New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Case #: 1:23-cv-10738
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 05, 2024 4:50 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Nityo Infotech Corporation
Represented By
Dustin Benjamin Bowman
Steven Zalewski & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc.
Represented By
Emilie Beth Cooper
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nityo Infotech Corporation
Represented By
Dustin Benjamin Bowman
Steven Zalewski & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc.
Represented By
Emilie Beth Cooper
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
46 46 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 03/28 12:04 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
45 45 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/05 3:21 PM
DECLARATION of Dustin Bowman in Opposition re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Nityo Infotech Corporation..(Bowman, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - JLL Internal Email Communications Regarding Fee Calculations
44 44 respm Affirmation in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/05 2:34 PM
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AFFIRMATION of Dustin Bowman in Opposition re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Nityo Infotech Corporation..(Bowman, Dustin) Modified on 3/5/2025 (db)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - JLL Internal Email Communications Regarding Fee Calculations
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error Wed 03/05 3:17 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Dustin Benjamin Bowman to RE-FILE Document 44 Affirmation in Opposition to Motion. Use the event type Declaration in Opposition of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents, then link to Motion). (db)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
43 43 23 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/28 9:14 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Nityo Infotech Corporation..(Bowman, Dustin)
Related: [-]
42 42 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/28 9:13 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Response to Statement of Undisputed Material Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1 . Document filed by Nityo Infotech Corporation..(Bowman, Dustin)
Related: [-]
41 41 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/28 9:12 PM
DECLARATION of Akash Tiwari in Opposition re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Nityo Infotech Corporation..(Bowman, Dustin)
Related: [-]
40 40 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/28 9:10 PM
DECLARATION of Dustin Bowman in Opposition re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Nityo Infotech Corporation..(Bowman, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
39 39 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 01/09 6:40 PM
DECLARATION of Emilie B. Cooper in Support re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 JLL's Rule 7.1 Statement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 JLL Real Estate License Details,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Transcript of Deposition of Peter Riguardi - November 1 2024,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Transcript of Deposition of Mitchell Konsker - November 4 2024,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 Transcript of Deposition of Simon Landmann - November 11 2024,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 Nityo's Rule 7.1 Statement,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 Transcript of Deposition of Akash Tiwari - October 15 2024,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8.1 Email from Nityo to JLL on September 17 2022 attaching Overlease,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8.2 Email from Nityo to JLL on September 17 2022 attaching Overlease,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8.3 Email from Nityo to JLL on September 17 2022 attaching Overlease,
Att: 11 Exhibit 8.4 Email from Nityo to JLL on September 17 2022 attaching Overlease,
Att: 12 Exhibit 8.5 Email from Nityo to JLL on September 17 2022 attaching Overlease,
Att: 13 Exhibit 8.6 Email from Nityo to JLL on September 17 2022 attaching Overlease,
Att: 14 Exhibit 8.7 Email from Nityo to JLL on September 17 2022 attaching Overlease,
Att: 15 Exhibit 8.8 Email from Nityo to JLL on September 17 2022 attaching Overlease,
Att: 16 Exhibit 9 JLL Complaint, ECF No 1,
Att: 17 Exhibit 10 Nityo Answer, ECF No 12,
Att: 18 Exhibit 11 Sublease,
Att: 19 Exhibit 12 Transcript of Deposition of Naveen Kumar - December 10 2024,
Att: 20 Exhibit 13.1 Email from Publicis to Nityo on February 28 2022 attaching Cooperation Agreement, Guaranty, and Sublease,
Att: 21 Exhibit 13.2 Email from Publicis to Nityo on February 28 2022 attaching Cooperation Agreement, Guaranty, and Sublease,
Att: 22 Exhibit 14 Email from Nityo to Publicis on July 3 2023,
Att: 23 Exhibit 15 Email from Nityo to JLL on October 12 2022 attaching business presentation,
Att: 24 Exhibit 16 Email from Publicis to JLL on June 27 2022,
Att: 25 Exhibit 17 Email from Publicis to Nityo on July 6 2022,
Att: 26 Exhibit 18 Email from JLL sent internally of July 5 2022,
Att: 27 Exhibit 19 Email from JLL to Nityo on July 6 2022,
Att: 28 Exhibit 20 Email appointment from JLL to Nityo on July 6 2022,
Att: 29 Exhibit 21 Email from Nityo to JLL on July 14 2022,
Att: 30 Exhibit 22 Email appointment from JLL to Nityo on July 18 2022,
Att: 31 Exhibit 23 JLL Presentation to Nityo regarding 1675 Broadway,
Att: 32 Exhibit 24 Email from JLL to Nityo on July 19 2022 with attachment,
Att: 33 Exhibit 25 Email from JLL to Nityo on July 21 2022 attaching revised Services Agreement,
Att: 34 Exhibit 26 Email from JLL to Nityo on July 22 2022 attaching executed Services Agreement,
Att: 35 Exhibit 27 Services Agreement,
Att: 36 Exhibit 28 Email from JLL to Nityo on August 11 2022,
Att: 37 Exhibit 29 Email from JLL to Rudin on August 8 2022,
Att: 38 Exhibit 30.1 Email from Friction Design to JLL on October 26 2022 with attachments,
Att: 39 Exhibit 30.2 Email from Friction Design to JLL on October 26 2022 with attachments,
Att: 40 Exhibit 31 Email from Nityo to JLL on November 2 2022,
Att: 41 Exhibit 32 Email from JLL to Gina Talbot on November 16 2022,
Att: 42 Exhibit 33 Email from JLL sent internally on January 24 2023,
Att: 43 Exhibit 34.1 Email from JLL sent internally on April 19 2023,
Att: 44 Exhibit 34.2 Email from JLL sent internally on April 19 2023,
Att: 45 Exhibit 35 Email from JLL to Nityo on July 26 2022,
Att: 46 Exhibit 36 Email from JLL to Nityo on October 24 2022 with attachment,
Att: 47 Exhibit 37.1 Email from JLL to Nityo on October 3 2022 with attachments,
Att: 48 Exhibit 37.2 Email from JLL to Nityo on October 3 2022 with attachments,
Att: 49 Exhibit 38 Email from JLL to Nityo on October 3 2022,
Att: 50 Exhibit 39 Email from JLL to Nityo on August 8 2022,
Att: 51 Exhibit 40 Email from JLL sent internally on August 11 2022 with attachment,
Att: 52 Exhibit 41 Email from Nityo to JLL on November 3 2022,
Att: 53 Exhibit 42 Email from Nityo to JLL on November 16 2022,
Att: 54 Exhibit 43.1 Email from JLL to Nityo on July 28 2023 with attachment,
Att: 55 Exhibit 43.2 Email from JLL to Nityo on July 28 2023 with attachment,
Att: 56 Exhibit 44 Email from Nityo to JLL on October 24 2022 with attachment,
Att: 57 Exhibit 45 Email from JLL to Nityo on October 27 2022 with attachment,
Att: 58 Exhibit 46 Email from JLL to Nityo on March 13 2023 regarding PANY negotiations with attachments,
Att: 59 Exhibit 47 Email from JLL to Nityo on March 16 2023 regarding PANY negotiations,
Att: 60 Exhibit 48 Email from JLL to Nityo on March 30 2023 with attachments,
Att: 61 Exhibit 49 Email from JLL to Savills on April 6 2023 with attachments,
Att: 62 Exhibit 50 Email from JLL to Nityo and JLL on May 5 2023 regarding PANY negotiations with attachment,
Att: 63 Exhibit 51 Email from JLL to Nityo and JLL on May 8 2023 regarding PANY negotiations,
Att: 64 Exhibit 52 Email from JLL to Nityo on June 1 2023 regarding PANY negotiations,
Att: 65 Exhibit 53 Email from Nityo to JLL on June 1 2023 regarding PANY negotiations,
Att: 66 Exhibit 54 Email from JLL to Nityo on October 7 2022 attaching sublease report,
Att: 67 Exhibit 55 Email from JLL to Nityo on October 14 2022 attaching sublease report,
Att: 68 Exhibit 56 Email from JLL to Nityo on October 28 2022 attaching sublease report,
Att: 69 Exhibit 57 Email from JLL to Nityo on November 4 2022 attaching sublease report,
Att: 70 Exhibit 58 Email from JLL to Nityo on December 9 2022 attaching sublease report,
Att: 71 Exhibit 59 Email from JLL to Nityo on December 16 2022 attaching sublease report,
Att: 72 Exhibit 60 Email from JLL to Nityo on December 23 2022 attaching sublease report,
Att: 73 Exhibit 61 Email from JLL to Nityo on January 9 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 74 Exhibit 62 Email from JLL to Nityo on January 20 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 75 Exhibit 63 Email from JLL to Nityo on January 27 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 76 Exhibit 64 Email from JLL to Nityo on February 3 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 77 Exhibit 65 Email from JLL to Nityo on February 10 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 78 Exhibit 66 Email from JLL to Nityo on February 17 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 79 Exhibit 67 Email from JLL to Nityo on March 3 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 80 Exhibit 68 Email from JLL to Nityo on March 10 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 81 Exhibit 69 Email from JLL to Nityo on March 17 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 82 Exhibit 70 Email from JLL to Nityo on March 24 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 83 Exhibit 71 Email from JLL to Nityo on March 31 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 84 Exhibit 72 Email from JLL to Nityo on April 28 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 85 Exhibit 73 Email from JLL to Nityo on May 12 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 86 Exhibit 74 Email from JLL to Nityo on June 2 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 87 Exhibit 75 Email from JLL to Nityo on July 14 2023 attaching sublease report,
Att: 88 Exhibit 76 Email from JLL to Nityo on September 16 2022 regarding ELH sublease with attachment,
Att: 89 Exhibit 77 Email from JLL to Nityo on September 19 2022 regarding ELH sublease with attachments,
Att: 90 Exhibit 78 Email from JLL to CBRE on September 21 2022 regarding ELH sublease with attachments,
Att: 91 Exhibit 79 Email from JLL to Nityo on October 4 2022 regarding ELH sublease with attachments,
Att: 92 Exhibit 80 Email from JLL to Nityo on October 6 2022 regarding ELH sublease with attachments,
Att: 93 Exhibit 81 Email from JLL to Nityo on October 24 2022 regarding ELH sublease with attachments,
Att: 94 Exhibit 82 Email from CBRE to JLL on November 8 2022 regarding ELH sublease with attachments,
Att: 95 Exhibit 83 Email from Nityo to JLL on November 11 2022 regarding ELH sublease with attachments,
Att: 96 Exhibit 84 Email from JLL to Nityo on December 6 2022 regarding ELH sublease,
Att: 97 Exhibit 85 Email from JLL to CBRE on December 23 2023 regarding ELH sublease witth attachments,
Att: 98 Exhibit 86 Email from CBRE to JLL on February 4 2023 regarding ELH sublease with attachments,
Att: 99 Exhibit 87 Email from JLL to Nityo on February 10 2023 regarding ELH sublease with attachments,
Att: 100 Exhibit 88 Email from CBRE to JLL on February 15 2023 regarding ELH sublease,
Att: 101 Exhibit 89 Email from JLL to Nityo on February 15 2023 regarding ELH sublease with attachments,
Att: 102 Exhibit 90 Email from JLL to Nityo and Ellenoff Grossman & Schole LLP on April 4 2023 regarding ELH sublease,
Att: 103 Exhibit 91 Email from JLL to EGS on May 9 2023 regarding ELH sublease,
Att: 104 Exhibit 92 Email from JLL to ELH on May 26 2023 regarding ELH sublease,
Att: 105 Exhibit 93.1 Email from Nityo sent internally on June 20 2023 regarding ELH sublease with attachment,
Att: 106 Exhibit 93.2 Email from Nityo sent internally on June 20 2023 regarding ELH sublease with attachment,
Att: 107 Exhibit 94.1 Email from EGS to Nityo on June 26 2023 attaching executed ELH Sublease,
Att: 108 Exhibit 94.2 Email from EGS to Nityo on June 26 2023 attaching executed ELH Sublease,
Att: 109 Exhibit 94.3 Email from EGS to Nityo on June 26 2023 attaching executed ELH Sublease,
Att: 110 Exhibit 95 Email from Nityo to Publicis on March 28 2023 attaching letter,
Att: 111 Exhibit 96 Email from Nityo to Publicis on April 11 2023 with attachment,
Att: 112 Exhibit 97 Email from Rosenberg Estis to Nityo on April 5 2023 with attachment,
Att: 113 Exhibit 98 Email from Nityo sent internally on April 21 2023 with attachment,
Att: 114 Exhibit 99.1 Email from Rosenberg Estis to Nityo on May 8 2023 with attachment,
Att: 115 Exhibit 99.2 Email from Rosenberg Estis to Nityo on May 8 2023 with attachment,
Att: 116 Exhibit 100 Email from Publicis to Nityo on May 11 2023,
Att: 117 Exhibit 101 Email from Rosenberg Estis to Nityo on May 24 2023 attaching notice to apply and to replenish security,
Att: 118 Exhibit 102.1 Email from Rosenberg Estis to Nityo on June 9 2023 attaching notice of default,
Att: 119 Exhibit 102.2 Email from Rosenberg Estis to Nityo on June 9 2023 attaching notice of default,
Att: 120 Exhibit 103 Email from Nityo sent internally on June 30 2023 attaching notice to apply and to replenish security,
Att: 121 Exhibit 104 Email from Publicis to Nityo on July 3 2023,
Att: 122 Exhibit 105 Email from Rosenberg Estis to Nityo on July 7 2023 attaching notice of default,
Att: 123 Exhibit 106 Email from Rosenberg Estis to Nityo on July 18 2023 attaching notice of intention to terminate sublease,
Att: 124 Exhibit 107 Email from Rosenberg Estis to Nityo on July 18 2023 attaching notice of intention to terminate sublease,
Att: 125 Exhibit 108.1 Email from Donna Little to Nityo on July 24 2023 attaching five day notice of termination,
Att: 126 Exhibit 108.2 Email from Donna Little to Nityo on July 24 2023 attaching five day notice of termination,
Att: 127 Exhibit 109.1 Email from Donna Little to Nityo on July 24 2023 attaching five day notice of termination,
Att: 128 Exhibit 109.2 Email from Donna Little to Nityo on July 24 2023 attaching five day notice of termination,
Att: 129 Exhibit 110 Email from JLL to Nityo on July 27 2023 attaching First Amendment to Services Agreement,
Att: 130 Exhibit 111 Email from JLL to Nityo on July 26 2023 with attachments,
Att: 131 Exhibit 112 Email from JLL to Nityo on July 26 2023,
Att: 132 Exhibit 113 Transcript of Deposition of Govind Desikan - October 22 2024,
Att: 133 Exhibit 114.1 Email from Donna Little to Nityo on July 24 2023 attaching five day notice of termination,
Att: 134 Exhibit 114.2 Email from Donna Little to Nityo on July 24 2023 attaching five day notice of termination,
Att: 135 Exhibit 115 Email from Publicis to Nityo on July 27 2023,
Att: 136 Exhibit 116 Email from Nityo to JLL on July 31 2023,
Att: 137 Exhibit 117 Email from Nityo to JLL on August 1 2023,
Att: 138 Exhibit 118 Email from JLL to Nityo on August 2 2023 with attachment,
Att: 139 Exhibit 119 Email from JLL sent internally and CCing Nityo on August 2 2023,
Att: 140 Exhibit 120 Email from Publicis to Nityo on August 8 2023 attaching Surrender Agreement,
