Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael R Barrett
Case #: 1:23-cv-00807
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2023
Terminated:Dec 27, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Credit Wellness, LLC
Plaintiff
Cheryl Imsicke
Represented By
Jeffrey Scott Hyslip
Hyslip Legal, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 12/27 9:51 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 12/21 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Cheryl Imsicke (Hyslip, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 12/13 2:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Credit Wellness, LLC. (bjc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/13 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Credit Wellness, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9728028), filed by Cheryl Imsicke. (Hyslip, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form
misc Docket Annotation Wed 12/13 2:07 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
Related: [-]