Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Donald C Nugent
Case #: 5:23-cv-02363
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2023
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025
Case in other court:Summit County Court of Common Pleas, CV-23-00011-4205
Last checked: Sunday Jun 09, 2024 6:11 AM EDT
Counter-Claimant
ValueHealth, LLC.
Represented By
Lynn Rowe Larsen
Taft Stettinius & Hollister - Cleveland
contact info
Michael J. Zbiegien, Jr.
Taft Stettinius & Hollister - Cleveland
contact info
Jozeff W. Gebolys
Taft Stettinius & Hollister - Cleveland
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Brennan Manna Diamond, LLC
75 E. Market Street
Akron, OH 44308
Represented By
Frank G. Mazgaj
Hanna, Campbell & Powell
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Jack Diamond
Represented By
Orville L. Reed, III
Stark & Knoll
contact info
Frank G. Mazgaj
Hanna, Campbell & Powell
contact info
Hamilton DeSaussure, Jr.
Stark & Knoll
contact info
David W. Hilkert
Stark & Knoll
contact info
Defendant
ValueHealth, LLC.
Represented By
Lynn Rowe Larsen
Taft Stettinius & Hollister - Cleveland
contact info
Michael J. Zbiegien, Jr.
Taft Stettinius & Hollister - Cleveland
contact info
Jozeff W. Gebolys
Taft Stettinius & Hollister - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Jack Diamond
Represented By
Orville L. Reed, III
Stark & Knoll
contact info
Hamilton DeSaussure, Jr.
Stark & Knoll
contact info
David W. Hilkert
Stark & Knoll
contact info

GPO Mar 19 2024
Memorandum Opinion and Order. For the reasons set forth, Defendant ValueHealth's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 13(b)(6) (ECF # 6) is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 4/1/2024 at 9:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 3/19/2024. (H,Ch)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, February 20, 2025
49 49 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/20 3:33 PM
Order of Dismissal . The parties have filed a Stipulated Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice (ECF #48 ). Therefore, this action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. The Court retains jurisdiction over the settlement agreement related to this matter. re48 . Judge Donald C. Nugent on 2/20/2025. (M,S)
Related: [-]
48 48 notice Stipulation (atty event) Thu 02/20 3:14 PM
Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Jack Diamond. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Orville
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
47 47 minutes Status Conference Tue 01/28 9:35 AM
Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/28/2025 with all counsel participating. After participating in mediation on 1/21/2025, all parties have reached a resolution in the case, and are preparing papers to dismiss the case within the next 30 days. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 10 minutes. (M,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
46 46 minutes Status Conference Wed 12/11 10:45 AM
Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/11/2024 with all counsel participating. Mediation with Mike Unger is scheduled for 1/21/2025 with all parties participating. Next Status Conference set for 1/28/2025 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. (M,S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
45 45 minutes Status Conference Thu 09/12 11:32 AM
Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/12/2024 with all counsel participating. Discovery on-going. Parties are going to have a mediation with Mike Ungar in October or November. Discovery extended to 3/1/2025. Next Status Conference set for 12/11/2024 at 08:45 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. (M,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
44 44 notice Notice of Deposition (atty event) Wed 08/14 11:20 AM
Second Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Scott Palecki on September 10, 2024 filed by Jack Diamond. Related document(s)39 and40 . (DeSaussure, Hamilton) Modified text on 8/14/2024 (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
43 43 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Mon 08/12 2:43 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Responses to ValueHealths LLCs First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Admission and Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Jack Diamond. (DeSaussure, Hamilton)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
42 42 order Stipulation & Order Tue 07/16 12:00 PM
Stipulation & Order Regarding Modification to Protective Order Related to Documents From Medical Facilities Corporation Documents. re36 ,41 . Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/16/2024. (M,S)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
41 41 notice Stipulation (atty event) Fri 07/12 1:33 PM
Proposed Stipulation Regarding Modification to Protective Order Related to Documents From Medical Facilities Corporation Documents filed by ValueHealth, LLC.. (Zbiegien, Michael)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of Deposition (atty event) Fri 07/12 9:46 AM
Amended Notice to take Deposition of Scott Palecki on July 24, 2024 filed by Jack Diamond. (DeSaussure, Hamilton)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
39 39 notice Notice of Deposition (atty event) Wed 07/03 11:42 AM
Notice to take Deposition of Scott Palecki on July 24, 2024 filed by Jack Diamond. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Orville
Thursday, June 13, 2024
38 38 notice Notice of Deposition (atty event) Thu 06/13 9:00 AM
Second Amended Notice of Video Deposition of Dan Tasset on June 21, 2024 beginning at 9:00 a.m. filed by Jack Diamond. (DeSaussure, Hamilton)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
37 37 minutes Status Conference Tue 06/04 9:36 AM
Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/4/2024 with all counsel participating. Protective Order entered and parties are scheduling several depositions. Discovery on-going and fact discovery closes 11/24/2024. Next Status Conference set for 9/12/2024 at 08:45 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. Related document(s)36 . (M,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
36 36 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Protective Order Wed 05/15 3:57 PM
