Henrico County, Virginia v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-23042 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 13, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Eastern, 3:23-cv-00782 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 4:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS INC
|
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Optumrx Inc.
|
|
Defendant
OptumInsight Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
|
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
|
|
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
|
|
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
|
|
In Re
INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
Henrico County, Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against CAREMARK L.L.C., CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC, CAREMARK RX L.L.C., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., EVERNORTH HEALTH INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS INC, EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., Optum Inc., OptumInsight Inc., Optumrx Inc., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C., UnitedHealth Group Inc, filed by Henrico County, Virginia.(PIFKO, MARK) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. UnitedHealth Group Inc waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
33 | 33
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. Optumrx Inc. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
32 | 32
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. OptumInsight Inc. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
31 | 31
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. Optum Inc. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
29 | 29
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. EXPRESS SCRIPTS INC waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
28 | 28
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
27 | 27
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
26 | 26
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. EVERNORTH HEALTH INC. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
25 | 25
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by TROY ALAN RAFFERTY on behalf of Henrico County, Virginia (RAFFERTY, TROY) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM FRANKLIN CASH, III on behalf of Henrico County, Virginia (CASH, WILLIAM) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON LEE BOGLE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BOGLE, BRANDON) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
20 | 20
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. NOVO NORDISK INC. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by BECCA TIMMONS on behalf of Henrico County, Virginia (TIMMONS, BECCA) |
|
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Schultz on behalf of Henrico County, Virginia (Schultz, Matthew) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. CVS PHARMACY INC. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
16 | 16
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. CVS HEALTH CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
15 | 15
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. CAREMARK L.L.C. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
14 | 14
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. CAREMARK RX L.L.C. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
13 | 13
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henrico County, Virginia. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MARK P PIFKO on behalf of Henrico County, Virginia (PIFKO, MARK) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE COONEY MANSOUR on behalf of Henrico County, Virginia (MANSOUR, CHRISTINE) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by RUSSELL WILLS BUDD on behalf of Henrico County, Virginia (BUDD, RUSSELL) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JULES BURTON LEBLANC, III on behalf of Henrico County, Virginia (LEBLANC, JULES) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE DORSEY on behalf of Henrico County, Virginia (DORSEY, CATHERINE) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Clerk's Notice to Counsel: Pursuant to CTO Number 7 entered in MDL No. 3080, Eastern District of Virginia case number 3:23-cv-782 has been transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned civil action number: 2 23-23042 In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL 3080. (krg) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:23-cv-00782. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 12/13 11:31 AM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg) |
||
utility
Create Case Association
Wed 12/13 11:32 AM
Cases associated to 2:23-md-03080-BRM-RLS. (krg) |
||
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Case electronically transferred to District of the District of New Jersey per Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-7) of the MDL Panel 3080. (jsmi, ) | ||
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Notice of Correction re:1 Complaint; Clerk corrected the named defendant, "Evernorth Health, Inc. and added the "alias". No further action is required. (sbea) | ||
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young. (jsmi, ) | ||
Filing attorney is instructed to file the proposed summons (in non-fillable format) to serve the defendant, or if waiving service, to notify the court in writing by electronically filing the notice. (jsmi, ) | ||
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Electronic Fee Payment - as to1 Complaint by Henrico County, Virginia. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9229003. (Spivey, William) |