California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-02507
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2023 11:24 PM PST
Defendant
Ethos Asset Management Inc. (2)
Defendant
Carlos Manuel Da Silva Santos (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Carl Brooker
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Edward Christopher Beeler
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Apr 07 2025
Order (1) Sustaining In Part Objections To Presentence Report, And (2) Granting Motion To Continue Sentencing Date [ECF Nos. 128, 135]. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 04/07/2025. (stn)

Docket last updated: 09/22/2024 1:17 PM PDT
Monday, November 13, 2023
1 1 7 pgs COMPLAINT (t/w Warrant) as to Carlos Manuel Da Silva Santos (1).(mef) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/15/2023 to unseal) (jpp). [3:23-mj-04145-BLM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Info Sheet
2 2 1 pgs ORDER TO SEAL Case as to Carlos Manuel Da Silva Santos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/10/2023. (mef) [3:23-mj-04145-BLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
4 4 1 pgs MOTION to Unseal Complaint and Arrest Warrantby USA as to Carlos Manuel Da Silva Santos. (cc: AUSA Christopher Beeler) (jpp)Attorney Edward Christopher Beeler added to party USA(pty:pla) [3:23-mj-04145-BLM]
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs ORDER granting4 Motion to Unseal Complaint and Arrest Warrant as to Carlos Manuel Da Silva Santos (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/13/2023. (cc: AUSA Christopher Beeler) (jpp) [3:23-mj-04145-BLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
6 6 2 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Carl Brooker appearing for USA. (Brooker, Carl)Attorney Carl Brooker added to party USA(pty:pla)(stn). [3:23-mj-04145-BLM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
7 7 12 pgs INDICTMENT as to Carlos Manuel Da Silva Santos (1) count(s) 1-4, 5, 6-7, Ethos Asset Management Inc. (2) count(s) 1-4, 5, 6-7.(ggv) (sjt).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Indictment
8 8 1 pgs NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by USA of case(s) 23cr2441-WQH. (ggv) (sjt).
Related: [-]