Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-42697

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 4:23-ap-04095
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mynd Property Management
Represented By
Mynd Property Management
contact info
Plaintiff
Taliah Mims
7309 Fredricksburg Dr.
Fort Worth, TX 76140
Represented By
Guy H. Holman
Guy Harvey Holman, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
court Close adversary case Tue 02/20 9:08 AM
Adversary case 4:23-ap-4095 closed (Kerr, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding Mon 02/19 1:54 PM
Notice of dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff Taliah Mims. (Holman, Guy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
8 8 cmp Summons service executed Fri 01/05 1:41 PM
Summons service executed on Mynd Property Management 12/21/2023 (Holman, Guy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon Service Executed Form
Att: 2 Service Receipt
Friday, December 29, 2023
7 7 cmp Summons service executed Fri 12/29 12:12 PM
Summons service executed on Mynd Property Management 12/21/2023 (Holman, Guy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
6 6 misc Adversary proceeding cover sheet Thu 12/14 8:50 AM
Adversary proceeding cover sheet filed by Plaintiff Taliah Mims Related [+]. (Holman, Guy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Notice of deficiency
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
5 5 court Summons issued Tue 12/12 2:07 PM
Summons issued on Mynd Property Management aka Mynd Management Inc. Answer Due 1/11/2024 (Calfee, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Tue 12/12 2:04 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 5/23/2024 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/mullin. Entered on 12/12/2023 (Calfee, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Taliah Mims
3 3 court Notice of deficiency Tue 12/12 8:35 AM
Notice of deficiency. Adversary Cover Sheet due 12/14/2023. (Nunns, Tracy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Support/supplemental document Tue 12/12 12:21 AM
Support/supplemental document filed by Plaintiff Taliah Mims Related [+]. (Holman, Guy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit B
Att: 2 Exhibit C
Att: 3 Exhibit D
Att: 4 Exhibit E
Att: 5 Exhibit F
Att: 6 Exhibit G
Att: 7 Exhibit H
Att: 8 Exhibit I
Monday, December 11, 2023
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/11 11:32 PM
Adversary case 23-04095 Complaint by Taliah Mims against Mynd Property Management. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 72 (Injunctive relief - other). (Holman, Guy) Modified text on 12/12/2023 (Nunns, Tracy)
Related: [-]