Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-02144

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jason A Burgess
Case #: 3:23-ap-00104
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Terminated:Feb 14, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wanda Horne Carter
3659 Calvados Ave
Orange Park, FL 32065
Represented By
Wanda Horne Carter
contact info
Plaintiff
Chubb insurance
1400 Prudential Drive Suite 3
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Albert T. Franson
Franson & Iseley, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 02/14 10:51 AM
Adversary Case 3:23-ap-104 Closed. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 01/26 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 01/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
3 3 order Judgment Tue 01/23 1:35 PM
Consent Final Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Amount Awarded: $5000.00 Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Tue 12/12 12:56 PM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 01/11/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Mon 12/11 11:59 AM
Complaint by Chubb insurance against Wanda Horne Carter. (Verify Fee) Nature of Suit: [65 (Dischargeability - other)]. (Franson, Albert)
Related: [-]