New York Western District Court
Case #: 1:23-mj-00168
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2023
Terminated:Jan 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2023 2:20 AM EST
Defendant
Michael Roncone (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph M. Tripi
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Buf
contact info
Nicholas Cooper
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Buffalo
contact info
Casey L. Chalbeck
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Bflo
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/16/2024 9:08 AM EST
Thursday, December 07, 2023
Set/Reset Hearings as to Michael Roncone: Initial Appearance set for 12/7/2023 at 03:30 PM in Cattaraugus Courtroom, 7th West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. (LMG)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr.: Initial Appearance as to Michael Roncone held on 12/7/2023. Counsel for the government moved to amend the Criminal Complaint to include a full description of the offense charged on the cover page of the Criminal Complaint. Court granted motion. Counsel for the government handed up an Amended Complaint containing the handwritten changes to the cover page. Court advised defendant of the charges set forth in the Amended Criminal Complaint and entered a plea of not guilty on his behalf. Defendant confirmed that he has received a copy of the Amended Criminal Complaint. Court advised defendant of his rights, including the right to counsel. Defendant advised that he will retain Attorney David Todaro who is present in the courtroom. Mr. Todaro advised the Court that he will not be retained in this matter and that he is present merely to consult with defendant. Court granted defendant's request for a continuance to allow him time to retain counsel. Government moved for detention. Court expressed concerns about detaining defendant between today and the date set for his Detention Hearing. After a lengthy discussion regarding the statute, and due consideration being given to this issue by the Court, the Court granted the government's motion, ordered defendant detained and remanded him to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Detention Hearing set for 12/12/2023 at 02:00 PM in Cattaraugus Courtroom, 7th West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. Issue of Preliminary Hearing held in abeyance until that time. Time from 12/7/2023 to 12/12/2023 excluded for purposes of the Speedy Trial Act, Bail Reform Act, Rule 5.1 of the Fed. R. Crim. P. pursuant to Title 18 U.S.C. Sections 3161(h)(7)(A), (h)(7)(B)(iv) and (h)(1)(D). Appearances: AUSA Joseph Tripi, AUSA Nicholas Cooper and AUSA Casey Chalbeck for the government; AFPD Jeffrey Bagley and David Todaro with defendant; USPO Andre McCray. (Court Reporter FTR Gold)(LMG)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT as to Michael Roncone (1). (LMG)
Related: [-]
2 2 10 pgs AMENDED COMPLAINT as to Michael Roncone. (LMG)
Related: [-]