Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Patti B Saris
Case #: 1:23-cv-13048
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Terminated:Feb 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2024 4:38 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Ana Cecilia Cole
Represented By
John Mark Dickison
Lawson & Weitzen, LLP
contact info
Brendan P. Slean
Lawson & Weitzen
contact info
Ira H. Zaleznik
Lawson & Weitzen, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Greater Industries Labs, Inc.
Represented By
Seth E. Darmstadter
Michelman & Robinson, LLP
contact info
Ashley N. Moore
Michelman & Robinson, LLP
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Gerald B Hrycyszyn
Wolf Greenfield And Sacks PC
contact info
Meaghan P. Luster
Wolf Greenfield & Sacks, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Ana Cecilia Cole
Represented By
John Mark Dickison
Lawson & Weitzen, LLP
contact info
Brendan P. Slean
Lawson & Weitzen
contact info
Ira H. Zaleznik
Lawson & Weitzen, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Greater Industries Labs, Inc.
Represented By
Seth E. Darmstadter
Michelman & Robinson, LLP
contact info
Ashley N. Moore
Michelman & Robinson, LLP
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Gerald B Hrycyszyn
Wolf Greenfield And Sacks PC
contact info
Meaghan P. Luster
Wolf Greenfield & Sacks, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
Judge Paul G. Levenson
Terminated: 02/05/2024


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, March 22, 2024
49 49 minutes Status Conference Wed 04/03 11:04 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson: Status Conference held on 3/22/2024.The court went over the progression of the case. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html. For a transcript of this proceeding, contact mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Atty Rellas, Atty Zalemik, Atty Cole, and Atty Darstadter) (Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
48 48 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 03/22 3:20 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 3/22/2024 at 03:25 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
47 47 minutes Status Conference Mon 03/18 11:21 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson: Status Conference held on 3/18/2024. Parties to submit a report by Friday 03/22/2024.(Attorneys present: Atty Rellas, Atty Zalemik, Atty Cole, and Atty Darstadter) (Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
46 46 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 03/13 9:30 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 3/18/2024 at 10:30 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
45 45 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Mon 02/05 3:46 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (60 Days).(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
44 44 adr Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider Mon 02/05 1:13 PM
REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
43 43 misc Stipulation Wed 01/31 5:02 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiff's Deadline to Respond to Counterclaims by Greater Industries Labs, Inc.. (Hrycyszyn, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
42 42 minutes Telephone Conference Mon 01/29 1:46 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson: Telephone Conference held on 1/29/2024.The court went over the progression of the case and readiness for Mediation. Alternative Dispute Resolution (Mediation) Hearing set for 2/2/2024 at 09:30 a.m. in Courtroom 25 (in person only) before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson.(Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html. For a transcript of this proceeding, contact mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Counsel on Record) (Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
40 40 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 01/12 11:15 AM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Allowed re38 Joint Motion for Extension of Time 21 Days to File Response to20 Counterclaims. Plaintiff's Response re 20 Courterclaims due by 2/2/2024. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
41 41 3 pgs order Order Mon 01/22 2:36 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. AGREED STANDSTILL ORDER. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
39 39 misc Stipulation Wed 01/10 9:07 PM
STIPULATION / [Proposed] Agreed Standstill Order by Greater Industries Labs, Inc.. (Hrycyszyn, Gerald)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 01/10 10:20 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Counterclaims by Greater Industries Labs, Inc..(Hrycyszyn, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Rescheduling Tue 01/09 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing. An Alternative Dispute Resolution (Mediation) Hearing has been set for 2/2/2024 at 09:30 a.m. in Courtroom 25 (in person only) before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. TRIAL counsel and ALL PARTIES are ordered to attend for the full day unless excused by the Court. All parties or party representatives in attendance must have full settlement authority. A Pre-mediation Conference has been set for 1/29/2024 at 10:30 a.m. as a remote proceeding. Clients need not attend the preliminary conference. Counsel of record will receive videoconference invitations to the preliminary conference at their email addresses as registered in CM/ECF. Please notify the sessions Deputy Clerk as soon as possible of any technical issues. Counsel should review in full the docketed mediation order. By no later than 7 days before the mediation, each party, separately, shall provide the Court a confidential mediation memorandum (marked Confidential Not for Docketing), which is not to be served upon opposing parties. Each memorandum shall be no longer than 8 pages and must candidly address (in labeled sections) each of the issues listed in the docketed mediation order. The memoranda should be sent by email to Rose Dumoulin, Deputy Clerk (Rose_Dumoulin@mad.uscourts.gov). The Court will hold the memoranda in confidence, and they will not be filed on CM/ECF. If the parties believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time or the date set poses a serious conflict, counsel shall immediately confer with opposing counsel and file an assented-to motion to continue the mediation, including therein several proposed dates on which all counsel and principals are available. (Dumoulin, Rose) Modified docket text on 1/9/2024 (Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
36 36 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 01/08 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Hearing. An Alternative Dispute Resolution (Mediation) Hearing has been set for 01/23/2024 at 09:30 a.m. in Courtroom 25 (in person only) before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. TRIAL counsel and ALL PARTIES are ordered to attend for the full day unless excused by the Court. All parties or party representatives in attendance must have full settlement authority. A Pre-mediation Conference has been set for 01/22/2024 at 12:00 p.m. as a remote proceeding. Clients need not attend the preliminary conference. Counsel of record will receive videoconference invitations to the preliminary conference at their email addresses as registered in CM/ECF. Please notify the sessions Deputy Clerk as soon as possible of any technical issues. Counsel should review in full the docketed mediation order. By no later than 10 days before the mediation, each party, separately, shall provide the Court a confidential mediation memorandum (marked Confidential Not for Docketing), which is not to be served upon opposing parties. Each memorandum shall be no longer than 8 pages and must candidly address (in labeled sections) each of the issues listed in the docketed mediation order. The memoranda should be sent by email to Rose Dumoulin, Deputy Clerk (Rose_Dumoulin@mad.uscourts.gov). The Court will hold the memoranda in confidence, and they will not be filed on CM/ECF. If the parties believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time or the date set poses a serious conflict, counsel shall immediately confer with opposing counsel and file an assented-to motion to continue the mediation, including therein several proposed dates on which all counsel and principals are available. (Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
