Keyubba Bowman et al v. Novad Management Consulting, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-10363 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of County of Los Angeles, 22STCV24840 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2024 1:27 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Novad Management Consulting, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Keyubba Bowman
an individual 212 Garden Grove Drive
Waxachachie, TX 75165 |
|
Plaintiff
Rashon Bowman
an individual 212 Garden Grove Drive
Waxahachie, TX 75615 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Department of Housing and Urban Development HUD
Terminated: 01/24/2024
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ISN Corporation
Terminated: 01/25/2024
|
Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
appeal
Appeal Fees Paid
Thu 05/23 9:41 AM
APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals64 as to Plaintiff Rashon Bowman; Receipt Number: 17550 in the amount of $605. (fa) |