Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Jane M Beckering
Referred: Maarten Vermaat
Case #: 2:23-cv-00236
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2023
Terminated:Mar 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 09, 2024 6:07 AM EDT
defendant
Curtis Travelers Lodge LLC
defendant
John Lineberry
plaintiff
Abbey Haines
Represented By
Robert Anthony Alvarez, Sr.
Avanti Law Group, Pllc (mi)
contact info
Robert Anthony Alvarez
Avanti Law Group, Pllc (mi)
contact info
plaintiff
Shawna Haines
Represented By
Robert Anthony Alvarez, Sr.
Avanti Law Group, Pllc (mi)
contact info
Robert Anthony Alvarez
Avanti Law Group, Pllc (mi)
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 15, 2024
8 8 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Fri 03/15 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiffs Abbey Haines, Shawna Haines (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Fri 03/15 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiffs Abbey Haines, Shawna Haines (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
6 6 order Notice of Impending Dismissal Mon 02/12 12:11 PM
NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL: Plaintiffs to timely complete service of process or file a verified petition RE: Service of Process by 3/11/2024, or the case as to Defendant Curtis Travelers Lodge LLC will be dismissed without prejudice; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/25 4:27 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; John Lineberry served on 1/21/2024, answer due 2/12/2024 (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 12/13 1:41 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Curtis Travelers Lodge LLC, John Lineberry (eod)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Wed 12/13 1:37 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering (eod)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
2 2 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Tue 12/12 4:06 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/12 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Abbey Haines, Shawna Haines (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Tue 12/12 4:10 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiffs Abbey Haines, Shawna Haines in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7241798 (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]