Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Jonathan JC Grey
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:23-cv-13149
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Terminated:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2024 4:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Frick Investments, LLC
Represented By
Maxwell J. Goss
Maxwell Goss PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc
Represented By
Carrie A. Johnson
Eastman & Smith
contact info
Jared Jay Lefevre
Eastman & Smith
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2024
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (TTho)

Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
31 31 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Thu 02/06 11:37 AM
STIPULATED ORDER TO PERMANENTLY ENJOIN DEFENDANT AND VOLUNTARILY DISMISS THE CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
30 30 trial Witness List Wed 12/18 1:08 PM
Plaintiff's Notice of Expert Disclosure - WITNESS LIST by Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc (Chappelear, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Curriculum Vitae of John G. Plumpe
Monday, December 16, 2024
29 29 notice Notice - Other Mon 12/16 3:36 PM
NOTICE by Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc - Joint Notice of Facilitator (Chappelear, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
28 28 order Stipulation and Order Fri 12/13 3:12 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Notification of Choice of Facilitator - Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
27 27 trial Witness List Mon 11/11 5:47 PM
LAY WITNESS LIST by Frick Investments, LLC (Goss, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
26 26 trial Witness List Mon 11/11 3:55 PM
Plaintiff's Lay WITNESS LIST by Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc (Chappelear, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
minutes Status Conference Thu 10/24 5:00 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey: Status Conference held on 10/24/2024. (Court Reporter: Christin Douglas) (SOso)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Order Thu 10/24 5:03 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The deadlines previously established in the scheduling order issued by Judge Borman (ECF No.16 ) remain in effect and are ADOPTED by this Court. SO ORDERED . Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
25 25 notice Appear* Fri 10/11 3:33 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 10/24/2024 03:00 PM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey (SOso)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
order Text-Only Reassignment Thu 06/27 4:33 PM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Paul D. Borman to District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey pursuant to Administrative Order 24-AO-018. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
24 24 notice Appearance Fri 06/21 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen E Chappelear on behalf of Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc. (Chappelear, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
23 23 notice Correction Fri 05/10 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Correction re22 Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes. (SSch)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Fri 05/10 10:52 AM
[ENTERED ON WRONG DOCKET] Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (SSch) Modified on 5/10/2024 (SSch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
21 21 19 pgs order Order Fri 03/29 8:22 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (TTho)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report Thu 03/28 5:06 PM
Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Johnson, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
19 19 notice Notice - Other Wed 03/27 2:51 PM
NOTICE by Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc re17 Notice (Other),18 Order to Strike (Lefevre, Jared)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Strike Wed 03/27 1:42 PM
ORDER STRIKING IMPROPER FILING17 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (TTho)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
17 17 notice Notice - Other Tue 03/26 4:36 PM
NOTICE by Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc (Lefevre, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation Stipulated Protective Order
16 16 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/26 1:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Facilitation Information to Chambers on or before 12/12/2024; Discovery due by 2/11/2025; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/12/2025. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. Related [+] (SPin)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
15 15 misc Report - Free Wed 03/20 10:04 AM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(F) Conference REPORT by Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc (Lefevre, Jared)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
notice Error Tue 03/19 9:01 AM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Carrie A. Johnson re14 Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report,13 Report (Free). Document is not flattened and contains fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
14 14 misc Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report Fri 03/15 4:01 PM
Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Johnson, Carrie)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Report - Free Fri 03/15 12:18 PM
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark REPORT by Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc (Johnson, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
12 12 misc Report - Free Tue 03/05 2:59 PM
Report on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark REPORT by Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc (Johnson, Carrie)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Appearance Tue 03/05 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie A. Johnson on behalf of Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc. (Johnson, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order Fri 03/01 9:17 AM
ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO MEET AND TO FILE JOINT FED.R.CIV.P. 26f PLAN by 3/20/2024. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
9 9 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 02/27 8:56 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Frick Investments, LLC (Goss, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/26 5:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Frick Investments, LLC. (Goss, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
7 7 order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Fri 02/02 10:09 AM
ORDER Granting5 Stipulation and Requiring Response to1 Complaint. Response due by 2/26/2024. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
6 6 notice Appearance Wed 01/31 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maxwell J. Goss on behalf of Frick Investments, LLC. (Goss, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
5 5 misc Stipulation Fri 01/26 11:27 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint,, by Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc (Sandretto, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued* Fri 12/15 2:48 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Frick Investments, LLC* (MCho)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 12/15 2:49 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (MCho)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
3 3 1 pgs misc Report - Free Wed 12/13 1:20 PM
Report on The Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patent Or Trademark REPORT (AO 120 Form) by Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc., d/b/a/ Fricker's (Lefevre, Jared)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
2 2 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 12/11 2:32 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc., d/b/a/ Fricker's (Lefevre, Jared)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 12/11 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Fricker's Progressive Concepts, Inc., d/b/a/ Fricker's against Frick Investments, LLC d/b/a Frick'N Good Cookies with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9589003 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Montgomery - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Lefevre, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - USPTO Final Office Action,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Google and Yelp Reviews,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet