California Central District Court
Judge:Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:23-cv-02337
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Terminated:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2024 1:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Marah Transportation LLC
Defendant
Mohammed Al Saedi
Plaintiff
Ameris Bank
Represented By
Glenn Roger Coffman
Salisian Lee LLP
contact info
Priscilla Yoonjin Chang
Salisian Lee LLP
contact info
Marisa D Poulos
Balboa Capital Corporation
contact info
Neal S Salisian
Salisian Lee LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, September 06, 2024
28 28 judgmentCV Judgment - Default by Judge Fri 09/06 4:02 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Judgment be entered in this matter, in favor of Balboa, and against defendants Marah Transportation LLC, a Michigan limited liability company (Marah Transportation) and Mohammed Al-Saedi, an individual (Al-Saedi) (collectively with Marah Transportation, Defendants), jointly and severally, in the total amount of $67,390.76; which represents: a. Compensatory damages in the amount owed of $57,027.12; b. Attorneys fees in the amount of $3,881.08 for the EFA; c. Prejudgment interest in the amount of $5,279.56, at the statutory rate of ten percent (10%) per annum, from September 21, 2023 (the date of breach), to August 23, 2024 (the hearing date on this Default Motion) for the EFA. d. Costs in the amount of $1,203.00. The Clerk is ordered to enter this Judgment forthwith25 . ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (twdb)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Default Judgment Fri 09/06 3:36 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes (DKT.25 ). For the above reasons, the Court GRANTS Balboas Motion in the amount of $67,390. A separate judgment will be issued along with this order. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
26 26 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 08/20 3:56 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court finds that the Motion for Default Judgment is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. [Dkt. 25]. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on August 23, 2024. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
25 25 motion Default Judgment Thu 07/11 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Marah Transportation LLC and Mohammed Al-Saedi filed by Plaintiff Ameris Bank. Motion set for hearing on 8/23/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Salisian, Neal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Don Ngo,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jared T. Densen,
Att: 3 Proposed Judgment,
Att: 4 Proof of Service
Friday, July 05, 2024
24 24 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Fri 07/05 8:47 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Mohammed Al-Saedi, an individual, Marah Transportation LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
23 23 motion Clerk to Enter Default Tue 07/02 1:28 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Mohammed Al Saedi, Marah Transportation LLC filed by Plaintiff Ameris Bank. (Salisian, Neal)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
22 22 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 06/07 3:44 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Ameris Bank, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only20 served on 6/7/24. (Salisian, Neal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
21 21 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 06/06 2:55 PM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: In view of the Declaration and Proofs of Service, filed on May 22, 2024 and June 5, 2024, the Court hereby DISCHARGES the OSC, issued on May 21, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
20 20 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 06/05 4:19 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
19 19 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 06/05 4:03 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable Sunshine S. Sykes, United States District Judge. Judge Sykes is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Sykes' procedures and schedules is available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 06/05 11:27 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ameris Bank, upon Defendant Mohammed Al Saedi served on 5/30/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mohammed Al Saedi, an individual in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Salisian, Neal)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 06/05 11:24 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ameris Bank, upon Defendant Marah Transportation LLC served on 5/30/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marah Transport LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Salisian, Neal)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
16 16 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Sat 06/01 10:29 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#24-084) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee. This case is transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-02337 SSS(ADSx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
15 15 misc Declaration Wed 05/22 11:05 AM
DECLARATION of Jared T. Densen re Order to Show Cause14 filed by Plaintiff Ameris Bank. (Salisian, Neal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 05/21 11:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/23/2024. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
13 13 misc Declaration Mon 04/15 4:16 PM
DECLARATION of Jared T. Densen RE: RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION filed by Plaintiff Ameris Bank. (Salisian, Neal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/20 8:43 AM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. This Court's Order to Show Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution be continued by approximately thirty days, to 4/15/24, to allow Balboa sufficient time to serve the Defendants. ( Show Cause Response due by 4/15/2024.) (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Lodging Mon 03/18 2:38 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order to Show Cause9(Salisian, Neal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, March 15, 2024
10 10 misc Declaration Fri 03/15 2:42 PM
DECLARATION of Jared T. Densen RE: RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION filed by Plaintiff Ameris Bank. (Salisian, Neal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 03/12 10:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/15/2024. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 12/13 3:57 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Mohammed Al Saedi, Marah Transportation LLC. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 12/13 3:50 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 12/13 3:49 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 12/13 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 12/11 5:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ameris Bank, a Georgia state-chartered banking corporation, identifying Balboa Capital Corporation and Ameris Bank. (Salisian, Neal)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 12/11 4:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Ameris Bank, a Georgia state-chartered banking corporation. (Salisian, Neal)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 12/11 4:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ameris Bank, a Georgia state-chartered banking corporation. (Salisian, Neal)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 12/11 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36554302 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Ameris Bank, a Georgia state-chartered banking corporation. (Attorney Neal S Salisian added to party Ameris Bank, a Georgia state-chartered banking corporation(pty:pla))(Salisian, Neal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B