Kansas District Court
Judge:Daniel D Crabtree
Referred: Angel D Mitchell
Case #: 2:23-cv-02545
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause29:623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Terminated:Oct 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2024 3:46 AM CDT
Defendant
WellPath, LLC
Represented By
Matthew B. Banocy
Fordharrison, LLP
contact info
Corey Louis Franklin
Fordharrison, LLP
contact info
Mark E. Stamelos
Fordharrison Llp - Nashville
contact info
Plaintiff
Janis Hodgdon
Represented By
Michael D. Matteuzzi
Matteuzzi & Brooker
contact info
Eric S. Playter
Playter & Playter, LLC
contact info
Matthew J. Brooker
Matteuzzi & Brooker
contact info


Docket last updated: 67 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
25 25 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Wed 11/13 11:16 AM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY as to Wellpath LLC.(Banocy, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Bankruptcy Petition
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
24 24 order Administratively Closing Case Tue 10/22 2:23 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Parties to file stipulation of dismissal by 12/6/2024. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/22/2024. (ca)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
23 23 order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 10/21 1:05 PM
ORDER vacating pretrial conference. The parties have notified the court that this matter has settled. Accordingly, the court vacates the setting for the November 7, 2024 pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/21/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(alh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
22 22 order Scheduling Order Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Wed 10/02 10:13 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: denying21 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. However, with some latitude in the schedule to extend pretrial-conference-related deadlines, while keeping the trial date, the court amends the scheduling order (ECF12 ) as follows: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/29/2024, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2024 at 10:00 AM by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell, Dispositive motion (summary judgment) deadline 12/6/2024, Motions challenging admissibility of expert testimony deadline is 12/6/2024, Jury Trial (unchanged) set for 8/5/2025 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. All other provisions of the original scheduling order remain in effect. The schedule adopted in this amended scheduling order shall not be modified except by leave of court upon a showing of good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/1/2024. (ca)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
21 21 motion Amend Scheduling Order Fri 09/27 2:25 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Janis Hodgdon Related [+] (Playter, Eric)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Friday, June 07, 2024
20 20 notice Joint Mediation Notice Fri 06/07 10:48 AM
JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held 08/02/2024 by Janis Hodgdon (Playter, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 06/04 10:18 AM
ORDER granting18 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Mediation Notice. The parties must file their mediation notice by June 7, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/4/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time Mon 06/03 5:00 PM
Joint MOTION for extension of time to file Mediation Notice by Plaintiff Janis Hodgdon Related [+] (Playter, Eric)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
17 17 service Certificate of Service Mon 06/03 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Janis Hodgdon's Answers and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Requests for Production by Janis Hodgdon (Brooker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 05/17 8:21 AM
ORDER denying 15 Motion for Protective Order. The motion is denied without prejudice to being renewed once the parties address the comments set forth on the attached Exhibit A. If the parties file a renewed motion for entry of a protective order, they must contemporaneously submit their revised, proposed protective order to the undersigned's chambers via email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/17/2024. (sz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, May 16, 2024
15 15 motion Protective Order Thu 05/16 3:29 PM
Joint Motion Requesting the Entry of a Protective Order. In accordance with the Guidelines for Agreed Protective Orders, the parties jointly moved for the entry of a protective order by emailing a copy of their proposed order to the Magistrate Judge's chambers on May 16, 2024. Related [+] (alh)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 04/30 10:36 AM
ORDER denying13 Motion for Protective Order without prejudice to being renewed once the parties address the comments set forth on the attached Exhibit A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on April 30, 2024. (mls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, April 22, 2024
13 13 motion Protective Order Mon 04/22 3:48 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant WellPath, LLC Related [+] (Banocy, Matthew)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Thursday, April 04, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Thu 04/04 5:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time 5 days. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 6/3/2024. Mediation deadline 8/2/2024. Discovery deadline 9/27/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/11/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2024 at 10:00 AM by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Dispositive motion deadline 11/19/2024. Jury Trial set for 8/5/2025 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on April 4, 2024. (mls)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 04/04 12:43 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE was held on 4/4/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
10 10 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 02/22 10:19 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Matthew B. Banocy on behalf of WellPath, LLC (Banocy, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Wed 02/21 10:32 AM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell by phone (ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627). The parties, in person and/or through counsel, must confer as required by Fed. R. Civ. P.26(f) by 3/15/2024. By 3/25/2024, plaintiff must submit a redlined version of the proposed scheduling order that shows all changes to the court's form proposed scheduling order, and a clean version of the proposed scheduling order. Both versions of the document must be submitted in Word format as an attachment to an email sent to ksd_mitchell_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov. The parties must serve their Rule 26(a)(1)(A) initial disclosures by 3/25/2024, and email copies of the initial disclosures to the undersigned judge's chambers with the proposed scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 2/21/2024. (mam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/01 10:11 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark E. Stamelos for WellPath, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 2/1/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
7 7 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 01/31 11:03 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Eric S. Playter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Playter, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/30 1:11 PM
MOTION for attorney Mark E. Stamelos to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6261690.) by Defendant WellPath, LLC. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell.) (Franklin, Corey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/30 12:43 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WellPath, LLC identifying None as corporate parent. (Franklin, Corey)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/30 12:40 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by WellPath, LLC. (Franklin, Corey)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
service Summons Issued Mon 12/18 3:21 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to WellPath, LLC (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
3 3 misc Designation of Place of Trial Tue 12/12 9:09 AM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Janis Hodgdon - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Matteuzzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/11 2:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Janis Hodgdon. (Matteuzzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Mon 12/11 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6223645.), filed by Janis Hodgdon.(Matteuzzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Mon 12/11 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 12/11 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing, Document is not redacted properly. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
Related: [-]