Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael S Nachmanoff
Referred: Lindsey R Vaala
Case #: 1:23-cv-01685
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2024 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
CarsToUs
Plaintiff
Juwuan Briscoe
3011 Prince Albert Sq. Apt. F
Waldorf, MD 20602


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 09/18 5:00 PM
ORDERED that this Defendant's Motion (ECF 13) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that this action is stayed pending arbitration of the parties' dispute;The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff forthwith. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 09/18/2024. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
14 14 misc Waiver of Fri 08/02 12:10 PM
Waiver of re13 MOTION to Stay by CarsToUs (Hadeed, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Fri 08/02 7:53 AM
Notice of Correction re13 MOTION to Stay. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
13 13 motion Stay Thu 08/01 4:46 PM
MOTION to Stay by CarsToUs.(Hadeed, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement
Monday, July 29, 2024
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/01 11:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. CarsToUs served on 7/25/2024, answer due 8/15/2024. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 07/23 3:48 PM
Summons Issued as to CarsToUs. Service by USMS.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USMS 285 Form
10 10 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/23 2:45 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's application (ECF 8) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 07/23/2024. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
9 9 respoth Response Other Mon 01/29 11:11 AM
Response to7 Order to Show Cause filed by Juwuan Briscoe. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/29 11:07 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Juwuan Briscoe. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 01/25 4:09 PM
ORDERED that on or before February 8, 2024, the Plaintiff show cause, if any, why this civil action should not be dismissed. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 1/25/2024. Show Cause Response due by 2/8/2024. (c/s)(lcre, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing Fri 12/15 4:04 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/15/2023. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 12/14 4:45 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion2 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is furtherORDERED that Plaintiff REFILE the Motion within 21 days along with a completeapplication with sufficient detail to enable the Court to determine whether Plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis, including explanation regarding Plaintiffs current income, assets, and expenses. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/14/2023. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Wed 12/13 12:27 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Juwuan Briscoe. (dvanm, )
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pro Se E-Noticing Wed 12/13 12:27 PM
MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Juwuan Briscoe. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/13 12:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Juwuan Briscoe. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/13 12:25 PM
COMPLAINT against CarsToUs, filed by Juwuan Briscoe.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet