Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Referred: Edwin G Torres
Case #: 1:23-cv-24645
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2023
Terminated:Aug 07, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 05, 2024 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Nathalie M. Ohanian
Represented By
Catherine Elizabeth Barton
contact info
Lindsay Dennis Swiger
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Cimone Destiny Campbell
1600 NE 1st Avenue, Apt. #2911
Miami, FL 33132
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Maximus Federal
Terminated: 03/15/2024
Represented By
Catherine Elizabeth Barton
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
50 50 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion to Reopen Case Order on Motion for Clarification Fri 04/25 7:53 AM
ORDER denying49 Motion for Reconsideration to Reopen Case and Clarification. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
49 49 motion Reconsideration Reopen Case Clarification Thu 04/24 8:10 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration to Reopen Case and Clarification re48 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Reopen Case Related [+] by Cimone Destiny Campbell (Address Updated). (pcs)
Related: [-] sponses due by 5/7/2025.