Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Allison D Burroughs
Case #: 1:23-cv-13078
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
NASCO
Defendant
Progress Software Corporation
Plaintiff
Xinda Lu
Represented By
James J. Pizzirusso
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
Steven B. Rotman
Hausfeld
contact info
Steven M. Nathan
Hausfeld LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 12 2024
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 19 (Order on Defendants Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Article III Standing)Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03083-ADB et al.(McManus, Caetlin)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name Mon 03/31 7:09 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by James J. Pizzirusso (Pizzirusso, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
11 11 38 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 12/12 10:52 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 19 (Order on Defendants Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Article III Standing) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03083-ADB et al.(McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/10 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Tsai on behalf of Progress Software Corporation, Ipswitch, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03083-ADB et al.(McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Wed 11/06 6:19 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 18 (CAC and Rule 12 Scheduling and Structure Proposals) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03083-ADB et al.(McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/19 3:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Xinda Lu. Progress Software Corporation waiver sent on 12/19/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (Nathan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/14 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Nathan on behalf of Xinda Lu (Nathan, Steven)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 12/14 3:18 PM
Summons Issued as to NASCO, Progress Software Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Phillips, Sophie)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice - Other Thu 12/14 10:42 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 1 (General Provisions) See MDL Master Docket 23-md-3083 for all subsequent procedural orders. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice re: MDL Case Opened Thu 12/14 9:19 AM
NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; 1:23-cv-13078-ADB Lu v. NASCO et al. In Re: MOVEit Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL 3083. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Thu 12/14 9:19 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/13 7:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Pizzirusso on behalf of Xinda Lu (Pizzirusso, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 53 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/13 5:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Progress Software Corporation, NASCO Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10175273 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Xinda Lu.(Rotman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Form Category Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Breach