Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:23-cv-01295
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2024 3:46 AM CDT
Defendant
Jim Arnette
Represented By
Shanell L. Tyler
Office Of The Attorney General Of Tennessee
contact info
E. Ashley Carter
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Penny Austin
Represented By
Shanell L. Tyler
Office Of The Attorney General Of Tennessee
contact info
E. Ashley Carter
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jason E. Mumpower
Represented By
Shanell L. Tyler
Office Of The Attorney General Of Tennessee
contact info
E. Ashley Carter
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Tennessee Comptroller of the Treasury
Represented By
Shanell L. Tyler
Office Of The Attorney General Of Tennessee
contact info
E. Ashley Carter
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Arietty Brush
Represented By
Lucas Cameron-Vaughn
Aclu (nashville Office)
contact info
Douglas B. Janney, III
Law Office Of Douglas B. Janney Iii
contact info
Stella Yarbrough
Aclu (nashville Office)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 08/01 8:42 AM
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL: It appears to the Court, as evidenced by the signatures of counsel below, that all matters in dispute between Plaintiff Arietty Brush and Defendants Tennessee Comptroller of the Treasury, Jason E. Mumpower, Jim Arnett, and Penny Austin, in their official capacities, have been resolved and that Plaintiff's Complaint should be dismissed. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the Clerk shall close this case. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 07/31/24. (ad)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Proposed Order of Dismissal Wed 07/31 2:09 PM
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL Agreed Order of Dismissal filed by Arietty Brush. (Janney, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 06/21 3:54 PM
ORDER: The20 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 06/21/24. Extension to July 31, 2024. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 06/18 2:37 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Jim Arnette, Penny Austin, Jason E. Mumpower, Tennessee Comptroller of the Treasury. (Carter, E.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/06 1:19 PM
ORDER: The parties have notified the Court that they have reached a resolution of all claims in this matter (Doc. No.18 ). The parties are ORDERED to make the necessary filings to terminate the action by June 20, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 05/06/24. (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 05/03 6:05 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement by Arietty Brush (Janney, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/27 11:45 AM
NOTICE by Jim Arnette, Penny Austin, Jason E. Mumpower, Tennessee Comptroller of the Treasury of Withdrawal as Counsel (Tyler, Shanell)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
16 16 4 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Mon 03/11 2:06 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 5/13/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Exhibit List due by 4/28/2025. Witness List due by 4/28/2025. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/28/2025. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 03/11/24. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
15 15 order Case Management Order Tue 03/05 11:44 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2024. Discovery due by 9/30/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 11/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 03/05/24. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference by Telephone Tue 03/05 10:32 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 3/5/2024. (Hearing lasted 00:30)(sd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
14 14 misc Proposed Case Management Order Thu 02/29 4:02 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint Proposed Initial Case Management Order filed by Arietty Brush. (Janney, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/31 4:14 PM
Defendant ANSWER to1 Complaint, of Arietty Brush by Jim Arnette, Penny Austin, Jason E. Mumpower, Tennessee Comptroller of the Treasury.(Tyler, Shanell)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 01/31 3:06 PM
ORDER: On January 30, 2024, Defendants Tennessee Comptroller of the Treasury, Jason Mumpower, Jim Arnette, and Penny Austin filed an unopposed motion to continue the initial case management conference set on February 28, 2024. (Doc. No.11 ). The motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to March 5, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 01/31/24. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
11 11 motion Continue Tue 01/30 2:53 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Jim Arnette, Penny Austin, Jason E. Mumpower, Tennessee Comptroller of the Treasury. (Tyler, Shanell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 01/17 12:06 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Shanell L. Tyler, E. Ashley Carter admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/12 10:19 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/12/2024. (af)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/11 3:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Jim Arnette, Penny Austin, Jason E. Mumpower, Tennessee Comptroller of the Treasury. (Tyler, Shanell)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/11 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by E. Ashley Carter on behalf of All Defendants (Carter, E.)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/11 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shanell L. Tyler on behalf of All Defendants (Tyler, Shanell)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order Thu 12/14 3:29 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/14/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 12/11 2:37 PM
Summons issued as to Jim Arnette, Penny Austin, Jason E. Mumpower, Tennessee Comptroller of the Treasury. Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail. (kc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Mon 12/11 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 2/28/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Mon 12/11 2:19 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Mon 12/11 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/11 1:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Jim Arnette, Penny Austin, Jason E. Mumpower, Tennessee Comptroller of the Treasury (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-3970503), filed by Arietty Brush.(kc) Modified on 12/11/2023 (kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 12/11 2:21 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Douglas B. Janney, III, Stella Yarbrough, Lucas Cameron-Vaughn admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]