Member Case
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-11962

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:23-bk-11966
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2023

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Near Intelligence Pte. Ltd.

,
Represented By
Edmon L. Morton
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
8 8 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 05/29 2:37 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 23-11966 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Plan Administrator and Litigation Trustee. (Sandler, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
7 7 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 01/08 8:46 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. (REDACTED) Filed by Near Intelligence Pte. Ltd.. Related [+]
Related: [-] il, Shane
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 01/08 8:45 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. (REDACTED) Filed by Near Intelligence Pte. Ltd.. Related [+]
Related: [-] il, Shane
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 01/08 8:43 AM
[SEALED] Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Near Intelligence Pte. Ltd.. Related [+]
Related: [-] il, Shane
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 01/08 8:42 AM
[SEALED] Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Near Intelligence Pte. Ltd.. Related [+]
Related: [-] il, Shane
Monday, December 11, 2023
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Mon 12/11 3:21 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Near Intelligence, Inc., Near Intelligence LLC, Near North America, Inc., and Near Intelligence Pte. Ltd. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Near Intelligence, Inc., Case No. 23-11962 (TMH), should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. Signed on 12/11/2023 (AMH)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 12/08 6:25 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-11966 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11366333, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 12/08 4:01 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Near Intelligence Pte. Ltd.. (Morton, Edmon)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Fri 12/08 4:34 PM
Judge Thomas M Horan added to case (MMD)
Related: [-]