Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:23-bk-61331

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Tiiara NA Patton
Case #: 6:23-ap-06035
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Terminated:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alpine Advance 5 LLC
46 Washington St, Suite 6
Middleton, CT 06457
Represented By
Alpine Advance 5 LLC
contact info
Defendant
Credibly of Arizona LLC
25200 Telegraph Rd, Suite 350
Southfield, MI 48033
Represented By
Credibly of Arizona LLC
contact info
Defendant
Proventure Capital LLC
2613 E. 16th St
Brooklyn, NY 11235
Represented By
Proventure Capital LLC
contact info
Defendant
Blade Funding Inc
PO Box 714
Lakewood, NJ 08701
Represented By
Blade Funding Inc
contact info
Defendant
Capify Capital
475 Park Ave S, 11th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Capify Capital
contact info
Defendant
Cardinal Funding Group
41 Pinelawn Rd, Suite 1001
Melville, NY 11747
Represented By
Cardinal Funding Group
contact info
Defendant
Delta Capital
Business Capital LLC 88 Pine St
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
Delta Capital
contact info
Defendant
Diesel Funding LLC
1100 NE 163rd St
Miami, FL 33162
Represented By
Diesel Funding LLC
contact info
Defendant
EBF Holdings, LLC
dba Everest Business Funding 102 W 38th St, 6th Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
EBF Holdings, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Reef Funding
2600 N. Ashton Blvd, Suite 200
Lehi, UT 84043
Represented By
Reef Funding
contact info
Defendant
Square Funding LLC
8215 Roswell Rd, Building 600
Atlanta, GA 30350
Represented By
Square Funding LLC
contact info
Defendant
Wynwood Capital
3629 Tuxedo Rd NW
Atlanta, GA 30305
Represented By
Wynwood Capital
contact info
Plaintiff
Fat Daddy Co
1825 11th St NE
Massillon, OH 44646
Represented By
Edwin H. Breyfogle
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, September 05, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 09/05 3:51 PM
Disposition of Adversary 6:23-ap-6035 Judgment For Both (lbald)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/05 3:53 PM
Adversary Case 6:23-ap-6035 Closed (lbald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI Tue 07/16 11:09 AM
Hearing Not Held and Rescheduled Related [+] (eross, crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI Tue 07/16 11:11 AM
Hearing Not Held and Rescheduled Related [+] (eross, crt)
Related: [-] 32 Amended Motion
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI Tue 07/16 11:11 AM
Hearing Not Held and Rescheduled Related [+] (eross, crt)
Related: [-] 33 Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, July 12, 2024
35 35 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Sat 07/13 12:15 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
34 34 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Wed 07/10 7:53 AM
Order regarding Joint Motion to Approve Settlement with EBF Holdings, LLC Signed on 7/9/2024 Related [+]. (vwaym crt)
Related: [-] 30 Generic Motion
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice Wed 06/05 1:22 PM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 7/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at Ralph Regula U.S. Courthouse, Canton - Courtroom. (vwaym)
Related: [-] 32 Amended Motion
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice Wed 06/05 1:24 PM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 7/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at Ralph Regula U.S. Courthouse, Canton - Courtroom. (vwaym)
Related: [-] 33 Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
33 33 7 pgs motion Default Judgment Tue 06/04 1:54 PM
Amended Motion for Default Judgment Against Credibly of Arizona, Diesel Funding, LLC, Blade Funding, Square Funding, Proventure Capital, LLC and Capital Capify Refiled to Correct Deficiency Filed by Fat Daddy Co (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Amended Motion Tue 06/04 1:52 PM
Amended Motion for Default Judgment Against Alpine Advance 5 LLC, Cardinal Funding Group, Delta Capital, Reef Funding and Wynwood Capital Refiled to Correct Deficiency Filed by Fat Daddy Co Related [+] (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-] 27 Motion for Default Judgment
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI Tue 06/04 11:54 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned Related [+] (eross, crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI Tue 05/21 2:15 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned Related [+] (eross, crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, May 17, 2024
31 31 court Notice of Filing Deficiency Fri 05/17 3:11 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency: Notice of Motion with date certain objection deadline and hearing date/time required. Please refer to Judge Patton's page on the Court's website; Canton Office; 8/11/2023 Self-Calendaring Hearing Dates for Canton Chapter 11 and Chapter 12 Matters. Also see General Practices and Procedures Related [+] and Zoom Appearance Procedures (Exhibit B of Judge Patton's Procedures for Appearing via Zoom Video Communications (Effective August 21, 2023) (Revised August 11, 2023) for required notice (RE: related document(s)27 Motion for Default Judgment,29 Motion for Default Judgment). (vwaym)
Related: [-] vised August 11, 2023vised August 11, 2023
30 30 motion Generic Motion Fri 05/17 10:37 AM
