Oregon District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-00207
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2023
Terminated:Dec 07, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2023 11:29 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kemp L. Strickland
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Sean Michael Johnson (1)
Terminated: 12/07/2023
Represented By
Robert Hamilton
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/09/2023 11:38 PM PST
Thursday, December 07, 2023
1 1 26 pgs Documents Received From Other Court as to Sean Michael Johnson from Eastern District of Virginia (Alexandria) Case No: 1:23-mj-00262-IDD-1. (dino)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minutes of Proceedings: Initial Appearance pursuant to Rule 5(c)(3) for Arrest in Our District Offense in Another. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman as to Sean Michael Johnson (USM #90276-510) on 12/7/2023. ORDER Appointing Counsel for Sean Michael Johnson: Robert Hamilton for proceedings in the District of Oregon. Defendant advised of rights and proceeds as named. Defendant waives identity hearing, production of the warrant and any preliminary or detention hearing to which he may be entitled in this district. Defendant reserves his right to preliminary and detention hearings in the Eastern District of Virginia. The Court accepts the waiver as knowing and voluntary. (Formal waiver to follow.) Defendant submits to detention. ORDER: Defendant is detained for risk of non-appearance and as a danger to the community. Defendant is committed to the Eastern District of Virginia and shall be transported to that district in the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. (Commitment order to follow.) Other Court Information: USA v. Sean Michael Johnson, Eastern District of Virginia (Alexandria) Case No. 1:23-MJ-00262-IDD-1. Counsel Present for the Government: Cassady Adams. Counsel Present for Defendant: Robert Hamilton. Restraint Order: NR. (Court Reporter Jill Jessup) (gw)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs Waiver of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by Sean Michael Johnson. (dino)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs Commitment to Another District as to Sean Michael Johnson. Defendant committed to the Eastern District of Virginia, Case Number 1:23-mj-00262, and Notice to the Eastern District of Virginia of Criminal Case Transfer as to Sean Michael Johnson. Docket sheet and documents attached. Related [+] (One certified copy e-mailed to U.S. Marshal on 12/8/2023.) (dino)
Related: [-] ceiving Court: Request certified copies of any documents by e-mailing CrimPDX@ord.uscourts.gov. If a different email address for future transfers should be designated, send a request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.
Att: 1 Appendix