle, Arameh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 12/08 1:29 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Natera, Inc. (Defendant Natera, Inc.s Certification Of Conflicts And Interested Entities Or Persons Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 & Civil L.R. 3-15) (O'Boyle, Arameh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 12/08 1:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand Of Action Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, And 1446 from Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Mateo. Their case number is 23-CIV-03095. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-18919078). Filed by Natera, Inc..(O'Boyle, Arameh) Modified on 12/8/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 ( First Amended Class Action Complaint in Superior Court Action),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Second Amended Class Action Complaint, ECF 55),
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (Dismissal Order, ECF 64),
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 (Copley's Response to Order to Show Causes re CAFA Jurisdiction, ECF 40),
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 (All Process, Pleadings, and Orders in Superior Court Action),
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet