Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John C Melaragno
Case #: 2:23-bk-22657
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Dec 20, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Stockman Lawnscape, Inc.
4540 New Texas Rd
Pittsburgh, PA 15239-1137
Represented By
John Patrick Lacher
The Lynch Law Group Llcc
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222
Represented By
Kate Bradley
U.S. Trustee Program/dept. Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
222 222 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Mon 05/12 1:20 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding the Hearing on 6/18/2025. Filed by Debtor Stockman Lawnscape, Inc. Related [+]. (Lacher, John)
Related: [-] :190 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan,191 Order Noticing Post Confirmation,218 Final Decree filed by Debtor Stockman Lawnscape, Inc.,219 Report filed by Debtor Stockman Lawnscape, Inc.,220 Hearing on a Judge Melaragno Case Set by Attorney or Trustee filed by Debtor Stockman Lawnscape, Inc.
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix
221 221 misc Report in Cases to be Closed Mon 05/12 11:46 AM
Report for Bankruptcy Judges in Cases to be Closed Filed by Debtor Stockman Lawnscape, Inc. (Lacher, John)
Related: [-]
220 220 misc Hearing on a Judge Melaragno Case Set by Attorney or Trustee Mon 05/12 11:13 AM
Hearing on Motion for Final Decree Filed by Debtor Stockman Lawnscape, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/18/2025 at 01:30 PM via p03 Courtroom C, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 5/29/2025. (Lacher, John)
Related: [-] :218 Final Decree filed by Debtor Stockman Lawnscape, Inc.
219 219 misc Report -Generic- Mon 05/12 11:08 AM
Report of Substantial Consummation Filed by Debtor Stockman Lawnscape, Inc. Related [+]. (Lacher, John)
Related: [-] :190 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan,191 Order Noticing Post Confirmation
218 218 motion Final Decree Mon 05/12 11:00 AM
Motion for Final Decree Filed by Debtor Stockman Lawnscape, Inc.. (Lacher, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order