Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Mark Pittman
Case #: 4:23-cv-01224
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2024 4:02 AM CDT
Creditor
Brookover Feed Yards, Inc.
Represented By
David L LeBas
Naman Howell Smith & Lee PLLC
contact info
Rachel Elizabeth Barr
Naman Howell Smith & Lee
contact info
Creditor
Cattle Empire, LLC
Represented By
David L LeBas
Naman Howell Smith & Lee PLLC
contact info
Rachel Elizabeth Barr
Naman Howell Smith & Lee
contact info
Defendant
Agridime LLC
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
David Lattimore Evans
David L. Evans
contact info
Movant
Lonnie Jaeger
Party and attorney are active (attorney has been terminated to restrict access to sealed filings.) 54 72nd Street North
Towner, ND 58788
Represented By
Mark J Petrocchi
Griffith Jay & Michel LLP
contact info
Movant
Lance Lenton
Party and attorney are active (attorney has been terminated to restrict access to sealed filings.) 5612 20th Avenue North
Norwich, ND 58768
Represented By
Mark J Petrocchi
Griffith Jay & Michel LLP
contact info
Movant
Mario Ost
Party and attorney are active (attorney has been terminated to restrict access to sealed filings.) 1504 34th Avenue SE
Minot, ND 58701
Represented By
Mark J Petrocchi
Griffith Jay & Michel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
Matthew J Gulde-SEC
Us Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Tyson Mark Lies
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Receiver
Receiver
Represented By
Stephen P Fahey-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Emily Raye Steppick
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Paul Thomas Elkins
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Colin Patrick Benton
Wick Phillips Gould Martin LLP
contact info
Brant C Martin
Wick Phillips LLP
contact info
Jacob Thomas Fain
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin
contact info
Stafford Powell Brantley
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Schyler Paige Parker
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
David J Drez, III
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Stephen Fahey
Law Office Of Steve Fahey PLLC
contact info
John F Massouh
Sprouse Shrader Smith
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Joshua Link
Terminated: 04/25/2024
Represented By
Michael Midey Besser
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
David W Klaudt
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Robert B Long
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jed Wood
Terminated: 04/25/2024
Represented By
Jeffrey J Ansley
Vedder Price
contact info
Katherine Marie Devlin
Vedder Price PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 67 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
147 147 minutes Status Conference Thu 05/01 9:00 AM
ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Pittman: Status Conference held on 4/30/2025. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Matthew Gulde; Defense - Receiver-Colin Benton, Steve Fahey. (Court Reporter: Monica Guzman) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :15. (chmb)
Related: [-]
146 146 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Wed 04/30 4:33 PM
ORDER: The Court hereby extends the Receiver's quarterly status update deadline to May 21, 2025. In the next status update, the Court requests an update from the Receiver as to the status of the sale currently set to close on May 14, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/30/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
145 145 order ~Util - Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Full List) Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Wed 04/30 2:35 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Status Conference time adjusted to account for unexpected delay. Hearing set for 4/30/2025 03:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4th Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Mark Pittman. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/30/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
144 144 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/28 1:09 PM
ORDER granting143 : The Court GRANTS the Motion. David W. Klaudt, Robert Long, and Michael Besser are hereby WITHDRAWN as attorneys of record for Link. Attorney Robert B Long; Michael Midey Besser and David W Klaudt terminated. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/28/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
143 143 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/23 5:27 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Joshua Link (Klaudt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order