Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 3:23-bk-32939
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jan 10, 2024
Terminated:Feb 28, 2025

Debtor
Monkey King Noodle Company
1107 Kenshire Ln
Richardson, TX 75081-4363
Represented By
Eric A. Liepins
Eric A. Liepins, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Robert Yaquinto, Jr.
509 N. Montclair
Dallas, TX 75208
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 12/12/2023 12:04 AM CST
Monday, December 11, 2023
1 1 32 pgs misc Voluntary petition chapter 7 (attorney filer) Mon 12/11 5:13 PM
Non-individual Chapter 7 voluntary petition. Fee Amount $338 Filed by Monkey King Noodle Company (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs court Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign Mon 12/11 11:01 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/10/2024 at 11:20 AM by TELEPHONE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]