Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: Carol B Whitehurst
Case #: 2:23-cv-01755
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause30:1276 Interior: Review of Agency Action
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2023
Terminated:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 3:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Howard Cantor
Office of Natural Resources Revenue 6th Avenue and Kipling Street Bldg. 85
Denver, CO 80225
Represented By
Daniel Luecke
U S Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Debra Haaland
Secretary of the Interior 1849 C Street, NW
Washington, DC 20240
Represented By
Daniel Luecke
U S Dept Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Medco Energi U S L L C
Represented By
Scott A O'Connor
Gordon Arata Et Al (no)
contact info
Jefferson Briscoe Goldman
Gordon Arata Et Al (no)
contact info
Carey Lyon Menasco
Liskow & Lewis (no)
contact info
Jana L Grauberger
Liskow & Lewis (hou)
contact info
Valkyrie Eliana Buffa
Liskow & Lewis (hou)
contact info
Martin E Landrieu
Gordon Arata Et Al (no)
contact info
Anthony C Marino
Gordon Arata Et Al (no)
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
appeal Appeal Record Certified to USCA Fri 05/02 5:39 PM
ELECTRONICALLY CERTIFIED Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re38 Notice of Appeal is now available to Appellate Counsel via the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals website. See Instructions for Access and Use of the Electronic Record Download Feature of CM/ECF by clicking[LINK:here] . (USCA 25-30201 If you do not have access to the Electronic Download Feature of CM/ECF, please submit your request for the certified record on appeal to the District Court. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
appeal USCA Case Number Wed 04/09 2:33 PM
USCA Case Number 25-30201 for38 Notice of Appeal filed by Medco Energi U S L L C. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
Related: [-]
appeal ~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines Wed 04/09 2:35 PM
Set Deadline for Clerk re38 Notice of Appeal: Certify Appeal Record 25-30201 by Clerk to COA 4/24/2025. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
38 38 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 03/28 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to37 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Medco Energi U S L L C. (Filing fee $605, receipt number ALAWDC-6229849) (aty,Goldman, Jefferson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/26 1:47 PM
JUDGMENT in accordance with the36 Memorandum Ruling, the court hereby ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment [doc. 25] and Motion to Admit [doc. 32] be DENIED and that the governments Motion for Summary Judgment [doc. 27] be GRANTED. Accordingly, judgment is entered for defendants and plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 2/26/2025. (crt,Stewart, T)
Related: [-]
36 36 21 pgs order Memorandum Ruling Wed 02/26 1:43 PM
MEMORANDUM RULING re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Medco Energi U S L L C;27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Howard Cantor, Debra Haaland,32 MOTION to Admit Exhibit 5 re25 Motion for Summary Judgment into Evidence filed by Medco Energi U S L L C. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 2/26/2025. (crt,Stewart, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
35 35 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 02/18 11:06 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re32 MOTION to Admit Exhibit 5 re25 Motion for Summary Judgment into Evidence filed by Medco Energi U S L L C. (aty,Goldman, Jefferson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
34 34 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/11 3:37 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re32 MOTION to Admit Exhibit 5 re25 Motion for Summary Judgment into Evidence filed by Debra Haaland, Howard Cantor. (aty,Luecke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Motion Setting Wed 01/22 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding:32 MOTION to Admit Exhibit 5 re25 Motion for Summary Judgment into Evidence. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 2/26/2025 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Transferred Wed 01/22 9:23 AM
Motions Transferred regarding32 MOTION to Admit Exhibit 5 re25 Motion for Summary Judgment into Evidence. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
32 32 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/21 8:26 PM
MOTION Admit Rec. 25-5 Into Evidence by Medco Energi U S L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/21/2025.(aty,Goldman, Jefferson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Proposed order
Friday, January 10, 2025
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 01/10 12:39 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Debra Haaland, Howard Cantor. (aty,Luecke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
30 30 2 pgs order Memorandum Order Fri 01/03 1:19 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff file its motion relating to its request for judicial notice on or before January 21, 2025. Response and reply deadlines will then be set via Notice of Motion setting and the court will rule on plaintiffs request before considering the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff address within this motion its failure to raise these issues with the scope or content of the administrative record within the deadlines set under the parties' agreed Scheduling Order. Doc. 16. Plaintiff should also address whether additional briefing is required in the event the court decides not to consider the extra-record evidence. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/3/2025. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 12/10 8:48 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Medco Energi U S L L C. (aty,Goldman, Jefferson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
28 28 order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/13 9:46 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Howard Cantor, Debra Haaland: Briefing deadlines are as set forth in the24 Order Granting Motion for Extension. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 11/13/2024. (crt,Higgins, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
27 27 motion Summary Judgment Fri 11/08 1:04 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Debra Haaland, Howard Cantor.(aty,Luecke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
26 26 order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/18 9:14 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Medco Energi U S L L C: Briefing deadlines are as set forth in the24 Order Granting Motion for Extension. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 9/18/2024. (crt,Higgins, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
25 25 motion Summary Judgment Tue 09/17 11:31 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Medco Energi U S L L C.(aty,Goldman, Jefferson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Tue 08/27 2:32 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/27/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
23 23 motion Extension (Other) Mon 08/26 2:33 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs with consent by Medco Energi U S L L C, Debra Haaland, Howard Cantor. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/26/2024.(aty,O'Connor, Scott) Modified to correct event type and add filers on 8/26/2024 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Friday, July 19, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/19 4:51 PM
NOTICE of of Lodging of Administrative Record by Howard Cantor, Debra Haaland(aty,Luecke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Monday, July 01, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Mon 07/01 4:56 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to Lodge the Administrative Record. Federal Defendants shall have until July 19, 2024, to lodge the administrative record with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/1/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
20 20 motion Extension (Other) Fri 06/28 12:14 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Lodge Administrative Record with consent by Howard Cantor, Debra Haaland. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/28/2024.(aty,Luecke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of proposed order
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 04/30 1:26 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Scott A O'Connor, Anthony C Marino, Martin E Landrieu, Jefferson Briscoe Goldman for Medco Energi U S L L C. Attorney Carey Lyon Menasco; Valkyrie Eliana Buffa and Jana L Grauberger terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/30/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
18 18 misc Proposed Order/Judgment Mon 04/29 10:56 AM
PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT re17 Motion to Substitute Attorney by Medco Energi U S L L C. (aty,Grauberger, Jana) Modified docket text on 4/29/2024 (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 04/29 9:36 AM
Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney Scott O'Connor, Anthony Marino, Martin Landrieu, Jeff Goldman in place of Jana Grauberger, Valkyrie Buffa, Carey Menaso by Medco Energi U S L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/29/2024.(aty,Grauberger, Jana) Modified motion event & docket text on 4/29/2024 (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Resubmitted at Doc
Att: 18 Proposed order
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/17 2:06 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Approval of the Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/17/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/11 3:36 PM
Joint MOTION for Approval of the Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/11/2024.) by Medco Energi U S L L C, Debra Haaland and Howard Cantor. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst.(aty,Grauberger, Jana) Modified to remove erroneously chosen motion events, add filers and to edit docket text on 4/11/2024 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order for Approval of Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan
utility Motions Transferred Thu 04/11 3:50 PM
Motions Transferred regarding15 Joint MOTION for Approval of the Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Transferred Thu 04/11 4:35 PM
Motions Transferred regarding15 Joint MOTION for Approval of the Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
14 14 minutes Status Conference Thu 04/04 9:24 AM
MINUTES AND ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/3/2024. IT IS ORDERED that the parties submit a joint proposed scheduling order within 10 days. (crt,Jordan, P)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
13 13 order Order Setting Status Conference Wed 03/13 2:47 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER:A telephone status conference is set for 4/3/2024 at 10:00 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. During the teleconference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss the status of the case and any issues requiring the Court's consideration. The parties will join the teleconference by dialing 877-336-1839 and entering access code 2869540. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/13/2024. (crt,Glasser, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/04 3:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, by Howard Cantor, Debra Haaland.(aty,Luecke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/14 11:42 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent,1 Complaint. Howard Cantor answer due 3/4/2024; Debra Haaland answer due 3/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/14/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 02/13 1:29 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Howard Cantor, Debra Haaland . Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/13/2024.(aty,Luecke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/13 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Luecke on behalf of Howard Cantor, Debra Haaland (Attorney Daniel Luecke added to party Howard Cantor(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Luecke added to party Debra Haaland(pty:dft)) (aty,Luecke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Wed 02/07 12:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U.S. AttorneyWestern Dist of La on 12/26/2023, filed by Medco Energi U S L L C. (aty,Grauberger, Jana)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Wed 02/07 12:13 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney General on 12/26/2023, filed by Medco Energi U S L L C. (aty,Grauberger, Jana)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Wed 02/07 12:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Debra Haaland on 12/22/2023, filed by Medco Energi U S L L C. (aty,Grauberger, Jana)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Wed 02/07 12:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complain served on Howard Cantor on 12/21/2023, filed by Medco Energi U S L L C. (aty,Grauberger, Jana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/21 10:56 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parents Medco Energi USA Inc, Sanare Energy Partners L L C, Stockbridge Natural Resources L L C, Apure Capital Partners L L C, Oakridge Energy Partners L L C by Medco Energi U S L L C. (aty,Grauberger, Jana) Modified to add corporate parents on 12/21/2023 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Wed 12/13 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Complaint, sent to Jana L Grauberger on behalf of Medco Energi U S L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/27/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued - USA (Form Included) Wed 12/13 2:36 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Debra Haaland, Howard Cantor. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/13 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT 23-1755 against Debra Haaland, Howard Cantor (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5792715) filed by Medco Energi U S L L C.(Attorney Jana L Grauberger added to party Medco Energi U S L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Grauberger, Jana) Modified text on 12/13/2023 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit DOI Decision,
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Violation,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2017 Demand,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2018 Demand,
Att: 6 Exhibit Director Decision,
Att: 7 Exhibit IBLA Initial Decison,
Att: 8 Exhibit M-37071,
Att: 9 Exhibit 209 DM 3,
Att: 10 Exhibit IBLA Reconsideration Grant,
Att: 11 Proposed summons/writ Debra Haaland,
Att: 12 Proposed summons/writ Howard Cantor,
Att: 13 Proposed summons/writ Merrick D. Garland,
Att: 14 Proposed summons/writ Brandon Brown
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 12/13 2:34 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]