Att: 141 Exhibit 121 Email from Nityo to Publicis on August 8 2023 with attachments,
Att: 142 Exhibit 122 Email from Nityo to JLL on August 17 2023 with attachment,
Att: 143 Exhibit 123 Email from Nityo to Publicis on August 17 2023 with attachment,
Att: 144 Exhibit 124 Email from Nityo to Publicis on August 28 2023,
Att: 145 Exhibit 125 Email from Nityo to Darlene Hill on September 4 2023,
Att: 146 Exhibit 126 Email from Nityo to Darlene Hill on September 5 2023,
Att: 147 Exhibit 127 Email from Nityo to Publicis on September 26 2023,
Att: 148 Exhibit 128 Email from Nityo to Publicis and Nityo on September 29 2023 attaching Surrender Agreement,
Att: 149 Exhibit 129 Email from Publicis to Nityo on October 4 2023 attaching executed Surrender Agreement and Consent,
Att: 150 Exhibit 130 Email from JLL to Nityo on October 4 2023 with attachments,
Att: 151 Exhibit 131 Email from Nityo to Publicis on May 18 2023 attaching First Amendment to Sublease,
Att: 152 Exhibit 132 Email from Nityo to JLL on July 21 2023 regarding ELH sublease with attachment,
Att: 153 Exhibit 133 Landlord's Consent for ELH Sublease,
Att: 154 Exhibit 134 Email from Rosenberg Estis to Nityo on January 5 2024 attaching five day notice of termination,
Att: 155 Exhibit 135 Email from Nityo sent internally on January 18 2024 with attachment,
Att: 156 Exhibit 136 Email from Nityo sent internally on January 19 2024,
Att: 157 Exhibit 137 Summons and Complaint of MMS USA Holdings, Inc. in MMS USA Holdings, Inc. v. Nityo Infotech Corporation in Supreme Court of New York County,
Att: 158 Exhibit 138 Verified Answer of Nityo Infotech Corporation in MMS USA Holdings, Inc. v. Nityo Infotech Corporation in Supreme Court of New York County,
Att: 159 Exhibit 139 Email from Nityo to Michael Almeida on April 30 2024,
Att: 160 Exhibit 140 Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in MMS USA Holdings, Inc. v. Nityo Infotech Corporation in Supreme Court of New York County,
Att: 161 Exhibit 141 Email from Nityo to JLL on November 27 2023,
Att: 162 Exhibit 142 Rule 26 initial disclosures of Nityo Infotech Corporation dated March 18 2024,
Att: 163 Exhibit 143 Docket of MMS USA Holdings, Inc. v. Nityo Infotech Corporation in Supreme Court of New York County
38 38 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 01/09 2:45 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Rule 56.1 Statement Thu 01/09 2:42 PM
RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
36 36 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 01/09 2:33 PM
DECLARATION of Simon Landmann in Support re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
35 35 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 01/09 2:32 PM
DECLARATION of Mitchell Konsker in Support re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 01/09 2:30 PM
DECLARATION of Peter Riguardi in Support re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Summary Judgment Thu 01/09 2:27 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
32 32 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/06 4:28 PM
ORDER: I held a post-discovery conference in this matter on January 6, 2025 at 2:00pm. In accordance with my comments at the conference, it is hereby: ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and its opening brief are due January 9, 2025. Defendant's opposition brief is due February 28, 2025. Plaintiff's reply is due March 28, 2025. ( Motions due by 1/9/2025., Responses due by 2/28/2025, Replies due by 3/28/2025.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/6/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 01/31 12:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vernon S. Broderick: Case Management Conference held on 1/6/2025. (Court Reporter Carly Davis) (ldi)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/03 1:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Grace Wroblewski on behalf of Nityo Infotech Corporation..(Wroblewski, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/02 11:10 AM
ORDER: I will hold a telephonic post-discovery conference is in this matter on January 6, 2025 at 2:00pm. The parties shall attend the conference on the Court's new dial-in line: the phone number is 1-855-244-8681, the access code is 2309 3085 835, and there is no attendee ID. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/2/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
29 29 misc Letter Fri 12/20 1:27 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Emilie B. Cooper dated December 20, 2024 re: Parties Joint Status Update Letter pursuant to item 11 of Case Management Plan. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Tue 11/12 4:26 PM
ORDER granting27 Letter Motion for Discovery. APPLICATION GRANTED. The deadline for the parties to submit the joint status letter discussed in item 11 of the Second Amended Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order is ADJOURNED to December 20, 2024. The telephone conference currently scheduled for November 26, 2024 is ADJOURNED to January 6, 2025 at 2:00pm. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/12/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 11/12 4:28 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 1/6/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (sgz)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