Joint Motion to Approve Settlement with EBF Holdings, LLC Filed by Fat Daddy Co (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Default Judgment Fri 05/17 10:07 AM
Amended Motion for Default Judgment against Credibly of Arizon, Diesel Funding, LLC, Blade Funding, Square Funding, Proventure Capital, LLC, and Capital Capify Filed by Fat Daddy Co (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Default Judgment Fri 05/17 9:56 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Credibly of Arizona, Diesel Funding, LLC, Blade Funding, Square Funding and Proventure Capital, LLC Filed by Fat Daddy Co (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Default Judgment Fri 05/17 9:52 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Alpine Advance 5 LLC, Cardinal Funding Group, Delta Capital, Reef Funding, Wynwood Capital (Breyfogle, Edwin aty) Modified on 5/17/2024 (vwaym)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
26 26 BNC Notice of Hearing Sat 05/11 12:13 AM
Notice of Hearing w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
25 25 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched w/ Notice Wed 05/08 10:06 AM
Hearing Time Rescheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2024 at 01:00 PM at Ralph Regula U.S. Courthouse, Canton - Courtroom. (eross)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, April 25, 2024
24 24 BNC Clerks Entry of Default Fri 04/26 12:10 AM
Clerks Entry of Default w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
23 23 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/23 3:15 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default for Alpine Advance 5 LLC, Cardinal Funding Group, Delta Capital, Reef Funding, and Wynwood Capital Related [+] (krupe)
Related: [-] 21 Application for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Fat Daddy Co
Monday, April 22, 2024
22 22 misc Affidavit Mon 04/22 4:59 PM
Affidavit Re: Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Service Filed by Plaintiff Fat Daddy Co Related [+]. (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-] 21 Application for Entry of Default
21 21 misc Application for Entry of Default Mon 04/22 4:55 PM
Application for Entry of Default Filed by Fat Daddy Co. (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI Tue 04/16 11:36 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned Related [+] (eross, crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
20 20 BNC Clerks Entry of Default Thu 03/21 12:09 AM
Clerks Entry of Default w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Monday, March 18, 2024
19 19 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 03/18 9:00 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default for Credibly of Arizona, Diesel Funding, LLC, Blade Funding, Square Funding, Proventure Capital, LLC and Capify Capital Related [+] (krupe)
Related: [-] 17 Application for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Fat Daddy Co
Thursday, March 14, 2024
18 18 answer Affidavit Thu 03/14 3:14 PM
Affidavit of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Service Filed by Fat Daddy Co Related [+]. (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-] 17
17 17 misc Application for Entry of Default Thu 03/14 3:12 PM
Application for Entry of Default Related [+] Filed by Fat Daddy Co. (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-] filed to Correct Deficiency13
16 16 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 03/14 2:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on Alpine Advance 5 LLC 3/14/2024; Cardinal Funding Group 3/14/2024; Delta Capital 3/14/2024; Reef Funding 3/14/2024; Wynwood Capital 3/14/2024 (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
15 15 cmp Summons Issued Mon 03/11 4:57 PM
Second Alias Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Alpine Advance 5 LLC Answer due 4/10/2024; Cardinal Funding Group Answer due 4/10/2024; Delta Capital Answer due 4/10/2024; Reef Funding Answer due 4/10/2024; Wynwood Capital Answer due 4/10/2024. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at Ralph Regula U.S. Courthouse, Canton - Courtroom. (aprib)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Fat Daddy Co
misc Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Mon 03/11 2:58 PM
Request for Issuance of Alias Summons (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Mon 03/11 3:14 PM
Amended Request for Issuance of Alias Summons for Delta Capital, Alpine Advance 5 LLC, Cardinal Funding Group, Wynwood Capital and Reef Funding (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
14 14 court Notice of Filing Deficiency Fri 03/08 11:46 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency: (1) Return receipts referred to in Application for Clerk's Entry of Default are not attached; and (2) Affidavits required for each Defendant - See Instructions to Official Form 2600 Related [+]. (vwaym)
Related: [-] 13 Application for Entry of Default
Thursday, March 07, 2024
13 13 misc Application for Entry of Default Thu 03/07 11:07 AM
Application for Entry of Default Filed by Fat Daddy Co Related [+] (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
12 12 misc Withdraw Document/Motion Thu 03/07 11:05 AM
Withdraw Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Fat Daddy Co Related [+]. (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
11 11 court Notice of Filing Deficiency Wed 02/21 7:27 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency: The filing of an Application for Clerk's Entry of Default is required before Plaintiff can file a Motion for Default Judgment Related [+]. Counsel to withdraw Motions and proceed accordingly. (vwaym)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Default Judgment,9 Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
10 10 cmp Summons Issued Tue 02/20 3:42 PM
Alias Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Alpine Advance 5 LLC Answer due 3/21/2024; Blade Funding Inc Answer due 3/21/2024; Capify Capital Answer due 3/21/2024; Cardinal Funding Group Answer due 3/21/2024; Credibly of Arizona LLC Answer due 3/21/2024; Credibly of Arizona LLC Answer due 3/21/2024; Delta Capital Answer due 3/21/2024; Diesel Funding LLC Answer due 3/21/2024; EBF Holdings, LLC Answer due 3/21/2024; Proventure Capital LLC Answer due 3/21/2024; Reef Funding Answer due 3/21/2024; Square Funding LLC Answer due 3/21/2024; Wynwood Capital Answer due 3/21/2024. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at Ralph Regula U.S. Courthouse, Canton - Courtroom. (aprib)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Fat Daddy Co
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI Tue 02/20 1:18 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned Related [+] (eross, crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, February 19, 2024
9 9 motion Default Judgment Mon 02/19 5:34 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Capify Capital Filed by Fat Daddy Co (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Default Judgment Mon 02/19 5:32 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Credibly of Arizona, Diesel Funding, LLC, Blade Funding, Square Funding and Proventure Capital, LLC Filed by Fat Daddy Co (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Generic Motion Mon 02/19 5:29 PM
Motion Regarding Service Filed by Fat Daddy Co (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Mon 02/19 5:27 PM
Request for Issuance of Alias Summons (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/18 11:03 AM
Summons Service Executed on Alpine Advance 5 LLC 12/18/2023; Blade Funding Inc 12/18/2023; Capify Capital 12/18/2023; Cardinal Funding Group 12/18/2023; Credibly of Arizona LLC 12/18/2023; Credibly of Arizona LLC 12/18/2023; Delta Capital 12/18/2023; Diesel Funding LLC 12/18/2023; EBF Holdings, LLC 12/18/2023; Fat Daddy Co 12/18/2023; Proventure Capital LLC 12/18/2023; Reef Funding 12/18/2023; Square Funding LLC 12/18/2023; Wynwood Capital 12/18/2023 (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
5 5 BNC Notice of Scheduling Order Sat 12/16 12:13 AM
Notice of Scheduling Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
4 4 cmp Summons Issued Wed 12/13 1:41 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Alpine Advance 5 LLC Answer due 1/12/2024; Blade Funding Inc Answer due 1/12/2024; Capify Capital Answer due 1/12/2024; Cardinal Funding Group Answer due 1/12/2024; Credibly of Arizona LLC Answer due 1/12/2024; Credibly of Arizona LLC Answer due 1/12/2024; Delta Capital Answer due 1/12/2024; Diesel Funding LLC Answer due 1/12/2024; EBF Holdings, LLC Answer due 1/12/2024; Proventure Capital LLC Answer due 1/12/2024; Reef Funding Answer due 1/12/2024; Square Funding LLC Answer due 1/12/2024; Wynwood Capital Answer due 1/12/2024. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/20/2024 at 01:00 PM at Ralph Regula U.S. Courthouse, Canton - Courtroom. (aprib)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Fat Daddy Co
3 3 order Scheduling Order (PDF) Wed 12/13 1:39 PM
Initial Pretrial Hearing via Zoom and Case Management Order Signed on 12/13/2023 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/20/2024 at 01:00 PM at Ralph Regula U.S. Courthouse, Canton - Courtroom. (vwaym crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 order Initial Pretrial and/or Adversary Case Management Wed 12/13 1:36 PM
This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the pretrial or case management order in an adversary proceeding. The enclosed order has been issued by the Court and electronically placed on the adversary case docket. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of this order will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. It is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to serve the pretrial or case management order on defendants(s) pursuant to applicable rules and instructions. Initial Pretrial and/or Adversary Case Management Order Signed on 12/13/2023 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/20/2024 at 01:00 PM at Ralph Regula U.S. Courthouse, Canton - Courtroom. (aprib crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
utility Corrective Entry Wed 12/13 3:44 PM
Corrective Entry Made by Court: Disregard Order at (Doc3 ); Duplicate of Order at (Doc2 ) inadvertently entered Related [+]. (vwaym)
Related: [-] 3 Scheduling Order
Monday, December 11, 2023
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/11 4:04 PM
Adversary case 23-06035 Complaint by Fat Daddy Co against Alpine Advance 5 LLC, Credibly of Arizona LLC, Proventure Capital LLC, Blade Funding Inc, Capify Capital, Cardinal Funding Group, Credibly of Arizona LLC, Delta Capital, Diesel Funding LLC, EBF Holdings, LLC, Reef Funding, Square Funding LLC, Wynwood Capital. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit:21 (Validity, Priority or Extent of Lien or Other Interest in Property; Rule 7001(2)) (Breyfogle, Edwin aty)
Related: [-]