Stipulated Protective Order regarding confidential documents. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/15/2024. (M,S)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Protective Order Wed 05/15 11:20 AM
Joint Motion for protective order filed by Counter-Claimant ValueHealth, LLC.(Larsen, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Proposed Protective Order
Friday, May 10, 2024
34 34 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/10 11:13 AM
Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent.Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/10/2024 with all counsel participating. Parties will try to reach a resolution on a Protective Order. If unsuccesful, parties are to contact the Court for Status Conference set for 5/13/2024 at 08:30 AM, to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 20 minutes. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
33 33 oth_ans Response/Reply/Sur-Reply Thu 05/09 4:43 PM
Brennan Manna & Diamond, LLC's Response to ValueHealth's Letter Request for Relief filed by Brennan Manna Diamond, LLC. Related document(s)31 . (Mazgaj, Frank)
Related: [-]
32 32 oth_ans Response/Reply/Sur-Reply Thu 05/09 12:46 PM
Diamond's Response to ValueHealth's Letter Request for Relief filed by Jack Diamond. Related document(s)31 . Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Orville
Att: 1 Exhibit A - November 10, 2020 email from Dan Tasset,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - November 23, 2020 email from Scott Palecki,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - April 11, 2024 email from Orville Reed,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - April 17, 2024 Letter from Hamilton DeSaussure,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Value Health, LLC's Objections and Responses to Jack Diamond's First Requests for Production of Documents
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Tue 05/07 10:59 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Status Conference re31 set for 5/9/2024 at 10:30 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Related document(s)31 . (M,S)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Tue 05/07 11:32 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] continuing Status Conference. Status Conference re31 re-set for 5/10/2024 at 10:30 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Related document(s)31 . (M,S)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
31 31 oth_doc Letter (atty event) Mon 05/06 5:22 PM
Letter to Judge Nugent requesting Local Rule 37.1 Telephone Conference filed by ValueHealth, LLC.. (Larsen, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
30 30 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 04/29 9:29 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Brennan Manna Diamond, LLC. (Mazgaj, Frank)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
29 29 oth_ans Answer Fri 04/26 10:46 AM
Answer to the Counterclaim of ValueHealth, LLC filed by Jack Diamond. Related document(s)19 . Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Orville
Thursday, April 25, 2024
28 28 answer Answer/Reply to Counterclaim Thu 04/25 4:51 PM
Reply to19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of ValueHealth, LLC filed by Brennan Manna Diamond, LLC. (Mazgaj, Frank)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 04/25 4:44 PM
Attorney Appearance by Frank G. Mazgaj filed by on behalf of Brennan Manna Diamond, LLC, Jack Diamond. (Mazgaj, Frank)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
26 26 service Return of Service Executed Thu 04/18 11:36 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Brennan Manna Diamond, LLC on 4/16/2024, filed on behalf of ValueHealth, LLC. Related document(s)22 . (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Wed 04/17 3:31 PM
Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's24 Motion for extension of time until April 26, 2024 to Respond to Defendant's Counterclaim. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/17/2024. (M,S)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Extension (other) Wed 04/17 11:23 AM
Motion for extension of time until April 26, 2024 to Respond to Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff Jack Diamond. (DeSaussure, Hamilton)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Deposition (atty event) Mon 04/15 3:38 PM
Amended Notice to take Deposition of Dan Tasset via Video on May 16th, 2024 beginning at 9:00 a.m. filed by Jack Diamond. (DeSaussure, Hamilton)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
oth_evt Service by Clerk Fri 04/12 1:48 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Brennan Manna Diamond, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7002 3150 0003 3673 5050. (Crosby, Devon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
22 22 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 04/03 4:51 PM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Brennan Manna Diamond, LLC. (P,G)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
21 21 minutes Status Conference Mon 04/01 10:30 AM
Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/1/2024 with all counsel participating. Case assigned to standard track. Discovery underway. Written document exchanges have taken place. Plaintiff to take several depositions. Defense believes that settlement before Judge Brennen is relevant to this case and Defendant has filed a multi-count counterclaim. Parties to submit Protective Order. Next Status Conference set for 6/4/2024 at 08:45 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. (M,S)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
20 20 oth_doc Praecipe Fri 03/29 4:54 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by ValueHealth, LLC..(Larsen, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 03/29 4:28 PM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against Jack Diamond, Brennan Manna Diamond, LLC filed by ValueHealth, LLC.. (Larsen, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Tue 03/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Responses to ValueHealth, LLC's First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Jack Diamond filed by Jack Diamond. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Orville
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
17 17 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Memorandum Opinion and Order Tue 03/19 1:15 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order. For the reasons set forth, Defendant ValueHealth's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 13(b)(6) (ECF #6 ) is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 4/1/2024 at 9:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 3/19/2024. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Deposition (atty event) Mon 03/11 1:26 PM
Notice to take Deposition of Dan Tasset via Video on April 11, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Jack Diamond. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Orville
Thursday, February 29, 2024
15 15 notice Initial Disclosures (atty event) Thu 02/29 5:26 PM
Initial Disclosures filed by ValueHealth, LLC.. (Larsen, Lynn)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Initial Disclosures (atty event) Thu 02/29 4:16 PM
Initial Disclosures filed by Jack Diamond. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Orville
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
13 13 resp Reply Tue 02/27 4:55 PM
Reply in support of6 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by ValueHealth, LLC.. (Larsen, Lynn)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Tue 02/27 11:16 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff Jack Diamond's First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant and Plaintiff Jack Diamond's First Request for Admissions Directed to Defendant filed by Jack Diamond. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Orville
Friday, February 23, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Fri 02/23 11:56 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's10 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 2/27/2024 to File Its Reply Brief in Support of6 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) . Judge Donald C. Nugent on 2/23/2024.(M,S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
10 10 motion Extension (other) Thu 02/22 4:46 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 2/27/2024 to File Its Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 6) filed by Defendant ValueHealth, LLC.. Related document(s)6 . (Larsen, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
9 9 minutes Case Management Conference Wed 02/21 11:32 AM
Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 2/21/2024. Case is assigned to the standard track. Fact Discovery due by 11/21/2024. Burden of Proof Expert Reports due by 12/21/2024, Rebuttal Reports due 45 days after initial reports. Expert Discovery to close 30 days after Rebuttal Reports. Status Conference set for 4/1/2024 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. (M,S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
8 8 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Thu 02/15 11:18 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(F), L.R. 16.3(b)(3) - filed by Jack Diamond. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Orville
Friday, February 09, 2024
7 7 resp Opposition Fri 02/09 3:56 PM
Opposition to6 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Jack Diamond. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Orville
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Complaint filed in Case No. 5:21-cv-01070-SL
Thursday, January 18, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss Thu 01/18 3:39 PM
Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant ValueHealth, LLC.. Related document(s)1 .(Larsen, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint of HCFP
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
5 5 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Wed 01/03 1:41 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference on 2/21/2024 at 09:45 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 1/3/2024. (M,S)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
oth_evt Remark by Finance Mon 12/18 10:41 AM
Remark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $405.00 refunded on 12/18/2023 for receipt AOHNDC-12312605. (K,Ve)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
4 4 motion Leave Thu 12/14 3:31 PM
Unopposed Motion for leave to Plead filed by Defendant ValueHealth, LLC.. Related document(s)1 . (Larsen, Lynn)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for leave Thu 12/14 3:54 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for leave to Plead until 1/18/2024 Related [+]. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 12/14/2023. (M,S)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
oth_doc Request to Clerk for Refund of Erroneous or Duplicate On-line Filing Fee Payment Wed 12/13 8:16 AM
Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Duplicate filing fee paid. Receipt #: AOHNDC-12312605, as to ValueHealth, LLC. Related document(s)1 . (S,HR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
3 3 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Tue 12/12 2:19 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Tue 12/12 2:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ValueHealth, LLC. (Larsen, Lynn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 12/12 1:19 PM
Notice of Removal from Summit County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-2023 11-4205 Filing fee paid $ 405.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12312605. Filer has indicated that case may be related to terminated civil action 5:21-cv-1070 . Filed by ValueHealth, LLC. (Larsen, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Disclosure of Citizenship,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Service Page and Proof of Delivery,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
oth_doc Request to Clerk for Refund of Erroneous or Duplicate On-line Filing Fee Payment Tue 12/12 1:56 PM
Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Receipt #: AOHNDC-12312590, filed by ValueHealth, LLC. Related document(s)1 . (Larsen, Lynn)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 12/12 2:12 PM
Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 12/12 2:14 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,DL)
Related: [-]