California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 2:23-cv-10322
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 05, 2024 1:38 AM PDT
Defendant
Far Eastern New Century Corporation
Represented By
Michael D Kaminski
Foley And Lardner
contact info
Bradley Roush
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Jean-Paul Ciardullo
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Liane M. Peterson
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Daniel P. Flaherty
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Multi Plastics Inc.
Represented By
Michael D Kaminski
Foley And Lardner
contact info
Bradley Roush
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Jean-Paul Ciardullo
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Liane M. Peterson
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Daniel P. Flaherty
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SK Microworks America Inc.
Represented By
Andrea Levenson
Haynes And Boone LLP
contact info
Jonathan W Hallman
Haynes And Boone LLP
contact info
Jason T. Lao
Haynes And Boone LLP
contact info
Marron E. Frith
Haynes And Boone LLP
contact info
Kenneth G. Parker
Haynes And Boone, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
185 185 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 05/20 3:47 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jean-Paul Ciardullo counsel for Defendants Far Eastern New Century Corporation, Multi Plastics Inc.. Michael D. Kaminski is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Far Eastern New Century Corporation and Multi-Plastics, Inc.. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
184 184 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 05/19 4:59 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims 167 filed by Counter Defendant SK Microworks Co., Ltd.. (Levenson, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
183 183 stip Continue Fri 05/16 11:36 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue and Modify Case Schedule filed by Plaintiff//Counterclaim Defendant SK Microworks America Inc., SK Microworks Co., Ltd..(Levenson, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
182 182 attyseal Sealed Declaration in Support Tue 05/13 10:11 PM
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaims and First Amended Answers & Exhibits under seal179 filed by Plaintiff SK Microworks America Inc., Counter Defendants SK Microworks America Inc., SK Microworks America Inc., SK Microworks Co., Ltd..(Levenson, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Unredacted Document Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Unredacted Document Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Unredacted Document Exhibit E