New York Western District Court
Judge:David G Larimer
Referred: Marian W Payson
Case #: 6:11-cv-06026
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2011
Terminated:Mar 06, 2013
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2017 1:48 AM EST
Defendant
Grace Carducci
Represented By
Howard A. Stark
Monroe County Department Of Law
contact info
Defendant
City of Rochester
Represented By
Spencer L. Ash
City Of Rochester
contact info
Defendant
Sgt. DeBellis
Defendant
Michael Green
Represented By
Howard A. Stark
Monroe County Department Of Law
contact info
Defendant
Investigator Lacutone
Defendant
Monroe County
Represented By
Howard A. Stark
Monroe County Department Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
James Schnitter
Represented By
Christina A. Agola
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/17/2011 7:00 PM EST
Tuesday, January 18, 2011
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Modified on 1/19/2011 (BK).
Related: [-]
Civil Filing fee, received: $350.00, receipt number ROC004695. (BK)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Schnitter.(BK)
Related: [-]