27 27 motion Discovery Mon 11/11 7:53 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Discovery for taking of deposition addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Emilie B. Cooper dated November 11, 2024. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 10/31 11:24 AM
ORDER granting25 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. APPLICATION GRANTED. The telephonic conference currently scheduled for November 22, 2024 is ADJOURNED to November 26, 2024 at 11:00am. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 11/26/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/31/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
25 25 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 10/30 5:02 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Telephonic Post-Discovery Conference) addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Emilie B. Cooper dated October 30, 2024. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
24 24 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 10/15 2:19 PM
SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER granting23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). The parties have engaged in settlement discussions. This case is not to be tried to a jury. All fact discovery is to be completed no later than November 15, 2024. Depositions shall be completed by November 15, 2024. All expert discovery, including disclosures, reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions shall be completed by November 15, 2024. All discovery shall be completed no later than November 15, 2024. Deposition due by 11/15/2024. Discovery due by 11/15/2024. The Court will conduct a telephonic post-discovery conference on November 22, 2024 at 2:00pm. The dial-in number is 888-363-4749 and the conference code is 2682448. The conference previously scheduled for December 13, 2024 at 11:00am is ADJOURNED. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3 days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/15/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Tue 10/15 2:20 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Expert Discovery due by 11/15/2024., Fact Discovery due by 11/15/2024.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Telephone Conference set for 11/22/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 10/11 5:16 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Emilie B. Cooper dated October 11, 2024. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
22 22 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 06/26 3:45 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER granting21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Pursuant to Rules 16-26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court hereby adopts the following Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). The parties have engaged in settlement discussions. This case is not to be tried to a jury. All fact discovery is to be completed no later than October 30, 2024. Depositions shall be completed by October 15, 2024. All expert discovery, including disclosures, reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions shall be completed by October 30, 2024. All discovery shall be completed no later than October 30, 2024. The Court will conduct a telephonic post-discovery conference on December 13, 2024 at 11:00AM. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3 days. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/26/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 06/26 3:47 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 10/30/2024. Discovery due by 10/30/2024. Expert Discovery due by 10/30/2024. Fact Discovery due by 10/30/2024. (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 06/26 3:48 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 12/13/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 06/25 1:01 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Dustin Bowman, Esq., Attorney for Defendant Nityo Infotech Corporation dated June 24, 2024. Document filed by Nityo Infotech Corporation..(Bowman, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Revised Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
20 20 order Protective Order Tue 05/21 12:55 PM
STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/21/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
19 19 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 05/15 1:03 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
18 18 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 03/08 4:07 PM
