New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:23-cv-09093
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Terminated:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Jamaica Hospital Medical Center
Represented By
Barbara E. Hoey
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Nicholas James Kromka
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Diana St. Macary
Represented By
Jason L. Solotaroff
Giskan Solotaroff & Anderson, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
17 17 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 09/17 3:36 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Diana St. Macary and against Defendant Jamaica Hospital Medical Center in the sum of Four Thousand Dollars ($4,000 (the Judgment Amount)), said payment to be made promptly upon the court's entry of judgment. Signed by Deputy Clerk, Jalitza Poveda, on behalf of Clerk of Court, Brenna B. Mahoney, on 9/17/2024. (JP)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
order Scheduling Order Mon 09/16 10:59 AM
ORDER: The Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment16 is So Ordered. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and close the case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/16/2024. (GKD)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Fri 09/13 5:16 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Diana St. Macary (Solotaroff, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 08/14 2:34 PM
ORDER: The parties request an extension of time to file a stipulation of discontinuance. ECF No.15 . The request is granted. The parties shall file a stipulation discontinuing this matter by September 16, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 8/14/2024. (JS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 08/13 12:16 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Discontinuance [Joint] by Jamaica Hospital Medical Center. (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
order Scheduling Order Tue 07/16 3:06 PM
ORDER: The parties report reaching a settlement in principle. ECF No.14 . The court commends the parties for their efforts to resolve this matter. The parties shall file a stipulation discontinuing this action by August 16, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/16/2024. (VP)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Mon 07/15 4:01 PM
STATUS REPORT [Joint] Pursuant to the Court's May 21, 2024 Order (Docket # 13) by Jamaica Hospital Medical Center (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/21 4:15 PM
ORDER IN FLSA CASE REQUIRING DISCOVERY AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION SCHEDULE: The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure require a pretrial schedule tailored to the circumstances of each case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. The following Order implements Rule 16's requirement for cases based on the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA). The Rule 26(a)(1) provisions on initial disclosures are waived in this case. Instead, the parties must utilize the following discovery protocol and comply with the following deadlines and requirements set forth in the attached Order . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/21/2024. (EW)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/17 5:16 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Jamaica Hospital Medical Center. (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/17 5:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jamaica Hospital Medical Center (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/01 6:53 PM
ORDER: Defendant requests, with plaintiff's consent, a third extension of time to respond to the complaint. ECF No.10 . The request is granted, as the parties report that they are engaged in "productive discussions regarding potential resolution of this matter." However, the Court will not consider further requests to extend the time to respond to the complaint. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by May 17, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/1/2024. (EW)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/29 2:18 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, [On Consent] by Jamaica Hospital Medical Center. (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/20 6:02 PM
ORDER: Defendant requests, with plaintiff's consent, a second extension of time to respond to the complaint. ECF No.9 . The request is granted. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by April 3, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 2/20/2024. (VP)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/16 2:17 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, [On Consent] by Jamaica Hospital Medical Center. (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/12 11:06 AM
ORDER: Defendant requests, with plaintiff's consent, to extend the time to respond to the complaint. ECF No.8 . The request is granted. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by February 22, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/12/2024. (EW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/11 1:35 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, (On-Consent) by Jamaica Hospital Medical Center. (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/11 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas James Kromka on behalf of Jamaica Hospital Medical Center (aty to be noticed) (Kromka, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/11 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara E. Hoey on behalf of Jamaica Hospital Medical Center (aty to be noticed) (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/09 12:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diana St. Macary. Jamaica Hospital Medical Center served on 1/2/2024, answer due 1/23/2024. (Solotaroff, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 12/12 12:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Jamaica Hospital Medical Center. (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 12/12 11:59 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Tue 12/12 11:59 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 12/12 11:58 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/11 6:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Jamaica Hospital Medical Center filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17367201 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Diana St. Macary. (Solotaroff, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit A