Bassett v. Gray Media Group, Inc.
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel P Jordan, III |
Referred: | Andrew S Harris |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-03154 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Dec 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 3:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
Gray Media Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbie Bassett
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 05/01 2:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III: Motion Hearing held on May 1, 2025 re35 Motion for Summary Judgment. APPEARING: Jim D. Waide, III, Rachel P. Waide, and Yance Falkner, counsel for plaintiff; and M. Kimberly Hodges, counsel for defendant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kati Vogt (228) 563-1780 and E-mail: Kati_Vogt@mssd.uscourts.gov. (SP) |
||
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Thu 05/01 2:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III: Pretrial Conference held on May 1, 2025. PARTICIPATING: Jim D. Waide, III, Rachel P. Waide, and Yance Falkner, counsel for plaintiff; and M. Kimberly Hodges, counsel for defendant. (SP) |
||
order
Order
Thu 05/01 2:25 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER: Final Pretrial Order, Jury Instructions, Exhibit Lists, and Witness Lists due by July 16, 2025. Jury Trial set for July 21, 2025 at 8:30 AM (ELT: 5 days). The parties are to inform the Court by May 9, 2025 the status on settlement. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on May 1, 2025.(SP) |
||
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
48 | 48
![]() NOTICE of Judge Jordan's May 5 & 19, 2025 Civil Trial Calendar Setting. The Pretrial Conference for this matter is set as a special setting for May 1, 2025 at 9:00 AM. (SP) |
|
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
47 | 47
![]() ORDER: As set out in the Order, the Court finds that oral argument is appropriate. The parties rescheduled the pretrial conference to occur on May 1, at 9:00 a.m. That being the first mutually agreeable date, the Court will conduct the hearing at that time. The parties should contact Courtroom Deputy Shone Powell within seven days of this Order to announce their preference to conduct the pretrial conference immediately after the hearing or resetting the pretrial conference. Signed by District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on March 20, 2025.(SP) |
|
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Thu 03/20 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for May 1, 2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5A (Jackson) Jordan before District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III re35 Motion for Summary Judgment. (SP) |
||
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 03/18 10:18 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting46 Defendant's Motion to Continue. Having conferred with the parties via e-mail, the Court resets the pretrial conference in this matter for 9:00 a.m. on May 1, 2025. At the PTC, a trial setting will be determined. No further written order will issue. Signed by District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on March 18, 2025. (AL) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 03/18 2:45 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference reset for May 1, 2025 at 9:00 AM in Chambers 5.750 (Jackson) Jordan before District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III. (SP) |
||
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
46 | 46
![]() MOTION to Continue Jury Trial and Unopposed Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference by Gray Media Group, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2025 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 02/26 12:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris: Settlement Conference held on 2/21/2025 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Jim Waide, Barbie Bassett, Yance Falkner, Kim Hodges and Charles Jones. (JEJ) |
||
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 02/18 10:49 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying45 Unopposed Motion to Continue the Settlement Conference. The Court also finds no good cause exists to excuse the in-person attendance requirement. To accommodate travel logistics, the Court will begin the settlement conference at 10:30 AM. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on February 18, 2025. (TA) |
||
order
Order
Tue 02/18 10:54 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER setting the settlement conference for February 21, 2025 at 10:30 AM in Chambers 5.150 (Jackson) before Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris. The parties are required to submit via e-mail to harris_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov an updated CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM by 12 PM on Thursday, February 20, 2025. Local counsel, lead counsel, and all parties, including a person with full settlement authority, must appear in person at the settlement conference. FAILURE TO APPEAR IN PERSON AT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MAY RESULT IN SANCTIONS. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on February 18, 2025. (TA) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 02/18 11:03 AM
Set Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 2/21/2025 10:30 AM in Chambers 5.150 (Jackson) Harris before Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris. (JEJ) |
||
Monday, February 17, 2025 | ||
45 | 45
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference by Barbie Bassett (Waide, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2025 | ||
44 | 44
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gray Media Group, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
Thursday, January 30, 2025 | ||
43 | 43
![]() MEMORANDUM in Opposition re35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Barbie Bassett (Waide, Jim) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 01/30 2:45 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting42 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Memorandum Brief in Opposition to Motion35 for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff is directed to file the amended brief. Defendant's time to reply under the Local Rules will run from the date Plaintiff files the amended brief. No further written order will issue. Signed by District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on January 30, 2025. (AL) |
||
Wednesday, January 29, 2025 | ||
42 | 42
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Memorandum Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Barbie Bassett(Waide, Jim) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
41 | 41
![]() ATTACHMENT re39 Response in Opposition to Motion,, 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant, Exhibit "K" by Barbie Bassett (Waide, Jim) |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2025 | ||
40 | 40
![]() MEMORANDUM in Opposition re35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Barbie Bassett (Waide, Jim) |
|
39 | 39
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Barbie Bassett(Waide, Jim) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 15, 2025 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 01/15 10:07 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting38 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File for good cause shown by Defendant. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment35 is accepted by the Court and deemed timely. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on January 15, 2025. (TA) |
||
Tuesday, January 14, 2025 | ||
38 | 38
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File /To Accept Late Filed Document [Dkt 35, 37] by Gray Media Group, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
37 | 37
![]() MEMORANDUM in Support re35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gray Media Group, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
36 | 36
![]() **ERROR**Disregard this entry. Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File /To Accept Late Filed Document [Dkt 35-37] by Gray Media Group, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa) Modified on 1/14/2025 (ND) |
|
35 | 35
![]() MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gray Media Group, Inc.(Hodges, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
34 | 34
![]() ORDER denying without prejudice33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. Any subsequent request to extend the deadline for filing dispositive motions must include a request for a continuance and address Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b)(4) and the applicable factors, as stated in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on January 14, 2025. (TA) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 01/14 3:14 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #36 . Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. It will be correctly refiled. (ND) |
||
Monday, January 13, 2025 | ||
33 | 33
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by Gray Media Group, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Fifth Supplemental Core Disclosure by Barbie Bassett (Waide, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Fourth Supplemental Core Disclosure by Barbie Bassett (Waide, Rachel) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gray Media Group, Inc. 30(b)(6) by Barbie Bassett (Waide, Rachel) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Core Disclosure by Barbie Bassett (Waide, Rachel) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Extend Discovery and Motion Deadline by Barbie Bassett (Falkner, Yance) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Extend Deadline
Tue 11/19 11:44 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting28 Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery and Motions Deadlines. The new deadlines are as follows: Discovery due by 12/23/2024; Motions due by 1/13/2025. A subsequent motion to extend these deadlines should include a request for a continuance of the trial date to allow sufficient time for consideration of any dispositive motions. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on November 19, 2024. (TA) |
||
Thursday, November 07, 2024 | ||
order
Order
Thu 11/07 9:09 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER cancelling settlement conference set for November 13, 2024. This conference will be continued to a later date. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on 11/7/2024. (JEJ) |
||
utility
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 11/07 9:10 AM
***Deadlines/Hearings terminated: settlement conference set for 11/13/2024 is terminated. (JEJ) |
||
Monday, November 04, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Barbie Bassett (Waide, Rachel) |
|
26 | 26
![]() NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Barbie Bassett (Waide, Rachel) |
|
25 | 25
![]() NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Core Disclosure by Barbie Bassett (Waide, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Core Disclosure by Barbie Bassett (Waide, Rachel) |
|
Wednesday, October 30, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Second Set of Request for Production by Barbie Bassett (Waide, Rachel) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() NOTICE to Take Deposition of Barbie Bassett by Gray Media Group, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() PROTECTIVE ORDER granting19 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on September 25, 2024. (DI) |
|
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE to Take Deposition of Zoom Deposition of Maggie Wade-Dixon by Barbie Bassett (Falkner, Yance) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Barbie Bassett (Falkner, Yance) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE to Take Deposition of Barbie Bassett by Gray Media Group, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 09/03 9:02 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #16 ,17 : Attorney is advised to include the correct judge assignment of DPJ-ASH on future filing.(cwl) |
||
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Gray Media Group, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Gray Media Group, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
utility
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 08/16 1:37 PM
***Deadlines/Hearings terminated: At the request of the parties, the conference set for 8/16/2024, is cancelled. (JEJ) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 08/07 10:40 AM
Set Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 8/16/2024 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris. Counsel for PLAINTIFF shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE to Take Deposition of Charlie Jones/Ted Fortenberry/Sharel Bend/Michael White/Patrick Ellis/Maggie Wade by Barbie Bassett (Falkner, Yance) |
|
utility
Remark
Thu 08/01 2:41 PM
Remark in re Doc #15 Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials ASH on future filings. (PG) |
||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Admissions by Barbie Bassett (Falkner, Yance) |
|
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by Barbie Bassett (Falkner, Yance) |
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Barbie Bassett (Falkner, Yance) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2024 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 05/07 7:14 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #s10 and11 : Attorney is advised to include the correct judge assignment DPJ-ASH on future filed pleadings. (KNS) |
||
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Pre-Discovery Disclosures Disclosure by Gray Media Group, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gray Media Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Gray Television for Gray Media Group, Inc.. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Core Disclosure by Barbie Bassett (Falkner, Yance) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosure due by 5/3/2024; Jury Trial set for a two-week term of court commencing 5/5/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A (Jackson) Jordan before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III; Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2025, time to be determined, in Chambers 5.750 (Jackson) Jordan before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III; Discovery due by 11/21/2024; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2024; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 5/24/2024; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 8/23/2024; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 9/23/2024; Motions due by 12/5/2024; Settlement Conference set for 11/13/2024 10:30 AM in Chambers 5.150 (Jackson) Harris before Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris. Seven (7) days before the settlement conference, the parties must submit via e-mail to harris_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov an updated CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM. All parties, including a person with full settlement authority, are required to be present at the conference unless excused by the Court. If a party believes the scheduled settlement conference would not be productive and should be cancelled, the party is directed to inform the Court via e-mail of the grounds for their belief at least seven (7) days prior to the conference. ADR Report due by 4/4/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on 4/26/2024. (JEJ) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
minutes
Telephonic Case Management Conference
Fri 04/26 8:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 4/24/2024 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Rachel Waide and Kim Hodges. (JEJ) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 04/03 12:10 PM
RESET Hearing: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 4/24/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to harris_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) |
||
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 03/01/2024 (CO) |
|
utility
Remark
Fri 03/01 3:13 PM
Remark: Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials ASH on future filings. (CO) |
||
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Yance Alfred Falkner on behalf of Barbie Bassett (Falkner, Yance) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Pierce Waide on behalf of Barbie Bassett (Waide, Rachel) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2024 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Gray Media Group, Inc..(Hodges, Melissa) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to Gray Media Group, Inc. (CO) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Gray Media Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSSDC-5290184), filed by Barbie Bassett.(CO) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |