California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 4:23-cv-06411
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2023
Terminated:Feb 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 1:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Postmeds, Inc.
Plaintiff
Meliza Moran
Represented By
Bryan L. Bleichner
Chestnut Cambronne PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
9 9 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Wed 02/07 10:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/6/2024 for case no. 4:23-cv-5710-HSG only.Total Time in Court: 16 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: John Nelson; Gary Klinger; Samuel Ward; John Wucetich; Kyle McLean; Laura Van Note; Raina Borrelli; Alexis Wood; Kas Gallucci; Daniel Srourian; Kristen Cardoso; James Pizzirusso; Jill Manning; Bryan Bleichner; James Treglio; and Amber Schubert. Defendant Attorney: Marcus McCutcheon and Casie Collingnon. Adams. With the agreement of all the parties on the line, the Court orders that the lead case remain open and that the consolidated cases (Autry, 23-cv-05710-HSG; Adams, 23-cv-06258-HSG; Garcia, 23-cv-05726-HSG; Rossi, 23-cv-05732-HSG; Fisher, 23-cv-05743-HSG; McDonald, 23-cv-05772-HSG; Williams, 23-cv-05813-HSG; Toles, 23-cv-05852-HSG; Morgan, 23-cv-05862-HSG; Johnson, 23-cv-06038-HSG; Siegel, 23-cv-06134-HSG; Moran, 23-cv-06411-HSG; Byrd, 24-cv-00222-HSG; and Cohen, 24-cv-00134-HSG) be administratively closed. Counsel is directed to re-notice the motion to appoint interim class counsel (docket no. 17) and sets the following briefing schedule: February 21, 2024-response/opposition is due and February 28, 2024-reply to response/opposition is due. The Court orders that counsel should e-file all notices of non-opposition as soon as possible once the motion is re-noticed. Private ADR is discussed. Counsel are directed to meet and confer and e-file by one week from today (February 13, 2024) 1) a stipulation and proposed order on ADR that reflects the scheduled May 3rd mediation, and 2) the required ADR certifications. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/6/2024)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/07 11:07 AM
***Civil Case Terminated, See Docket No. 9 .*** (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
8 8 order Order Thu 02/01 12:55 PM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ADVISING the parties that only the lead case, In Re: Post Meds, Inc. Data Breach Litigation 23-05710 HSG), will remain on calendar for the February 6, 2024 Case Management Conference. The Court accordingly VACATES the Feb. 6, 2024 CMCs scheduled for consolidated cases Garcia (23-cv-05726), Rossi (23-cv-05732), Fisher (23-cv-05743), MacDonald (23-cv-05772), Williams (23-cv-05813), Toles (23-cv-05852), Morgan (23-cv-05862), Johnson (23-cv-06038), Siegel (23-cv-06134), Autry (23-cv-06173), and Adams (23-cv-06258) and the April 9, 2024 CMC for Cohen (24-cv-00134), but DIRECTS counsel for all consolidated cases to join the CMC for the lead case using the dial-in instructions at Dkt. No. 21 , and DIRECTS them to do so at 1:30pm (rather than 1:45pm) to allow for an orderly sign-in process. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/29 2:43 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 1/29/2024. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order Relating Case Mon 01/29 12:06 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER TO CASE NO. 23-cv-5710-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/29/2024. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
5 5 Summons Issued as to Postmeds, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/27/2023. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Bleichner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 72 pgs COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Postmeds, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-18934852.). Filed by Meliza Moran.(Bleichner, Bryan) Modified on 12/13/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet