Washington Western District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-00590
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2023 11:34 PM PST
Defendant
Christopher Dean Robinson-Holm (1)
Represented By
Sara Brin
Federal Public Defender'S Office (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Victoria Cantore
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/14/2023 1:28 AM PST
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
Arrest of Christopher Dean Robinson-Holm on 12/12/2023. (TLJ)
Related: [-]
1 1 CHARGING DOCUMENT RECEIVED from the Eastern District of Oklahoma as to Christopher Dean Robinson-Holm. (TLJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER appointing Sara Brin for Christopher Dean Robinson-Holm. On the basis of the defendant's sworn financial statement, the court finds that they are financially unable to retain counsel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender for the Western District of Washington be and hereby is appointed to represent the defendant pursuant to Title 18 United States Code 3006A. Approved by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (No.pdf image attached) (TLJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Brian A Tsuchida- CRD: T. Johnson ; AUSA: Victoria Cantore ; Def Cnsl: Jesse Cantor for Sara Brin ; PTS: Erin O'Donnell ; Court Reporter: Digital Recording ; Time of Hearing: 2:00PM ; Courtroom: 12B ; INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) PROCEEDINGS as to Christopher Dean Robinson-Holm held on 12/12/2023. Defendant present in custody. Defendant advised of rights. Financial Affidavit reviewed. Counsel appointed. Defendant advised of charges and penalties in the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Government moves for detention. Defense counsel requests a detention hearing. Hearing set. Defendant remanded to custody. Detention Hearing set for 12/18/2023 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Paula L McCandlis. (TLJ)
Related: [-]