Nebraska District Court
Case #: 8:23-cr-00230
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2023 1:20 AM CST
Defendant
Eric Calabro (1)
Represented By
S. Gregory Nelson
S. Greg Nelson, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kelli L. Ceraolo
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Omaha
contact info

GPO Dec 07 2023
ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend as to Eric Calabro (1). Pretrial motions shall be filed by January 25, 2024. The time between today's date and January 25, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
GPO Jan 26 2024
ORDER granting 17 Motion to Extend as to Eric Calabro (1). Pretrial motions shall be filed by February 26, 2024. The time between January 25, 2024 and February 26, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
GPO Mar 26 2024
ORDER granting 21 Motion to Continue Trial as to Eric Calabro. Jury Trial continued to 6/3/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter Jr. The time between today's date and the anticipated trial is excluded for purposes of computing the limits under the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MLF)
GPO May 24 2024
ORDER granting 24 Motion to Continue Trial as to Eric Calabro. Jury Trial continued to 7/15/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter Jr. The time between today's date and the anticipated trial is excluded for purposes of computing the limits under the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (MLF)
GPO Sep 06 2024
JUDGMENT as to Eric Calabro (1), Count 1 - Defendant pleaded guilty to count I of the Indictment and is committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a term of ninety (90) months; supervised release for a term of five (5) years; $100.00 special assessment; $31,500.00 restitution. AVAA Assessment: Court finds imposition will impair defendant's ability to make restitution. JVTA Assessment: Court finds indigency and declines to apply the additional JVTA assessment. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons as notified by the United States Marshal. Count 2 - Count II is dismissed on the motion of the United States as to defendant Eric Calabro. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (1 Certified copy to USM)(ADB)

Docket last updated: 12/10/2023 1:38 AM CST
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
Remark - Public: Case filed under seal on 11/14/2023 and unsealed on 11/17/2023 pursuant to memorandum as to defendant Eric Calabro. (MKR)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs PART 1 OF 2 - INDICTMENT with foreperson's signature redacted pursuant to the E- Government Act as to defendant Eric Calabro. (MKR)
Related: [-]
2 2 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE PAGE regarding Indictment1 as to defendant Eric Calabro. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(e). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MKR)
Related: [-]
3 3 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendant Eric Calabro. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MKR)
Related: [-]