35 35 minutes Status Conference Mon 01/08 9:34 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson: Status Conference held on 1/8/2024. The court went over the progression of the case and readiness for Mediation.(Attorneys present: Hrycyszyn,Darmstadter,Moore,Dickison,Zalenik) (Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Mon 01/08 8:47 AM
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at[LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/transcripts.htm] (McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Transcript Mon 01/08 8:46 AM
Transcript of Motion Hearing held on January 3, 2024, before Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com. Redaction Request due 1/29/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2024. (McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 01/04 5:59 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 1/5/2024 at 03:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
31 31 utility Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider Thu 01/04 12:42 PM
Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Paul G. Levenson appointed at request of the parties.(Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
30 30 order Order Referring Case to ADR Wed 01/03 3:21 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. Parties request a date as soon as possible with Magistrate Judge Levenson.(mm)
Related: [-]
29 29 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 01/03 3:17 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2024 by video re 10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ORDERED: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. 10) taken under advisement. Parties will engage in 45-day period of expedited discovery, including depositions as stated on the record. Parties will confer and file a proposed joint standstill order by 1/10/2023. The order should state that Defendant will not transfer the information at issue and that Defendant will not start a competitor company while the motion is pending. Matter referred to ADR, parties request a mediation date with Magistrate Judge Levenson as soon as possible. (Atty Moore, Darmstadter, Hrycyszyn, Zaleznik, Dickison,)(Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.) (mm)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Declaration Wed 01/03 11:18 AM
DECLARATION re10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / Supplemental Declaration of Chris Jones by Greater Industries Labs, Inc..(Hrycyszyn, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit O
27 27 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Wed 01/03 10:30 AM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting26 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
26 26 motion Leave to File Document Tue 01/02 5:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Greater Industries Labs, Inc..(Hrycyszyn, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Declaration of Chris Jones
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/02 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan P. Slean on behalf of Ana Cecilia Cole (Slean, Brendan)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/02 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Mark Dickison on behalf of Ana Cecilia Cole (Dickison, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
23 23 motion Joinder Fri 12/29 3:24 PM
MOTION for Joinder by Ana Cecilia Cole.(Zaleznik, Ira)
Related: [-]
22 22 respoth Affidavit in Opposition Fri 12/29 3:21 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Zaleznik, Ira)
Related: [-]
21 21 18 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/29 3:19 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ana Cecilia Cole. (Zaleznik, Ira)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Fri 12/29 3:13 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Greater Industries Labs, Inc. by Ana Cecilia Cole.(Zaleznik, Ira)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
19 19 misc Declaration Fri 12/22 1:40 PM
DECLARATION re10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / Supplementary Declaration of Chris Jones by Greater Industries Labs, Inc..(Hrycyszyn, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit G,
Att: 2 Exhibit H,
Att: 3 Exhibit I,
Att: 4 Exhibit J,
Att: 5 Exhibit K,
Att: 6 Exhibit L,
Att: 7 Exhibit M,
Att: 8 Exhibit N
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/19 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ira H. Zaleznik on behalf of Ana Cecilia Cole (Zaleznik, Ira)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/18 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meaghan P. Luster on behalf of Greater Industries Labs, Inc. (Luster, Meaghan)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Mon 12/18 10:42 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2024 10:15 AM in Remote Proceeding before Judge Patti B. Saris. (mm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
15 15 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Thu 12/14 5:57 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ashley N. Moore. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Thu 12/14 5:50 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Seth E. Darmstadter. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Declaration Thu 12/14 3:15 PM
DECLARATION re10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / Declaration of Michael A. Albert by Greater Industries Labs, Inc..(Albert, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
12 12 misc Declaration Thu 12/14 3:12 PM
DECLARATION re10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / Declaration of Nicholas Rellas by Greater Industries Labs, Inc..(Albert, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
11 11 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 12/14 3:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Greater Industries Labs, Inc.. (Albert, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Thu 12/14 3:04 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Responses due by 12/28/2023) by Greater Industries Labs, Inc..(Albert, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/13 10:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Ana Cecilia Cole served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Albert, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/12 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald B Hrycyszyn on behalf of Greater Industries Labs, Inc. (Hrycyszyn, Gerald)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 12/12 10:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Ana Cecilia Cole. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 12/12 9:17 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/11 8:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ana Cecilia Cole, filed by Greater Industries Labs, Inc..(Albert, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/11 5:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ashley N. Moore Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10170931 by Greater Industries Labs, Inc..(Albert, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/11 5:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Seth E. Darmstadter Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10170910 by Greater Industries Labs, Inc..(Albert, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/11 5:38 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greater Industries Labs, Inc.. (Albert, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/11 5:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Ana Cecilia Cole Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10170867 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Greater Industries Labs, Inc..(Albert, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Category Form