ANSWER to12 Counterclaim. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/08 2:31 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). The parties have engaged in settlement discussions. This case is not to be tried to a jury. No additional parties may be joined after 30 days from the entry of this order absent a showing of good cause under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16. No additional causes of action or defenses may be asserted after 30 days from the entry of this order absent a showing of good cause under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16. Depositions shall be completed by June 28, 2024. The dial-in number is 888-363-4749 and the conference code is 2682448. SO ORDERED. Expert Deposition due by 6/28/2024. Fact Discovery due by 6/28/2024. Expert Discovery due by 6/28/2024. Discovery due by 6/28/2024. Estimate length of trial 3 days. Telephone Conference set for 7/15/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/8/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Fri 03/08 10:42 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error Fri 03/08 10:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Emilie Cooper to RE-FILE Document 15 Proposed Order. Use the event type Other Filings, Proposed Orders, Proposed Case Management Plan. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Order Thu 03/07 5:09 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc.. Related Document Number:14 ..(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Thu 03/07 3:50 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Emilie Cooper dated 03/07/2024 re: Enclosing Proposed Case Mangement Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 02/22 11:05 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby:ORDERED that the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by March 7, 2024, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/22/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 02/16 4:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,., COUNTERCLAIM against Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc.. Document filed by Nityo Infotech Corporation..(Bowman, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/02 3:53 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nityo Infotech Corporation..(Bowman, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/26 11:08 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,8 Notice of Appearance,7 Order,,, addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Dustin Bowman, Esq. dated January 24, 2024.,1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. S ORDERED. Extension is granted until February 23, 2024. Nityo Infotech Corporation answer due 2/23/2024. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/26/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/24 11:57 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,8 Notice of Appearance,7 Order,,, addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Dustin Bowman, Esq. dated January 24, 2024. Document filed by Nityo Infotech Corporation..(Bowman, Dustin)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/24 11:48 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dustin Benjamin Bowman on behalf of Nityo Infotech Corporation..(Bowman, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/23 8:41 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff filed this action on December 8, 2023, (Doc. 1), and filed an affidavit of service on December 13, 2023, (Doc. 6). The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's complaint was January 2, 2024. To date, Defendant has not appeared or responded to the complaint. Plaintiff, however, has taken no action to prosecute this case. Accordingly, if Plaintiff intends to seek a default judgment, it is directed to do so in accordance with Rule 4(H) of my Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases by no later than February 5, 2024. If Plaintiff fails to do so or otherwise demonstrate that it intends to prosecute this litigation, I may dismiss this case for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/22/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/13 4:46 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Nityo Infotech Corporation served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. Service was accepted by Allison Rathmanner, Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 12/11 10:56 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nityo Infotech Corporation. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 12/11 10:50 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 12/11 10:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 12/11 10:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/08 7:22 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc., Corporate Parent Jones Lang LaSalle, Inc. for Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc.. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/08 7:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 12/08 6:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nityo Infotech Corporation, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/08 6:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Nityo Infotech Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28672582)Document filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Brokerage, Inc...(Cooper, Emilie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Services Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Amendment to Services Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Email from Nityo, July 31, 2023